Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2018-12-13 | 1 | COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5838097) filed by NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE, KATHY KIELY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Corporate Disclosure Certificate, # 9 Summons for U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, # 10 Summons for United States Department of Homeland Security, # 11 Summons for United States Attorney General, # 12 Summons for United States Attorney)(Townsend, KatieLynn) Modified on 12/17/2018 (zef, ). (Entered: 12/13/2018) |
2018-12-13 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE (zsb) (Entered: 12/18/2018) |
2018-12-18 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 12/18/2018) |
2018-12-18 | 3 | SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 12/18/2018) |
2019-01-14 | 4 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/20/2018. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/19/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/14/2019) |
2019-01-14 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/20/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/14/2019) |
2019-01-22 | 6 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay in Light of Lapse in Appropriations by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/22/2019) |
2019-01-23 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 6 Motion to Stay: it is hereby ORDERED that this case is STAYED until the restoration of appropriations to the Department of Justice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file with the Court, within 14 days of Congress appropriating funds for the Justice Department, a joint status report containing proposed deadlines for further proceedings in this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/23/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/23/2019) |
2019-01-31 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-01-31 | 8 | NOTICE of Appearance by Charles D. Tobin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Tobin, Charles) (Entered: 01/31/2019) |
2019-02-07 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/07/2019) |
2019-02-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 9 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a response to the Complaint on or before February 28, 2019. It is FURTHER ordered that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before March 7, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/8/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/08/2019) |
2019-02-28 | 10 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/28/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-06 | 12 | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before May 6, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/6/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/06/2019) |
2019-03-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 5/6/2019. (tj) (Entered: 03/07/2019) |
2019-05-06 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT of the Parties by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report on or before June 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/6/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/06/2019) |
2019-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/5/2019 (tj) (Entered: 05/22/2019) |
2019-06-05 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 18, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/5/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-06-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/18/2019 (tj) (Entered: 06/05/2019) |
2019-07-17 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/17/2019) |
2019-07-18 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/18/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/18/2019) |
2019-08-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/28/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/02/2019) |
2019-08-28 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 08/28/2019) |
2019-08-29 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 17, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/29/19. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/29/2019) |
2019-08-30 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/17/2019. (tj) (Entered: 08/30/2019) |
2019-10-17 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 11, 2019. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/17/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-10-17 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/11/2019. (tj) (Entered: 10/17/2019) |
2019-12-11 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/11/2019. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/11/2019) |
2019-12-12 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/22/2020 (tj) (Entered: 12/12/2019) |
2020-01-22 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 27, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/22/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/22/2020) |
2020-01-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/27/2020 (tj) (Entered: 01/29/2020) |
2020-02-27 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-02-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/27/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/27/2020) |
2020-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/26/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-03-26 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-03-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 24, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-03-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/24/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/26/2020) |
2020-04-24 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/24/2020) |
2020-04-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/24/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 04/24/2020) |
2020-04-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/15/2020 (tj) (Entered: 04/27/2020) |
2020-05-15 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 05/15/2020) |
2020-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/15/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/15/2020) |
2020-05-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/5/2020. (tj) (Entered: 05/18/2020) |
2020-06-05 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-06-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 24 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/5/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/05/2020) |
2020-06-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/26/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/08/2020) |
2020-06-26 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-06-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before August 12, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/26/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/26/2020) |
2020-06-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/12/2020. (tj) (Entered: 06/29/2020) |
2020-08-12 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-08-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 11, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/12/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 08/12/2020) |
2020-08-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/11/2020 (tj) (Entered: 08/13/2020) |
2020-09-10 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2020) |
2020-09-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 27 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before October 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/10/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/10/2020) |
2020-09-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/6/2020. (tj) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-10-06 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/06/2020) |
2020-10-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 9, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/06/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/06/2020) |
2020-10-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/9/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/07/2020) |
2020-11-09 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 29 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before December 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/9/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-11-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/18/2020 (tj) (Entered: 11/09/2020) |
2020-12-17 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 30 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/17/2020. (lcrc1) (Entered: 12/17/2020) |
2020-12-21 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/26/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/21/2020) |
2021-01-26 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/26/2021) |
2021-01-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 31 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/26/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/26/2021) |
2021-01-26 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/2/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/26/2021) |
2021-03-02 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 32 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before May 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/2/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-05-05 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/05/2021) |
2021-05-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 33 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/5/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 05/05/2021) |
2021-07-07 | 34 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/07/2021) |
2021-07-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 34 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before September 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/7/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/07/2021) |
2021-09-23 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-09-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 35 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 23, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/23/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 36 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before January 20, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/23/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2021-11-23 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/20/2022 (tj) (Entered: 11/23/2021) |
2022-01-20 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-01-20 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 37 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/20/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/20/2022) |
2022-02-23 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-02-23 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 38 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before April 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/23/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/23/2022) |
2022-04-21 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 04/21/2022) |
2022-04-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 39 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before June 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Entered: 04/21/2022) |
2022-06-22 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 40 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before July 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/22/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 06/22/2022) |
2022-07-22 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-07-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 41 the parties' joint status report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before October 25, 2022; Plaintiffs' Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due on or before December 9, 2022; Defendants' Reply and Opposition shall be due on or before January 10, 2023; and Plaintiffs' Reply shall be due on or before January 31, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 07/22/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-10-24 | 42 | MOTION for Vaughn Index (Opposed Motion for Leave to File Representative Sample Vaughn) , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial Consent) by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
2022-10-24 | 43 | NOTICE by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE re 42 Motion for Vaughn Index,, Motion for Extension of Time to, (Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 10/24/2022) |
2022-10-31 | 44 | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sam Escher on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT Substituting for attorney Jeremy Simon (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 10/31/2022) |
2022-11-02 | 45 | RESPONSE re 42 MOTION for Vaughn Index (Opposed Motion for Leave to File Representative Sample Vaughn) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment (Partial Consent) filed by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2022-11-09 | 46 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 45 Response to motion, filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 11/09/2022) |
2022-12-06 | 47 | NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Musgrave on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Musgrave, Shawn) (Entered: 12/06/2022) |
2023-01-05 | | MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendants' Opposed Motion for Leave to File Representative Sample Vaughn Index and Partial Consent Motion for Extension to File Motion for Summary Judgment: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion is DENIED insofar as it requests that Defendant U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement ("ICE") be permitted to submit a sample Vaughn index. Defendants estimate that ICE has withheld in full 174 pages, and withheld in part 3,000 pages, of ICE records; it has also released in part two Excel spreadsheets. Defendants seek leave to file a sample Vaughn index that would, "[i]n total... address... approximately 388 pages of records as well as a portion of the two [E]xcel spreadsheets." As this Court has recognized, "[a] random sampling index may be appropriate in some instances and is within the discretion of the district court." Stonehill v. U.S. Dept of Just. Tax Div. , No. 1:19-cv-03770, 2022 WL 407145, at *23 (D.D.C. Feb. 10, 2022). But "there is no magic number or sampling ratio that automatically makes a sample appropriate; rather, the determination must always be made with reference to the particular facts of the case." Id. In this case, the number of pages at issue is not voluminous enough to support such a request, particularly when Defendants have not indicated the number of documents at issue. See, e.g. , id. (denying request to submit sample Vaughn index where approximately 8,000 pages, made up of 360 documents, had been withheld). It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion is GRANTED insofar as it requests an amendment of the summary judgment briefing schedule, and the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before January 25, 2023; Plaintiffs' opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment shall be filed on or before March 9, 2023; Defendants' reply and opposition to the cross-motion shall be filed on or before April 10, 2023; and Plaintiffs' reply shall be filed on or before May 3, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/5/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 01/05/2023) |
2023-01-20 | 48 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Ex. A - Email from J. Simon, # 2 Ex. B - Email from A. Hughes, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Escher, Sam) (Entered: 01/20/2023) |
2023-01-27 | 49 | RESPONSE re 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation filed by KATHY KIELY, NATIONAL PRESS CLUB JOURNALISM INSTITUTE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 01/27/2023) |
2023-02-03 | 50 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 48 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Supporting Documentation filed by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Escher, Sam) (Entered: 02/03/2023) |
2023-02-22 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 48 Defendants' Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion for summary judgment shall be due on or before May 3, 2023. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall produce the Vaughn indices on a rolling basis as follows: Defendants shall produce on or before February 28, 2023 any Vaughn index produced to date while the motion for extension was pending; an additional 50 percent of its Vaughn index on or before March 28, 2023; and the balance of any remaining documents on or before April 28, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/22/2023. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/22/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |