Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMARTINEZ v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2019cv03528
Date Filed2019-11-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffFREDDY MARTINEZ
Case DescriptionFreddy Martinez, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning communications maintained by the Office of Legal Counsel pertaining to its review of the Trump administration's travel ban. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Martinez that his request was placed on the complex track for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Martinez filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-11-221COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6587371) filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-222NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Hart Burday on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 11/22/2019)
2019-11-25Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-11-253SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 11/25/2019)
2019-12-174RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 12/2/2019 (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-175RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 12/2/2019. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2019-12-176RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/2/2019. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/1/2020. (Burday, Joshua) (Entered: 12/17/2019)
2020-01-027NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-028ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Braswell, Marina) (Entered: 01/02/2020)
2020-01-039ORDER directing the parties to meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before January 17, 2020. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/3/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/03/2020)
2020-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/08/2020)
2020-01-1010NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Brenda A. Gonzalez on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Marina Utgoff Braswell (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/10/2020)
2020-01-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-17MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed submit a Joint Status Report by March 17, 2020, which updates the court on the search and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/17/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/17/2020)
2020-01-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 01/21/2020)
2020-03-1712Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 03/17/2020)
2020-03-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by May 18, 2020, which updates the court on the search and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/18/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/18/2020)
2020-03-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/18/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 03/19/2020)
2020-05-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by July 20, 2020, which updates the court on the search for and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/19/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/20/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 05/19/2020)
2020-05-2614NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Tilghman on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-07-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/20/2020)
2020-07-21MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by September 18, 2020, which updates the court on the search for and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/21/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/18/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 07/21/2020)
2020-09-1516NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Gonzalez, Brenda) (Entered: 09/15/2020)
2020-09-1817Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by November 17, 2020, which updates the court on the search for and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/18/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/18/2020)
2020-09-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2020. (zjd) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-11-1718Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-11-18MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by January 18, 2021, that updates the court on the search for and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/18/2020. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2021. (zjd) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2021-01-1519Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-15MINUTE ORDER. The parties are directed to submit a Joint Status Report by March 19, 2021, that updates the court on the search for and processing of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/15/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-03-1920Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 18, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/19/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-05-1821Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
2021-05-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 19, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/19/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-07-1922Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/19/2021)
2021-07-20MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 17, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/20/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/20/2021)
2021-09-1723Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-19MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 16, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/19/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/19/2021)
2021-11-16Case directly reassigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. Judge Amit P. Mehta is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1624Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-30MINUTE ORDER re 24 Status Report filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another Joint Status Report by January 18, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on November 30, 2021. (lcjmc2) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-0125NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Brenda A. Gonzalez-Horowitz terminated. (Gonzalez-Horowitz, Brenda) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2022-01-1826Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-18MINUTE ORDER re 26 Status Report filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another Joint Status Report by March 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 18, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 01/18/2022)
2022-01-2427MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Joshua Burday by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/24/2022)
2022-01-25ORDER granting 27 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The Court GRANTS the Motion to Withdraw As Attorney. The Clerk of the Court is directed to withdraw the appearance of Joshua Burday on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on January 25, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 01/25/2022)
2022-03-1828NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of FREDDY MARTINEZ (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-1829Joint STATUS REPORT by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-21MINUTE ORDER re 29 Status Report filed by FREDDY MARTINEZ: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another Joint Status Report by June 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on March 21, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-06-1630NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-1631Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 06/16/2022)
2022-06-17MINUTE ORDER re 31 by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE: The Court has reviewed the Parties' Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another joint status report by July 18, 2022. It is further ORDERED that the Parties shall file joint status reports every 90 days thereafter until further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on June 17, 2022. (lcjmc3) (Entered: 06/17/2022)
2022-07-0532NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. Attorney Dedra Seibel Curteman terminated. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-1833Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Tilghman, Michael) (Entered: 07/18/2022)
2022-09-0634NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michael A. Tilghman II (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-09-0635NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Michael A. Tilghman II (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/06/2022)
2022-10-1736Joint STATUS REPORT by FREDDY MARTINEZ. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 10/17/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar