Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleEDDINGTON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv02962
Date Filed2019-10-02
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Randolph D. Moss
PlaintiffPATRICK EDDINGTON
Case DescriptionPatrick Eddington, a researcher at the Cato Institute, submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records on himself. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then told Eddington that it found no records. Eddington then filed an appeal with the Office of Information Policy. OIP acknowledged receipt of the appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Eddington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-021COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-6412667) filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-022NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 10/02/2019)
2019-10-04Case Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-043SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zrdj) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-10-044STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/04/2019. (lcrdm2, ) (Entered: 10/04/2019)
2019-11-055RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/10/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-056RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 10/10/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-057RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/10/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-058RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/10/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/9/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/05/2019)
2019-11-129ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/12/2019)
2019-11-1410ERRATA for Corrected Answer to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 9 Answer to Complaint filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Corrected Answer)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-26MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for an Initial Scheduling Conference on December 17, 2019 at 10:15 a.m. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file, on or before December 10, 2019, a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents, and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/26/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-11-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/10/2019. (kt) (Entered: 11/26/2019)
2019-12-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 11 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of whether any substantive areas of disagreement exist and identifying the parties' respective positions on or before February 12, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/9/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/12/2020 informing the Court of whether any substantive areas of disagreement exist and identifying the parties' respective positions. (dot) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-1312MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Motion to Conduct Initial Scheduling Conference Telephonically by PATRICK EDDINGTON (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2019)
2019-12-16MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's motion to conduct initial scheduling conference telephonically, Dkt. 12 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel may appear via telephone at the December 17, 2019 scheduling conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/16/19. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/16/2019)
2019-12-17Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 12/17/2019. Issues addressed. (Court Reporter: Scott Wallace.) (kt) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2020-01-23MINUTE ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the terms of the Court's revised standing order, which is available on the Court's website. Click for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/23/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/23/2020)
2020-02-1213Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-12MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 13 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before March 12, 2020, informing the Court of any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. The Court refers the parties to its revised standing order, Minute Order (Jan. 23, 2020), which explains the Court's requirement that the parties file previews of their anticipated arguments and participate in a pre-motion conference prior to filing motions for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/12/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-03-1214Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/12/2020)
2020-03-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 14 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2020 to alert the Court to whether the parties have been able to resolve any substantive areas of disagreement. If the parties anticipate filing dispositive motions at that juncture, the joint status report shall propose dates for the parties to file brief previews of their anticipated motions and any oppositions. The Court directs the parties to its updated standing order, which outlines the Court's new procedure concerning pre-motion conferences and filings in anticipation of those conferences. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/13/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/13/2020)
2020-03-3115Consent MOTION to Stay by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to stay deadlines, Dkt. 15 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the deadlines for processing and producing documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests are hereby STAYED until April 28, 2020. It is further ORDERED that, on or before April 28, 2020, Defendant shall file a status report updating Plaintiff and the Court regarding when Defendants believe they will be able to resume processing and production. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/31/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-01Case STAYED. (kt) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0116ERRATA by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE 15 Consent MOTION to Stay filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/01/2020)
2020-04-0217NOTICE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/02/2020)
2020-04-2718STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 18 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before May 28, 2020 informing the Court of the status of their work in this case, specifically in providing a search explanation to Plaintiff and proposing next steps. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/28/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-2819Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-05-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' joint status report, Dkt. 19 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/29/2020. (lcrdm1) Modified on 6/10/2020 to correct typo (kt). (Entered: 05/29/2020)
2020-07-1020Joint STATUS REPORT by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-13MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's status report, Dkt. 20 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before August 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/13/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-08-1721Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/17/2020)
2020-08-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the status report, Dkt. 21 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before September 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/18/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/18/2020)
2020-09-1722Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint status report, Dkt. 22 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further joint status report on or before October 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/17/20. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-10-2223Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Parties' joint status report, Dkt. 23 , it is hereby ORDERED that Parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/22/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-12-0124Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2021-01-1925Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 25 , it is herby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 01/19/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-02-2526Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 26 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before March 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 02/25/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-3127Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/31/2021)
2021-04-01MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 27 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 04/01/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-05-2728Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-05-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 28 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before July 27, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 05/28/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/28/2021)
2021-07-2629Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-07-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 29 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 28, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 07/26/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-09-2830Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
2021-09-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 30 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before October 28, 2021, proposing a briefing schedule for resolving the parties' present dispute. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/28/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/28/2021)
2021-10-1431Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-10-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 31 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before December 16, 2021. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 10/15/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-12-0332Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2021-12-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 32 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before February 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/6/2021. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2022-01-2133NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-2134MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joshua Burday by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the motion to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff's counsel, Dkt. 34 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. Joshua Burday is hereby granted leave to withdraw his appearance as counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/22/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/22/2022)
2022-02-1535Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/15/2022)
2022-02-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 35 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before April 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 2/17/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-04-1436STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/14/2022)
2022-04-15MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 36 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before June 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/15/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-1837NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/18/2022)
2022-06-2138STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 06/21/2022)
2022-06-24MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' status report, Dkt. 38 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file a further status report on or before August 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 6/24/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-08-2639STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's status report, Dkt. 39 , it is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall file a further status report on or before November 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 08/28/2022. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/28/2022)
2022-11-1440STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2023-01-1941STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 41 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before March 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/20/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-01-20Joint Status Report due by 3/24/2023 (zglw) (Entered: 01/20/2023)
2023-03-0142NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 03/01/2023)
2023-03-2343Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/23/2023)
2023-03-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 43 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before May 24, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/25/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/25/2023)
2023-05-2044Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/20/2023)
2023-05-2245ERRATA CORRECTION OF JSR by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE re 44 Status Report. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
2023-05-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 45 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before July 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 5/23/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
2023-07-2046Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 07/20/2023)
2023-07-20MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 46 , it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before September 21, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/20/2023. (lcdrm1) (Entered: 07/20/2023)
2023-09-1947NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stich Match on behalf of PATRICK EDDINGTON (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 09/19/2023)
2023-09-2148Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 48 , the parties are hereby ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on October 2, 2023 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 8. The parties should be prepared to discuss the remaining issues in this case, including attorneys' fees and costs, and a path forward to resolving those issues. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/25/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
2023-09-2649Unopposed MOTION for Remote Conference by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-09-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for remote conference, Dkt. 49 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on October 2, 2023 at 10:30 a.m., as previously scheduled, via zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 9/26/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/26/2023)
2023-10-02Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Pre-motion Conference held on 10/2/2023. Joint Status Report due on or before 11/9/2023. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (zglw) (Entered: 10/02/2023)
2023-11-0850Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, Dkt. 50 , and in light of section 10(a) of the Court's Standing Order, the Court finds a pre-motion conference is appropriate. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear on December 1, 2023, at 10:00 a.m. via zoom. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff submit a short notice setting forth the basis for his anticipated motion on or before November 20, 2023, and Defendants submit a short notice setting forth their anticipated response to the motion on or before November 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/9/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/09/2023)
2023-11-2051MEMORANDUM by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 11/20/2023)
2023-11-2752RESPONSE re 51 Memorandum filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/27/2023)
2023-11-2953ERRATA re 51 MEMORANDUM by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) Modified on 11/30/2023 to add docket link (zjm). (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-2954Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the Defendants' consent motion to reschedule the premotion conference, Dkt. 54 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The premotion conference scheduled for December 1, 2023 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to December 15, 2023 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 8. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 11/30/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-11-3055Unopposed MOTION Remote Conference by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-04MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's unopposed motion for remote conference, Dkt. 55 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. The parties are ORDERED to appear for a pre-motion conference on December 15, 2023 at 11:00 a.m., as previously scheduled, via zoom. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 12/4/2023. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 12/04/2023)
2023-12-15Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Randolph D. Moss: Pre-motion Conference held on 12/15/2023. Plaintiff to file a Motions for attorney fees on or before by 1/12/2024. Defendant's Response due on or before 2/12/2024 and Reply due on or before 3/11/2024. (Court Reporter Tammi Sefranek) (zglw) (Entered: 12/15/2023)
2024-01-0856Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Fee Petition by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Match, Stephen) (Entered: 01/08/2024)
2024-01-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Plaintiff's consent motion to extend time, Dkt. 56 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff file his fee petition on or before February 12, 2024; Defendants file their response on or before March 12, 2024; and Plaintiff file his reply on or before April 11, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 1/9/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 01/09/2024)
2024-02-1257MOTION for Attorney Fees by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Topic Decl, # 2 Declaration Eddington Decl)(Match, Stephen) (Entered: 02/12/2024)
2024-03-0558Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/05/2024)
2024-03-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to extend time, Dkt. 58 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees on or before March 22, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before April 22, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/6/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/06/2024)
2024-03-2259Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 03/22/2024)
2024-03-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's consent motion to extend time, Dkt. 59 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees on or before April 5, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before May 6, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 3/22/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 03/22/2024)
2024-04-0260Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/02/2024)
2024-04-02MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time, Dkt. 60 , it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees on or before April 12, 2024, and Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before May 13, 2024. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 4/2/2024. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 04/02/2024)
2024-04-1261RESPONSE re 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/12/2024)
2024-05-1362REPLY to opposition to motion re 57 MOTION for Attorney Fees N SUPPORT OF HIS PETITION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS filed by PATRICK EDDINGTON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(Match, Stephen) Modified on 5/17/2024 to add docket link (zjm). (Entered: 05/13/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar