Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02942
Date Filed2019-10-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the CIA for records mentioning him. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-011COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6410066) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-012NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/01/2019)
2019-10-03Case assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zmc) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-033SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zmc) (Entered: 10/03/2019)
2019-10-074STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 7, 2019. (lcbah4) (Entered: 10/07/2019)
2019-11-045RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 10/9/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-046RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/9/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-047RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/3/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/2/2019. (Burday, Joshua) Modified on 11/5/2019 to correct service/answer due dates (zrdj). (Entered: 11/04/2019)
2019-11-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE, by November 22, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.23. The 1 Complaint was filed on October 1, 2019 and the defendant was served a copy of the complaint by October 4, 2019. See 5 Return of Service/Affidavit, 6 Return of Service/Affidavit, and 7 Return of Service/Affidavit. No answer or other response has been timely filed, see 5 U.S.C. § 552(a)(4)(C), and no other action taken in the case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 19, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to show cause due by 11/22/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/19/2019)
2019-11-208RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by PATRICK EDDINGTON re Order,, filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/20/2019)
2019-11-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISCHARGING, upon consideration of the plaintiff's 8 Response to Order to Show Cause, the Order to Show Cause, see Min. Order (Nov. 19, 2019). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 21, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/21/2019)
2019-11-259Civil Statement regarding Service of Process from United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Daniel F. Van Horn, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Van Horn, Daniel) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the defendant's 9 Statement Regarding Service of Process, the plaintiff to refrain from filing a motion for default judgment at this time and further DIRECTING the defendant to respond to the plaintiff's 1 Complaint by December 23, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 25, 2019. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 12/23/2019. (tg) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-0510NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-1911ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 12/19/2019)
2020-01-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to submit, by January 10, 2020, a Joint Meet and Confer Report consistent with the 4 Standing Order, paragraph 3. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 7, 2020. (lcbah1) Modified date on 1/7/2020 (tg). (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Report due by 1/10/2020. (tg) (Entered: 01/07/2020)
2020-01-1012Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by March 16, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 10, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-01-1313NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/13/2020)
2020-03-1614Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by May 18, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 16, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-03-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020. (tg) (Entered: 03/16/2020)
2020-05-1815Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by July 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 18, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/2/2020. (tg) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-2616NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-07-0217Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by August 3, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 6, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-07-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/3/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 07/06/2020)
2020-08-0318Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by September 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 3, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/03/2020)
2020-08-04Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/2/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 08/04/2020)
2020-09-0219Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by October 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 2, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/02/2020)
2020-09-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 09/03/2020)
2020-09-1520NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-10-0221Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 10/02/2020)
2020-10-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by December 2, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-12-0222Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-02MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by February 2, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 2, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2020-12-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/2/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2021-02-0223Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-03MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by April 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 3, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-04-0924Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-04-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by June 11, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 10, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/10/2021)
2021-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-06-1125Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by August 20, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 20, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/20/2021)
2021-08-2026Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 26 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by November 19, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 25, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-11-1927Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by February 18, 2022, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 19, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2022-01-2128NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-2129MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the plaintiff counsel's 29 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua Hart Burday terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 21, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-02-1830Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-02-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by May 19, 2022, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 23, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/19/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-05-1931NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-1932Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 32 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by August 19, 2022, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 19, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-07-0533NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. Attorney Dedra Seibel Curteman terminated. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-08-1934Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-19MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 34 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by November 17, 2022, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 19, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-10-3035NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Robert Aaron Caplen on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Michael Tilghman (Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 10/30/2022)
2022-11-1736Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 36 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 10, 2023, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 18, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2023-01-0637Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Caplen, Robert) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-09MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 37 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by February 28, 2023, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 9, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/09/2023)
2023-01-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/28/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
2023-02-0338NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brian J. Levy on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Robert A. Caplen (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/03/2023)
2023-02-2739NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/27/2023)
2023-02-2840Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Levy, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-02-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 40 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by May 28, 2023, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 28, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 02/28/2023)
2023-03-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/28/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-05-2641Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 05/26/2023)
2023-05-30MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 41 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 5, 2023, with a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 30, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/5/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 05/31/2023)
2023-09-0542Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 09/05/2023)
2023-09-06MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 42 Joint Status Report, the parties to file a joint status report by December 15, 2023, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 6, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-09-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 12/15/2023 (mac) (Entered: 09/06/2023)
2023-12-1543Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-15MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 43 Joint Status Report, to file, by March 21, 2024, a joint status letter, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 15, 2023. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2023-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 3/21/2024 (mac) (Entered: 12/18/2023)
2024-03-2144Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 03/21/2024)
2024-03-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 44 Joint Status Report, to file, by June 21, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 22, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/22/2024)
2024-03-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 6/21/2024 (mac) (Entered: 03/22/2024)
2024-06-2145Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Levy, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2024)
2024-06-21MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties, upon consideration of their 45 Joint Status Report, to file, by September 20, 2024, a joint status report, advising the Court of the status of this matter. Signed by Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 21, 2024. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/21/2024)
2024-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2024. (mac) (Entered: 06/24/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar