Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2017-10-19 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5167291) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2017) |
2017-10-19 | 2 | LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED, INC. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/19/2017) |
2017-10-20 | 3 | ERRATA by BUZZFEED, INC. 2 LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests filed by BUZZFEED, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected LCvR 7.1 disclosure statement)(Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-10-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (md) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-10-20 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Consent) (md) (Entered: 10/20/2017) |
2017-11-28 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/31/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/31/2017. (Light, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/28/2017) |
2017-11-30 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Lee, Jason) (Entered: 11/30/2017) |
2017-11-30 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before December 14, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2017.(lcrc3) (Entered: 11/30/2017) |
2017-12-14 | 7 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Matthew Charles Skurnik on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY Substituting for attorney Jason Lee (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2017) |
2017-12-14 | 8 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Joint Proposed Schedule) by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2017) |
2017-12-14 | 9 | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 8 the parties' Jointly Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a joint status report once every 90 days, with the first report due by February 12, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/14/2017. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/14/2017) |
2017-12-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/12/2018 (tj) (Entered: 12/15/2017) |
2018-02-12 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 02/12/2018) |
2018-05-14 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 05/14/2018) |
2018-08-13 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/13/2018) |
2018-11-09 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 11/09/2018) |
2018-12-06 | 14 | NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew Charles Skurnik (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 12/06/2018) |
2019-02-07 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-05-08 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 05/08/2019) |
2019-08-06 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/06/2019) |
2019-11-04 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2019) |
2020-02-03 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2020) |
2020-05-04 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 05/04/2020) |
2020-08-03 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/03/2020) |
2020-11-16 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2020) |
2021-02-01 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 02/01/2021) |
2021-05-03 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-08-02 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/02/2021) |
2021-11-01 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2021) |
2022-01-31 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 01/31/2022) |
2022-05-02 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 05/02/2022) |
2022-08-01 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 08/01/2022) |
2022-10-31 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 10/31/2022) |
2023-01-30 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Skurnik, Matthew) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-03-23 | 32 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Alexander N. Ely on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Matthew Skurnik (Ely, Alexander) (Entered: 03/23/2023) |
2023-05-01 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Ely, Alexander) (Entered: 05/01/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |