Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePINSON v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2018cv00486
Date Filed2018-02-21
Date Closed2023-03-30
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJEREMY PINSON
Case DescriptionJeremy Pinson, Michael Stone, and Larry Bohl, all federal prisoners, submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Justice and the CIA for records on themselves. After hearing nothing further from the agencies, Pinson, Stone and Bohl filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantCIA
DefendantCIA
TERMINATED: 06/22/2018
DefendantOFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS
DefendantEXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS
TERMINATED: 03/09/2022
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
DefendantOFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY
TERMINATED: 03/09/2022
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
DefendantUNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE
TERMINATED: 03/09/2022
DefendantJOHN DIGNAM
DefendantCHARLES SAMUELS
DefendantMARK INCH
DefendantKARA LUNDY
DefendantCHARLES STOBLE
DefendantCHARLES STROBLE
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Washington, DC 20505
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
TERMINATED: 03/09/2022
DefendantLAMINE NDIAYE
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantJOSE SANTANA
DefendantKERRI PISTRO
DefendantANDRE MATEVOUSIAN
DefendantELIZABETH STAHL
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
AppealD.C. Circuit 18-5331
AppealD.C. Circuit 24-5010
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [46]
Opinion/Order [79]
FOIA Project Annotation: Judge Rudolph Contreras has resolved much of the remaining FOIA litigation brought by federal prisoner Jeremy Pinson against various components of the Department of Justice " including 15 requests to the FBI, 24 requests to the Bureau of Prisons, two requests to the Office of Information Policy, four requests to the Office of the Inspector General, six requests to the Executive Office of U.S. Attorneys, and one request to the U.S. Marshals Service " as well as one request to the CIA, finding that the agencies conducted adequate searches or that Pinson had failed to exhaust his administrative remedies for many of his requests by either failing to file administrative appeals or to challenge agency fee assessments. Pinson claimed that he had not received agency responses for several requests. One such claim involved a fee assessment from the FBI, which Pinson asserted he had not received. Finding that agency had not carried its burden of proof on the issue of whether or not Pinson received the agency's response, Contreras explained that the FBI was not yet entitled to summary judgment. He pointed out that "to win summary judgement based on failure to exhaust the Government would have to prove that Pinson either reached the end of his administrative remedies or had an opportunity to pursue further administrative remedies and did not do so. For Pinson's part, if he wants to move these claims forward he will have to pay the assessment, if he has not already done so."
Issues: Litigation - Jurisdiction - Failure to Exhaust
Opinion/Order [96]
Opinion/Order [129]
Opinion/Order [137]
Opinion/Order [157]
Opinion/Order [165]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2018-02-211COMPLAINT against CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-02-212NOTICE OF RELATED CASE. Case related to Case No. 12-cv-01872-RC. (zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-02-213ORDER of USCA that the motion for leave to file an addendum to the petition be granted and that the motions to appoint counsel be denied. USCA Case Number 17-05039. FURTHER ORDERED that the petition for writ of mandamus be granted as toPinson, the only petitioner remaining in the case. The district court is directed to file the complaint (which is attached to the petition for writ of mandamus) as to Pinson. See ln re Williams, No. 10-5122 (D.C. Cir. Jan. 4, 2012). The request for apportionment of fees is moot because Pinson is the only remaining petitioner. At this time, the court takes no position on the merits of the complaint. Because this court has granted Pinson's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis based on the Prison Litigation Reform Act's imminent danger exception, 28 U.S.C. § 1915(9), the district court shall allow Pinson to proceed in forma pauperis in the newly filed case.(zrdj) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
2018-03-074SUMMONS (3) Issued as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
2018-03-195RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 3/19/2018, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/19/2018. (jf) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
2018-04-038RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/12/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/11/2018. (zrdj) (Entered: 04/05/2018)
2018-04-046NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Defendants (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-047MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-04MINUTE ORDER granting 7 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Complaint by May 11, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 04/04/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/04/2018)
2018-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/11/2018, (tj) (Entered: 04/11/2018)
2018-05-119MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for More Definite Statement by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2018)
2018-05-2110FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by June 20, 2018 to 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/21/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
2018-05-2911MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 05/31/2018)
2018-06-0712Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Field Decl., # 2 Declaration Stroble Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
2018-06-1113MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-1414MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to Plaintiff's Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CIA, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-14MINUTE ORDER granting 14 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction on or before July 5, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/14/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/14/2018)
2018-06-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/5/2018 (tj) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
2018-06-2215RESPONSE re 9 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2018. (tth) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-06-2216AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, JOHN DIGNAM, CHARLES SAMUELS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, CHARLES STOBLE, CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, LAMINE NDIAYE filed by JEREMY PINSON. "Let this be filed" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/22/2018. (tth) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
2018-07-0517Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Second Strobel Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
2018-07-0918MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STOBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
2018-07-10MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by August 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/10/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/13/2018. (tj) (Entered: 07/10/2018)
2018-07-1619REPLY to opposition re 11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
2018-08-0820MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-08MINUTE ORDER granting 20 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by September 13, 2018. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in light of the filing of Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Original Complaint is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 08/08/2018. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
2018-08-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the amended complaint due by 9/13/2018, (hs) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
2018-08-2721MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
2018-09-1022MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10MINUTE ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by October 31, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/10/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/31/2018, (tj) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
2018-09-1423Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
2018-09-2424MOTION for Service Upon Newly Added Defendants by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
2018-10-2925ORDER denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-2926MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 13 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/29/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
2018-10-3127MOTION for Briefing Schedule , MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
2018-11-1328NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 26 Memorandum & Opinion, 25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel,,, by JEREMY PINSON. Fee Status: No fee paid; IFP Motion Pending. Parties have been notified. (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1329MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by JEREMY PINSON; (See docket entry no. 28 to view.) (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1530Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. Motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis has been filed. Another transmission will be forwarded when the motion has been decided re 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal,. (ztd) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1531ORDER granting 29 Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis . See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/15/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
2018-11-1632ORDER granting 27 Defendants' motion for a briefing schedule and for an extension of time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/18. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/16/2018)
2018-11-1933Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 31 Minute Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ; (ztd) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-19USCA Case Number 18-5331 for 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by JEREMY PINSON. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
2018-11-1934MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 11/21/2018)
2018-11-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/31/2019, Motions due by 1/30/2019. (tj) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
2018-11-3035Memorandum in opposition to re 34 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
2018-12-1036MOTION for Order to Show Cause by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
2018-12-2137Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
2019-01-2838MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint , MOTION to Amend Briefing Schedule Modification by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian); Modified text on 1/29/2019 (tth). (Entered: 01/28/2019)
2019-01-2839MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (tth) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-2840MOTION for Subpoenas and Leave to Serve via Clerk or USMS by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (tth) (Entered: 01/30/2019)
2019-01-29MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the current briefing schedule is amended to provide that Defendants shall file a dispositive motion by March 29, 2019 for the following Defendants, whose obligation to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint shall be stayed pending further order of the Court: (1) the Department of Justice, Office of Inspector General, (2)the Federal Bureau of Investigation, (3) the United States Marshals Service, (4) the Executive Office for United States Attorneys, and (5) the Central Intelligence Agency. This Motion shall also address any constitutional, Administrative Procedure Act, or tort claims that Plaintiff attempts to bring in her First Amended Complaint. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the date by which Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for the United States Bureau of Prisons and the Department of Justice, Office of Information Policy is extended to March 29, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/29/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/29/2019)
2019-02-1141Memorandum in opposition to re 40 MOTION for Subpoenas and Leave to Serve via Clerk or USMS filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/11/2019)
2019-02-1942MOTION for Service Upon Individual Defendants by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 02/22/2019)
2019-02-2643ORDER denying 24 , 42 Motions for service. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/26/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/26/2019)
2019-03-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/28/2019 (tj) (Entered: 03/04/2019)
2019-03-1847MOTION for Order by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 03/21/2019)
2019-03-1944MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Schedule by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) Modified on 3/20/2019 (jf). (Entered: 03/19/2019)
2019-03-2045ORDER denying 34 , 36 motions for order to show cause; denying 39 motion to appoint counsel; denying 40 motion for the issuance of subpoenas. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-03-2046MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 34 , 36 motions for order to show cause; denying 39 motion to appoint counsel; denying 40 motion for the issuance of subpoenas. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/20/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/20/2019)
2019-04-0148RESPONSE re 44 MOTION for Extension of Time of the Briefing Schedule filed by JEREMY PINSON. (jf) (Entered: 04/03/2019)
2019-04-2949MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 (Waller Decl.), # 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 (Hardy Decl.), # 5 Exhibit Ex. 3 (Brinkmann Decl.), # 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 (Kil Decl.), # 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 (Wilkinson Decl.), # 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 (Nails Decl.), # 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 (Ogden Decl.), # 10 Exhibit Ex. 8 (Robinson Decl.), # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-2950MOTION for Briefing Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/29/2019)
2019-04-30MINUTE ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time: In light of the moving Defendants' recently filed 49 partial motion to dismiss and partial motion for summary judgment, it is hereby ORDERED that the 44 motion for an extension of time is granted, over Plaintiff's objection. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/30/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/30/2019)
2019-05-0151MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Declaration by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Supplemental Wilkinson Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/01/2019)
2019-05-2252FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by June 21, 2019 to 9 Defendants' partial motion to dismiss and for summary judgment or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/22/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/22/2019)
2019-05-2353MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 49 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment , MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit - Attachment) (tth) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-28MINUTE ORDER granting 53 motion for extension of time to respond to 49 motion to dismiss; denying motion to appoint counsel: it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have up to and including July 27, 2019, to file an opposition to the 49 motion to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/28/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/28/2019)
2019-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Response to the motion to dismiss due by 7/27/2019 (hs) (Entered: 05/31/2019)
2019-06-0354MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claims as to BOP by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Declaration Christenson Decl., # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/03/2019)
2019-06-0455FOX/NEAL Order: See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/4/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/04/2019)
2019-06-1456MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Declaration) (tth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-1457RESPONSE re 49 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit - Attachments A - B) (tth) (Entered: 06/18/2019)
2019-06-1758MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Extension of Time by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits 1 - 2) (tth) (Entered: 06/19/2019)
2019-06-2459MOTION for Extension of Time to Repond to Motions for Preliminary Injunctions and to file Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-24MINUTE ORDER granting 59 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their responses to Plaintiff's motions for preliminary injunction on or before July 15, 2019. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to dismiss and for summary judgment on or before August 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/24/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/24/2019)
2019-06-2460Memorandum in opposition to re 54 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claims as to BOP filed by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit - Attachments) (tth) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-06-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/15/2019 Replies due by 8/15/2019. (tj) (Entered: 06/27/2019)
2019-07-0361MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claims as to BOP by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-03MINUTE ORDER granting 61 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Bureau of Prison shall file its reply in support of its 54 motion to dismiss on or before August 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/3/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/03/2019)
2019-07-0862MOTION to Supplement Motion for Preliminary Injunction re 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Extension of Time to, 56 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Attachment A) (tth) Modified event on 7/16/2019 (tth). (Entered: 07/12/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER granting 51 motion for leave to file: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants are granted leave to file the supplemental declaration of Justin Wilkinson in support of their partial motion to dismiss and for summary judgment. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1563MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Preliminary Injunction Motions by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-15MINUTE ORDER granting 63 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their responses to Plaintiff's motion for sanctions and preliminary injunction on or before July 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/15/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/15/2019)
2019-07-1564MOTION to Supplement Motion for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Attachments) (tth) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-1865Memorandum in opposition to re 58 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Extension of Time to, 56 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex. A (Diaz Decl.), # 2 Declaration Ex. B (Mitchell Decl.))(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/18/2019)
2019-07-2966MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON (jf) (Entered: 07/31/2019)
2019-08-1267MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (tth) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1268MOTION for Hearing re 67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (tth) (Entered: 08/14/2019)
2019-08-1569REPLY to opposition to motion re 49 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment , 54 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiff's Claims as to BOP filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ex. A (Supp. Waller Decl.), # 2 Declaration Ex. B (Field Decl.), # 3 Declaration Ex. C (2d Hardy Decl.), # 4 Declaration Ex. D (Supp. Christenson Decl.))(Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/15/2019)
2019-08-2870MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/28/2019)
2019-08-29MINUTE ORDER granting 70 motion for extension of time: it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their responses to Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction on or before September 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/29/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/29/2019)
2019-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 9/11/2019 (tj) (Entered: 08/30/2019)
2019-09-1171MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Appoint Counsel by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/11/2019)
2019-09-16MINUTE ORDER granting 71 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including September 18, 2019, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/16/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/16/2019)
2019-09-1872Memorandum in opposition to re 67 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 09/18/2019)
2019-10-0773MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION for Hearing by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Declaration) (ztth) (Entered: 10/09/2019)
2019-10-2174MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Sanctions by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-10-21MINUTE ORDER granting 74 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including November 4, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's motion for sanctions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/21/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/21/2019)
2019-11-0475MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 73 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Hearing by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-04MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall have until and including November 8, 2019 to respond to Plaintiff's motion for sanctions. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/4/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-0876Memorandum in opposition to re 73 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION for Hearing filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/08/2019)
2020-01-1377MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 01/15/2020)
2020-03-3078ORDER deferring ruling on 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Disclose Addresses; granting in part and denying in part 49 , 54 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in Part and for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 56 , 58 , 67 Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctions; denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 66 , 77 Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Counsel; denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; granting 62 , 64 Plaintiff's Motions to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-03-3079MEMORANDUM OPINION deferring ruling on 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Disclose Addresses; granting in part and denying in part 49 , 54 Defendants' Motions to Dismiss in Part and for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 56 , 58 , 67 Plaintiff's Motions for Preliminary Injunctions; denying 73 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions; denying 66 , 77 Plaintiff's Motions for Appointment of Counsel; denying 68 Plaintiff's Motion for Hearing; granting 62 , 64 Plaintiff's Motions to Supplement. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2020)
2020-04-0180ORDER directing the Government to answer or otherwise respond to the undismissed portions of 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/1/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-2881MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-28MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before June 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/28/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-04-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-1182STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-11MINUTE ORDER: In light of 82 Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) the Clerk's Office shall issue new summonses for the individual defendants named in 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and (2) the U.S. Marshals Service shall serve the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia on behalf of the individual defendants, but only after the Marshals Service resumes serving process. See In Re: Suspension of Process Service by U.S. Marshals in District of Columbia Due to Exigent Circumstances Created by the COVID-19 Pandemic, Standing Order No. 20-18 (BAH), March 31, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/11/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/11/2020)
2020-05-12MINUTE ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Disclose Addresses: In light of 82 Defendants' Status Report, in which Defendants represent that each BOP employee named as an individual defendant in this case has consented to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia receiving personal service on his or her behalf, there is no need for Plaintiff to provide the individual defendants' home addresses to the Clerk of Court and the U.S. Marshals Service in order to effect service on them. Accordingly, 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Disclose Addresses is DENIED AS MOOT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/12/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-05-2683MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint by EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-26MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before July 1, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-05-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 05/27/2020)
2020-06-1584(RENEWED) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-2385MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 84 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23MINUTE ORDER granting 85 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their opposition to 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before July 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/23/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/2/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-3086MOTION to Stay Answer Deadline by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-0287Memorandum in opposition to re 84 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-16MINUTE ORDER granting 86 Defendants' Motion to Stay Answer Deadline: It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is STAYED; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file a status report within 14 days of Plaintiff paying the outstanding fees or by September 1, 2020, whichever is earlier, updating the Court and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/16/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-2488Summons (13) Issued as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STOBLE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (zsb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)
2020-08-0489RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS served on 8/3/2020; FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 8/3/2020; OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 8/3/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-1090STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-1291Summons Returned Unexecuted as to JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STOBLE. (ztth) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-08-1392RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE served on 8/10/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-08-2493STATUS REPORT by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(eg) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 90 Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before August 31, 2020 updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/27/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/27/2020)
2020-08-3194STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-01MINUTE ORDER: In light of 94 Defendants' Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that (1) the Clerk's Office shall re-issue summonses for the individual defendants named in 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and (2) the U.S. Marshals Service shall direct service of those summonses to the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Columbia (not the Federal Bureau of Prisons), which has agreed and received consent to accept service on behalf of those individual defendants. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/1/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-14MINUTE ORDER: In light of 94 Defendants' status report and the lack of response by Plaintiff, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before October 1, 2020, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/14/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/1/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-1795ORDER denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/17/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-1796MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 84 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/17/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-0197STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 97 Defendants' status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before November 2, 2020, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/21/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/21/2020)
2020-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/2/2020 (tj) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-2798SUMMONS (13) REISSUED to AUSA BRIAN J. FIELD on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE pursuant to MINUTE ORDER signed on 9/1/2020 by Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zmd) (Entered: 10/27/2020)
2020-11-0299Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02100RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/30/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/29/2020. (zrdj) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-16101MANDATE of USCA as to 28 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by JEREMY PINSON ; USCA Case Number 18-5331. (Attachments: # 1 USCA Order)(zrdj) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 99 Defendants' status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before December 4, 2020, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/19/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/4/2020. (zgdf) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-30102MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by JOHN DIGNAM, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting 102 the Individual Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the individual defendants shall file their response to 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before December 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-03103(RENEWED) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. "LET THIS BE FILED" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/3/2020. (ztth) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-04104STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-23105MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 16 Amended Complaint, by JOHN DIGNAM, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE (Field, Brian) (Entered: 12/23/2020)
2020-12-28MINUTE ORDER granting 105 the Individual Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the individual defendants shall file their response to 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before January 29, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/28/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/28/2020)
2020-12-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 1/29/2021, (zj) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-04106STATUS REPORT by JEREMY PINSON. "LET THIS BE FILED IN BOTH CASES" by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/4/2021. (ztth) (Entered: 01/04/2021)
2021-01-08107STATUS REPORT by JEREMY PINSON. "Leave to File Granted" by Judge Rudolph Contreras 1/8/2021. (ztth) Modified text on 1/21/2021 (znmw). (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 104 Defendants' status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before January 29, 2021, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/12/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-26108Mail Returned as Undeliverable: Sent to Jeremy Pinson, (16267064), Victorville U.S. Penitentiary, Inmate Mail/Parcels, P.O. Box 3900, Adelanto, CA 92301; Type of Document Returned: Order dated 12/28/2020; (tj) (Entered: 01/26/2021)
2021-01-28109MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by JOHN DIGNAM, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-29110STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-02-09111NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-12MINUTE ORDER: In light of 111 Plaintiff's Notice, it is hereby ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mail to Plaintiff copies of the docket and all pleadings, orders, and opinions docketed on or after December 4, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/12/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-16112MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits) (ztth) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-25113MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint by JOHN DIGNAM, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-15114Memorandum in opposition to 113 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Amended Complaint filed by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-16MINUTE ORDER granting 109 / 113 the Individual Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the individual defendants shall file their response to 16 Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint on or before March 31, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/16/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/16/2021)
2021-03-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 110 Defendants' status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before March 30, 2021, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/17/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/30/2021 (tj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-29115STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-29116MOTION to Dismiss by JOHN DIGNAM, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit Locke Decl.)(Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-29117FOX/NEAL ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond to 116 the Individual Defendants' motion to dismiss by April 29, 2021, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/29/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-04-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 115 Defendants' status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file another status report on or before May 28, 2021, updating the Court on the status of the underlying FOIA requests and proposing a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/19/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-04-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/28/2021. (tj) (Entered: 04/19/2021)
2021-04-21118MOTION for Leave to File by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit - Attachment) (ztth) (Entered: 04/26/2021)
2021-05-03119MOTION for Discovery, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit - Attachment A, # 3 Exhibit - Attachment B) (ztth) (Entered: 05/07/2021)
2021-05-07120MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 118 MOTION for Leave to File by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/07/2021)
2021-05-10MINUTE ORDER granting 120 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to 118 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint on or before June 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/10/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-05-27121STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-05-27122MOTION for Extension of Time to file Opposition to Motion for Leave by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Field, Brian) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-06-03123NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Christopher Charles Hair on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE Substituting for attorney Brian J. Field (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 06/03/2021)
2021-06-14124MOTION for Order, MOTION for Sanctions by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-21MINUTE ORDER granting 122 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to 118 Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a second amended complaint on or before July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/21/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/9/2021. (tj) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-07-06125RESPONSE re 124 MOTION for Order MOTION for Sanctions filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-07-09126Memorandum in opposition to re 118 MOTION for Leave to File filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-30127STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-08-05128ORDER denying 103 / 112 / 119 / 124 Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel; denying 119 Plaintiff's motion for limited discovery; and denying 124 Plaintiff's motion for an order limiting extensions of time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-05129MEMORANDUM OPINION denying 103 / 112 / 119 / 124 Plaintiff's motions for appointment of counsel; denying 119 Plaintiff's motion for limited discovery; and denying 124 Plaintiff's motion for an order limiting extensions of time. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-09-08130MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION Return of Documents by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-08131REPLY to opposition to motion re 118 MOTION for Leave to File filed by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-24132MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 130 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION return of documents by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-25MINUTE ORDER Granting 132 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall submit their response to 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, Motion for Return of Documents or before October 15, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/25/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/25/2021)
2021-09-30133STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 133 the Defendants' Status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall submit a status report on or before November 1, 2021 indicating whether Plaintiff intends to challenge Defendants' remaining responses to Plaintiffs' FOIA requests in this case and, if so, which specific issues are required for summary judgment briefing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/01/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-15134Memorandum in opposition to re 130 MOTION for Sanctions MOTION return of documents filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Deborah Locke (and Exhibits))(Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-22135RESPONSE re 133 Status Report, filed by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 10/25/2021)
2022-03-09136ORDER granting in part and denying in part 118 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, denying as moot 116 Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and denying 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Return of Documents. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/09/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/09/2022)
2022-03-09137MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 118 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint, denying as moot 116 Individual Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint, and denying 130 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions and Return of Documents. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/09/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/09/2022)
2022-03-09138SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, JOSE SANTANA, KERRI PISTRO, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, ELIZABETH STAHL filed by JEREMY PINSON.(ztth); Modified text on 3/11/2022 (ztth). (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-03-22139MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 138 Amended Complaint, by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Hair, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-22MINUTE ORDER granting 139 Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to 138 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before April 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 03/22/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to amended complaint due by 4/22/2022. (tj) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-04-11140NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Christopher C. Hair (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-05-16MINUTE ORDER: On March 22, 2022, the Court granted Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time and ordered Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before April 22, 2022. Defendants have not yet filed any response. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall respond to 138 Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint on or before May 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/16/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-17141NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-31142MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 138 Amended Complaint, by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, CHARLES SAMUELS, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/31/2022)
2022-06-13143NOTICE of Change of Address by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-07-26MINUTE ORDER granting 142 Motion for Extension of Time: Upon consideration of 142 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time, the Court notes that Plaintiff has not specifically objected to the instant motion, but has generally objected to all further extensions of time in this case. See ECF No. 48 . However, for good cause shown, the motion is granted. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to 138 Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint on or before July 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/26/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-29144NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kartik Narayan Venguswamy on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney April Denise Seabrook (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-07-29145Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-29146MOTION to Dismiss by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, CIA, JOHN DIGNAM, EXECUTIVE OFFICE FOR THE US ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER granting 145 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, nunc pro tunc : 146 Defendants' motion to dismiss is DEEMED TIMELY FILED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/01/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-01147FOX/NEAL ORDER: Order advising Plaintiff to respond to 146 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by October 3, 2022, or the Court may deem the matter conceded. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/01/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-26148MOTION for Extension of Time and Access to Files by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-10-03MINUTE ORDER granting 148 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall respond to 146 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss before or on November 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10-3-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/03/2022)
2022-11-14149MOTION for Sanctions, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-28150MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint by JEREMY PINSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(ztth) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
2022-12-01151Memorandum in opposition to re 149 Motion for Sanctions, Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES MARSHALS SERVICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 12/01/2022)
2022-12-07152MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 150 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Leave to File by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 12/07/2022)
2022-12-08MINUTE ORDER granting 152 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' response to 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Appointment of Counsel, and Leave to Supplement Complaint is due on or before December 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/8/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/08/2022)
2022-12-21153Memorandum in opposition to re 150 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for Leave to File filed by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2023-01-17154Memorandum in opposition to re 146 Motion to Dismiss,, filed by JEREMY PINSON. (ztth) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-01-31155REPLY to opposition to motion re 146 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JOHN DIGNAM, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, FEDERAL BUREAU OF PRISONS, MARK INCH, KARA LUNDY, ANDRE MATEVOUSIAN, LAMINE NDIAYE, OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, KERRI PISTRO, CHARLES SAMUELS, JOSE SANTANA, ELIZABETH STAHL, CHARLES STROBLE, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Venguswamy, Kartik) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-03-30156ORDER granting 146 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, Appointment of Counsel, and Enlargement of Time; and denying 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Appointment of Counsel, and Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2023)
2023-03-30157MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 146 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 149 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions, Appointment of Counsel, and Enlargement of Time; and denying 150 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Appointment of Counsel, and Leave to File a Supplemental Complaint. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/30/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/30/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar