Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHUGHES v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03278
Date Filed2019-10-21
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffARANDER M. HUGHES, JR.
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint
Opinion/Order [45]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-10-21Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 10/21/19. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-10-212MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (zmd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-10-213PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (zmd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-10-213PARTIAL PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (zmd) (Entered: 11/01/2019)
2019-11-124ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $31.73 from Prison Account of ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 11/12/19. (zmd) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-14Case Reassigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (zmd) (Entered: 11/14/2019)
2019-11-185SUMMONS (3) Issued as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zsb) (Entered: 11/18/2019)
2019-11-226RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 11/21/2019; UNITED STATES OF AMERICA served on 11/21/2019, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 11/21/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 11/21/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/21/2019.) (jf) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-237NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Chang on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Chang, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-238ANSWER to 1 Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Chang, William) (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-239VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 1/6/2020.....ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 6, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/23/2019. (lcapm1) Modified on 1/8/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 12/23/2019)
2019-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 12/26/2019)
2019-12-31Partial Filing Fee Received from ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. in the amount of $31.73, receipt number: 4616101941. (zrdj) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-0610MOTION for Extension of Time to Meet and Confer, or, Alternatively, to Modify the Court's Dec 23, 2019 Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William). Added MOTION to Modify on 1/6/2020 (jf). (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-06MINUTE ORDER. The court's Order dated December 23, 2019, is hereby vacated. Defendants shall file a Status Report by February 6, 2020, updating the court on the referrals of responsive records made to the FBI and ATF for processing. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/6/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/06/2020)
2020-01-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Status Report due by 2/6/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-0611STATUS REPORT by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(jf) (Entered: 01/14/2020)
2020-02-0612STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by April 6, 2020, updating the court on the status of the litigation. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/6/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/06/2020)
2020-02-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/6/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 02/07/2020)
2020-03-2413MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Chang, William) (Entered: 03/24/2020)
2020-03-2514ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay. Proceedings in this case are hereby stayed. Defendant shall submit a status report by May 1, 2020, and continuing every thirty days thereafter, advising the court about the status of the FBI's Record/Information Dissemination Section and, if operations have resumed, proposing a revised schedule for further proceedings. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/25/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 5/1/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-04-2715STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Chang, William) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-27MINUTE ORDER. Defendant shall file a Status Report by June 1, 2020, which updates the court on Defendant's processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/27/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-04-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Status Report due by 6/1/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 04/28/2020)
2020-05-1116Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION to Stay filed by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(eg) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-1117MOTION to Facilitate Settlement by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(eg) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-05-15MINUTE ORDER. The court already granted Defendants' motion to stay, and the Plaintiff offers no convincing argument to revisit that decision. As for Plaintiff's 17 request that the court facilitate settlement, that motion is denied, as the court can encourage the parties to settle but can do no more. The best course forward is for Defendants to produce responsive, non-exempt records to Plaintiff and then for the parties to determine whether any disputed issues remain. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/15/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/15/2020)
2020-06-0118STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff shall file a status report by July 15, 2020, stating: (1) whether he has received the productions described above; (2) whether he has had an opportunity to review them; and (3) what specific issues, if any, remain for litigation in this case. Defendant shall file a status report proposing a briefing schedule, if needed, within 7 days of the filing of Plaintiff's status report. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/1/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's Status Report due by 7/15/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/02/2020)
2020-06-1519STATUS REPORT by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (eg) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-19MINUTE ORDER. By Minute Order dated June 1, 2020, the court directed Defendants to propose a briefing schedule within seven days of Plaintiff's status report, if Plaintiff identified any outstanding issues. That instruction is now hereby vacated. Defendants shall attempt to meet and confer with Plaintiff and resolve any potential disagreements about the scope of production. Defendants shall file a Status Report by July 17, 2020, advising the court whether any outstanding disputes remain and, if so, propose a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/19/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/19/2020)
2020-06-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Status Report due by 7/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23Partial Filing Fee Received from ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR in the amount of $258.27, receipt number: 4616103367. (zrdj) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-1620STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Chang, William) (Entered: 07/16/2020)
2020-07-17MINUTE ORDER. By August 7, 2020, Plaintiff shall either (1) file a stipulation of dismissal with the court or (2) notify the court whether any additional issues remain for litigation and identify those issues. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/17/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Stipulation of Dismissal or Status Report due by 8/7/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-08-0521NOTICE of Appearance by April Denise Seabrook on behalf of All Defendants (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/05/2020)
2020-08-0522MOTION for Judgment on Pleadings by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR (eg) (Entered: 08/06/2020)
2020-08-12MINUTE ORDER. In light of Plaintiff's recent Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, the court hereby lifts the stay in this matter. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/12/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-1223NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney William Chang terminated. (Chang, William) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-25MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed a motion for judgment on the pleadings on August 5, 2020, to which the government has yet to file an opposition. The government shall by August 28, 2020, file a Status Report that proposes a briefing schedule for summary judgment and Plaintiff's pending motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/25/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-2824STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-2825ORDER governing further proceedings in this matter. See the attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on August 28, 2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff shall comply with Court's Order by 9/18/2020. Defendants' Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/20/2020. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition due by 11/20/2020. Defendants' Reply due by 12/16/2020.(zjd) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-10-0526STATUS REPORT by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (eg) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-1627MOTION to Amend/Correct 25 Order, Set/Reset Deadlines, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-16VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER FILED 11/30/2020.....MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Defendants' Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. Defendants' Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by December 4, 2020. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition shall be due by January 4, 2021. Defendants' Reply shall be due by January 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/16/2020. (lcapm1) Modified on 12/1/2020 (zjd). (Entered: 10/16/2020)
2020-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/4/2020. Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition due by 1/4/2021. Defendants' Reply due by 1/29/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-11-3028MOTION to Vacate Set/Reset Deadlines by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 28 Motion to Vacate Briefing Schedule. The current briefing schedule entered on October 16, 2020, is hereby vacated. Defendants shall file a Status Report by January 6, 2021, that updates the court on the processing of those records referred to ATF and the FBI. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/30/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/6/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2021-01-0629STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-07MINUTE ORDER entering the briefing schedule proposed in the parties' 29 Joint Status Report. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and their Motion for Summary Judgment on February 18, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on March 18, 2021; and (3) Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion for Summary Judgment on April 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/7/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Opposition and Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/18/2021. Reply and Opposition due by 3/18/2021. Reply due by 4/19/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-02-08Partial Filing Fee Received from Arander Hughes Jr. in the amount of $60.00, receipt number: 403909875712. (fb) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-0930MOTION to Amend/Correct Set/Reset Deadlines by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-02-11MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 30 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The schedule for further proceedings shall be as follows: (1) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and their Motion for Summary Judgment on April 30, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on May 31, 2021; and (3) Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion for Summary Judgment on June 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/11/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-04-2331MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-04-23MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 31 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The schedule for further proceedings shall be as follows: (1) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and their Motion for Summary Judgment on May 21, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on June 25, 2021; and (3) Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion for Summary Judgment on July 30, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/23/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-05-1932MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-05-19MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 32 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The schedule for further proceedings shall be as follows: (1) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and their Motion for Summary Judgment on June 22, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on July 30, 2021; and (3) Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion for Summary Judgment on August 31, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/19/2021. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-06-2133MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-2134ERRATA Submitting Corrected Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA re 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,,, filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit - Corrected Motion to Amend)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/21/2021)
2021-06-22MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 33 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The schedule for further proceedings shall be as follows: (1) Defendants shall file their Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and their Motion for Summary Judgment on June 25, 2021; (2) Plaintiff shall file his Reply to Defendants' Opposition to his Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and his Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment on August 10, 2021; and (3) Defendants shall file their Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to their Motion for Summary Judgment on September 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 6/22/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-06-2435Memorandum in opposition to re 22 MOTION for Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) Modified docket event/text on 6/25/2021 (eg). (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-2436MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit A - Griffin Decl. and Exhibits, # 4 Exhibit B - Madden Decl,, # 5 Exhibit C - Seidel Decl. and Exhibits)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-08-0237REPLY to opposition to motion re 22 MOTION for Judgment filed by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (eg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-0438Memorandum in opposition to re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (View Docket Entry 37 to view document). (eg) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-09-0939MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-09MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 39 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendants shall file their Reply in support of their Motion for Summary Judgment on or before October 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/9/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-10-2740MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-28MINUTE ORDER granting 40 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 36 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendant shall file the Response by November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/28/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-11-1041MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-11MINUTE ORDER granting Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. Defendant shall file its reply brief by November 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/11/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-1942REPLY to opposition to motion re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D - Madden Second Decl.)(Seabrook, April) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2022-05-25MINUTE ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall place under seal the 1 Complaint in this matter and the Griffin Declaration (including exhibits), ECF No. 36-3. The Clerk of Court shall then place on the docket a version of both filings with Plaintiff's date of birth and social security number redacted. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/25/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2643REDACTED DOCUMENT- 1 Complaint by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (zjd) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-2644REDACTED DOCUMENT- Griffin Declaration. Originally filed as Exhibit A to 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (zjd) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-07-0745MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the alternative, for Summary Judgment, and Defendants' 36 Motion for Summary Judgement. Defendants shall file a status report with an accompanying declaration within 30 days. See the attached Memorandum Opinion and Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/7/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-08-0146MOTION for Interim Fee Award by ARANDER M. HUGHES, JR. (Attachment: # 1 Attachments)(zed) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0447MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Seabrook, April) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-04MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an additional Status Report (including any supplemental declarations) by October 4, 2022, which updates the court on its re-review of relevant records and issue required releases. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/4/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-0449STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (See Docket Entry 47 to view document). (zed) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-0848NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Sean Michael Tepe on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney April D. Seabrook (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-1750RESPONSE re 46 MOTION for Interim Fee Award filed by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tepe, Sean) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-08-18MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's 50 Response, the court denies Plaintiff's 46 Motion for Interim Fee Award as moot. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/18/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar