Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2019-09-18 | 1 | COMPLAINT against DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6384667) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-18 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2019) |
2019-09-20 | | Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2019-09-20 | 4 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zeg) (Entered: 09/20/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 9/30/2019 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 6 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/1/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-01 | 7 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2019. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2019) |
2019-11-26 | 8 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Nunc Pro Tunc by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-11-26 | 9 | ANSWER to Complaint by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 11/26/2019) |
2019-11-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Nunc Pro Tunc : It is hereby ORDERED that defendant shall have until November 26, 2019 to file an Answer. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/27/2019. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/27/2019) |
2019-12-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and submit a proposed briefing schedule by January 14, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on December 24, 2019. (lcrc3) (Entered: 12/24/2019) |
2020-01-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/14/2020. (tj) (Entered: 01/09/2020) |
2020-01-14 | 10 | PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order Joint Proposed Schedule by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 10 the parties' Joint Proposed Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before March 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/14/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-01-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/2/2020 (tj) (Entered: 01/14/2020) |
2020-03-02 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT (First) by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 11 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before April 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/2/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/02/2020) |
2020-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/15/2020 (tj) (Entered: 03/13/2020) |
2020-03-27 | 12 | Unopposed MOTION to Stay Existing Deadlines in Light of the COVID-19 Pandemic's Effect on Federal Government Operations by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Michael Brobeck, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/27/2020) |
2020-03-27 | | MINUTE ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay of Existing Deadlines. It is hereby ORDERED that the Government's FOIA processing and production deadlines are STAYED, and the April 15, 2020 deadline for the parties' next Joint Status Report is hereby VACATED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before May 26, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/27/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/27/2020) |
2020-03-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2020. (zcal) (Entered: 03/27/2020) |
2020-05-26 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-26 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 13 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 21, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/26/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/26/2020) |
2020-05-27 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/21/2020 (tj) (Entered: 05/27/2020) |
2020-07-21 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-21 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2020) |
2020-07-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/15/2020. (tj) (Entered: 07/22/2020) |
2020-09-15 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Michael Brobeck)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/15/2020) |
2020-09-16 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/16/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/16/2020) |
2020-10-02 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/02/2020) |
2020-10-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/5/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/05/2020) |
2020-10-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/2/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/06/2020) |
2020-11-02 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 2, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/2/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/02/2020) |
2020-11-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/2/2020 (tj) (Entered: 11/03/2020) |
2020-12-02 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/02/2020) |
2020-12-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before January 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/2/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/02/2020) |
2020-12-03 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/4/2021 (tj) (Entered: 12/03/2020) |
2021-01-04 | 19 | Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-04 | | ORDER granting 19 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Two-Day Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall have a two-day extension of time within which to file the joint status report. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/4/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/04/2021) |
2021-01-06 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before February 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/6/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-01-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/2/2021. (tj) (Entered: 01/06/2021) |
2021-02-02 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before March 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/2/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-02-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/2/2021 (tj) (Entered: 02/02/2021) |
2021-03-02 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-03-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before April 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/2/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/02/2021) |
2021-04-02 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/02/2021) |
2021-04-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before May 3, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/2/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/02/2021) |
2021-05-03 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-05-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 24 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before June 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/3/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/03/2021) |
2021-06-01 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/01/2021) |
2021-06-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/1/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/01/2021) |
2021-06-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 06/01/2021) |
2021-07-01 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/01/2021) |
2021-07-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 2, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/2/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/02/2021) |
2021-08-02 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/02/2021) |
2021-08-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 27 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/3/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/03/2021) |
2021-08-04 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 9/1/2021. (tj) (Entered: 08/04/2021) |
2021-09-01 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/01/2021) |
2021-09-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/1/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/01/2021) |
2021-09-01 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-10-01 | 29 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/01/2021) |
2021-10-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 29 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before November 1, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/01/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/01/2021) |
2021-11-01 | 30 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 11/01/2021) |
2021-11-02 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 30 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before December 1, 2021. (So Ordered Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/02/2021). (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-11-02 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/1/2021 (tj) (Entered: 11/02/2021) |
2021-12-01 | 31 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/01/2021) |
2021-12-01 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 31 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before January 3, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/1/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/01/2021) |
2022-01-03 | 32 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/03/2022) |
2022-01-03 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 32 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before February 9, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 01/03/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/03/2022) |
2022-02-09 | 33 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 33 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before March 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/9/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/09/2022) |
2022-02-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/11/2022. (tj) (Entered: 02/10/2022) |
2022-03-10 | 34 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of BUZZFEED, INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/10/2022) |
2022-03-11 | 35 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/11/2022) |
2022-03-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 35 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before April 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/11/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | 36 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-04-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 36 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before May 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/11/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/11/2022) |
2022-05-11 | 37 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 05/11/2022) |
2022-05-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 37 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before June 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/11/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/11/2022) |
2022-06-10 | 38 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 06/10/2022) |
2022-06-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 38 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before July 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/10/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/10/2022) |
2022-06-14 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 7/11/2022 (tj) (Entered: 06/14/2022) |
2022-07-11 | 39 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-07-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 39 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/11/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/11/2022) |
2022-08-10 | 40 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-08-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 40 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before September 9, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/10/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/10/2022) |
2022-09-09 | 41 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-09-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 41 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before October 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/9/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/09/2022) |
2022-10-11 | 42 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 10/11/2022) |
2022-10-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 42 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before November 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/13/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/13/2022) |
2022-11-10 | 43 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 11/10/2022) |
2022-11-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 43 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/14/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/14/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 44 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 44 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 11, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/12/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2023-01-11 | 45 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-01-11 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 45 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-02-10 | 46 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 02/10/2023) |
2023-02-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 46 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before March 13, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/13/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/13/2023) |
2023-03-13 | 47 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-03-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 47 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/14/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/14/2023) |
2023-04-12 | 48 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-04-12 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 48 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/12/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/12/2023) |
2023-05-12 | 49 | Joint STATUS REPORT by DEFENSE INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Olson, Lisa) (Entered: 05/12/2023) |
2023-05-15 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 49 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 12, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/15/23. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/15/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |