Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleNational Immigrant Justice Center et al v. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2019cv11131
Date Filed2019-12-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Ona T. Wang
PlaintiffNational Immigrant Justice Center
PlaintiffKathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law
DefendantDepartment Of Homeland Security
DefendantImmigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [14]
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [47]
Opinion/Order [74]
Opinion/Order [90]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2019-12-041CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-042FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: Complaint. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) Modified on 12/5/2019 (pc). (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-043FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: Complaint. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) Modified on 12/5/2019 (pc). (Entered: 12/04/2019)
2019-12-054COMPLAINT against United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memorandum of Law, # 2 Exhibit B - First FOIA Request, # 3 Exhibit C - ICE's Email Acknowledgment, # 4 Exhibit D - Request For Clarification, # 5 Exhibit E - Plaintiff's September 20, 2018 Letter, # 6 Exhibit F - Second FOIA Request)(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for 4 Complaint,,. Filing fee $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-18208273, paid on 12/4/2019. (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Dorchak. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Dorchak to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Request for Issuance of Summons, 3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on summons do not match the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-05Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-055FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-056FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) Modified on 12/6/2019 (dnh). (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-057NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dina Rivka Kaufman on behalf of Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-058ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/20/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 12/5/2019) (jwh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)
2019-12-06***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joshua Dorchak to RE-FILE Document No. 6 Request for Issuance of Summons, 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the caption on the summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. The form used for the summons is not the correct official A.O. Summons form dated (Rev. 06/12). The party name listed in the defendant 'To:' section and in the as to docket entry must exactly match the pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh) (Entered: 12/06/2019)
2019-12-099REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement, re: 4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-0910REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Homeland Security, re: 4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 12/09/2019)
2019-12-1011ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (dnh) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2019-12-1012ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department Of Homeland Security. (dnh) (Entered: 12/10/2019)
2020-02-1013LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference and the associated deadlines to file a joint letter and a case management order addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dina R. Kaufman dated February 10, 2020. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1014ORDER granting 13 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: Application granted. Conference is adjourned from February 20, 2020 to April 20, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 4/20/2020 at 11:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 2/10/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 02/10/2020)
2020-02-1415NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay Cotten Nash on behalf of Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Nash, Lindsay) (Entered: 02/14/2020)
2020-03-0416FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #19) - SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Kaufman, Dina) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-0417FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #18) - SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Department Of Homeland Security served on 1/16/2020, answer due 2/6/2020. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center; Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Kaufman, Dina) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ldi). (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-0418SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-0419SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 03/04/2020)
2020-03-2620ORDER. Due to the COVID-19 situation, conferences with the Court in civil cases through May 1, 2020 will be held by teleconferencing. Counsel for the plaintiff(s) shall arrange for the conference call. Each scheduled conference will take place on the date and time originally set. The conference in this case is scheduled for April 20, 2020 at 11:30 a.m. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall: (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/26/2020) (rjm) (Entered: 03/26/2020)
2020-04-1321LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Joshua Dorchak dated April 13, 2020 re: letter filed in advance of the April 20, 2020 initial pre-trial conference. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Dorchak, Joshua) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-1622NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca Sol Tinio on behalf of Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-1623LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated April 16, 2020 re: Request for Extension of Deadline to File Answer. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-1624MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 23 Letter. ENDORSEMENT: Time to answer extended to April 24, 2020. The initial conference is adjourned from April 20, 2020 to May 13, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. No later than seventy-two hours before the conference, plaintiff(s)' counsel shall (a) docket a letter on ECF to the Court with a copy to all opposing counsel containing the call-in information and email the letter to castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov; and (b) for an initial pretrial conference, email a copy of the agreed upon (or disputed) Civil Case Management Plan & Scheduling Order to: castelnysdchambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. (Department Of Homeland Security answer due 4/24/2020; Immigration and Customs Enforcement answer due 4/24/2020. Initial Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 12:00 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/16/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 04/16/2020)
2020-04-2425ANSWER to 4 Complaint,,. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/24/2020)
2020-05-0826LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Rebecca S. Tinio dated May 8, 2020 re: Joint Report for Initial Conference. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-0827LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Dina R. Kaufman dated May 8, 2020 re: dial-in information for the May 13, 2020 telephone conference. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-13Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/13/2020. Case will be referred to Magistrate Judge for all purposes. (Nacanther, Florence) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-1328MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 26 Letter filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' agreement pg. 2 (three bullet points) is adopted as an order of the Court. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/13/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 05/13/2020)
2020-05-1429NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A CIVIL ACTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. IT IS ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/14/2020) (ama) (Entered: 05/14/2020)
2020-07-1030LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated July 10, 2020 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-2231MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 30 Letter Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/22/20) (yv) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-09-1032LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated September 10, 2020 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/10/2020)
2020-09-1233MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 32 Letter Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/12/20) (yv) (Entered: 09/14/2020)
2020-10-1334LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated October 13, 2020 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1435MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 34 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/14/2020) (rro) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-12-1536LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated December 15, 2020 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-1637MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 36 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/16/2020) (rro) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2021-02-1938LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated February 19, 2021 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-2339MEMO ENDORSEMENT re: 38 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/23/2021) (nb) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-05-0340LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated May 3, 2021 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/03/2021)
2021-05-1141MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 40 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/11/2021) (rro) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-07-0942LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated July 9, 2021 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-1343MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 42 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/13/2021) (mml) (Entered: 07/13/2021)
2021-09-1044LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated September 10, 2021 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-10-0645MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 44 Letter filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/6/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
2021-11-0846LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated November 8, 2021 re: Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report.. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-2347ORDER: The Court will hold a status conference in this matter on Tuesday, January 25, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. The parties shall file a joint status letter and proposed conference agenda by January 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 1/25/2022 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/23/2021) (rro) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2022-01-1048ORDER The January 25, 2022 Status Conference has been rescheduled to February 10, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in courtroom 20D, 500 Pearl Street. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (Quinn, Diane) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-1249LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated January 12, 2022 re: response to the Court's Order dated January 10, 2022 (Dkt. No. 48). Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1350MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 49 Letter, filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/13/2022) (tg) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-02-0451LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated February 4, 2022 re: joint status report and proposed conference agenda for an upcoming status conference on February 10, 2022. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 02/04/2022)
2022-02-0952ORDER. The Court has reviewed ECF 51. The conference scheduled for February 10, 2022 is adjourned sine die. The parties shall file another joint status letter by April 8, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order (rlf) (Entered: 02/09/2022)
2022-04-0853LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated April 8, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-1154ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status letter by May 6, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (sfh) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-05-0655LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated May 6, 2022 re: joint status report pursuant to the Court's order dated April 11, 2022. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-1056ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status letter by June 10, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (sfh) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-06-1057LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated June 10, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-1358ORDER. The parties shall file a joint status letter by July 8, 2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (sfh) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-07-0859LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated July 8, 2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/08/2022)
2022-07-1160MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 59 Letter filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter by August 19, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/11/2022) (ks) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-08-1961LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated August 19, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-2262MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 61 Letter, filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter by September 23, 2022. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/22/2022) (rro) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-09-2363LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated September 23, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-2764MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 63 Letter, filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall file a joint status letter on October 14, 2022. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/27/2022) (rro) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-10-1465LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated October 14, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 10/14/2022)
2022-10-2066MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 65 Letter filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: The parties shall submit a joint letter on the status of the above issues by November 18, 2022. The Court shall holda telephonic status conference in this matter on December 7, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. The dial-in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. If the parties are able to resolve their outstanding discovery issues by November 18, 2022, they may request an adjournment of the December 7 conference in their November 18 joint status letter. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 12/7/2022 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/20/2022) (ama) (Entered: 10/20/2022)
2022-11-1867LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated November 18, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-2168ORDER. The parties appear to have filed a duplicate version of their October 14 status letter as their November 18 status letter. (Compare ECF 67 to ECF 65). The parties are directed to file a corrected version of their November 18 status letter by November 23, 2022, pursuant to instructions provided in ECF 66. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang) (Text Only Order) (sfh) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2169LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated November 18, 2022 re: joint status report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-2270MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 69 Letter, filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. The telephonic status conference scheduled for December 7, 2022, ishereby adjourned to Tuesday, January 10, 2023 at 2:00 p.m. The dial in information (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. The parties shall file a joint conference agenda by January 6, 2023. The parties shall also file a joint status letter by December 21, 2022, reporting to the Court the status of their discovery issues. If the parties are able to resolve their outstanding discovery issues by December 21, 2022, they may request an adjournment of the January 10 conference in their December 21 joint status letter. ( Telephone Conference set for 1/10/2023 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 11/22/2022) (rro) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
2022-12-2171LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated December 21, 2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 12/21/2022)
2022-12-2272MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 71 Letter, filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center. ENDORSEMENT: The January 10, 2023 telephonic status conference will proceed as scheduled. (See ECF 70). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/22/2022) (rro) (Entered: 12/22/2022)
2023-01-0673LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Dina R. Kaufman dated January 6, 2023 Document filed by Kathryn O. Greenberg Immigration Justice Clinic At The Benjamin Cardozo School Of Law, National Immigrant Justice Center..(Kaufman, Dina) (Entered: 01/06/2023)
2023-01-1074ORDER: The Court held a status conference in this matter on January 10, 2023. Pursuant to instructions given on the record at the status conference, Defendants shall produce to Plaintiffs the first batch of previously produced documents with fewer or no redactions by February 28, 2023. The second batch shall be produced by March 31, 2023. By March 31, 2023, the parties shall file a status letter on the issue of Plaintiffs' follow-up requests for additional documents potentially responsive to their FOIA Requests. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/10/2023) (ama) (Entered: 01/10/2023)
2023-01-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 1/10/2023. (Quinn, Diane) (Entered: 01/31/2023)
2023-03-3175LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated March 31, 2023 re: Joint Status Report, Request for Extension, and Joint Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 03/31/2023)
2023-04-0376MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 75 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants' time to produce the second batch of documents is extended to May 1, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status letter by May 12, 2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 4/3/2023) (rro) (Entered: 04/03/2023)
2023-05-1277LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated May 12, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 05/12/2023)
2023-05-1578MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 77 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants' deadline to produce to Plaintiffs the second batch of previously produced documents is extended nunc pro tune to June 9, 2023. The parties shall file a joint status letter by June 12, 2023. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/15/2023) (rro) (Entered: 05/15/2023)
2023-06-1279LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated June 12, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 06/12/2023)
2023-06-1380MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 79 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 6/13/2023) (rro) (Entered: 06/13/2023)
2023-07-1181LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca Tinio dated July 11, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 07/11/2023)
2023-07-1282MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 81 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 7/12/2023) (ks) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-08-1783LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated August 17, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to Submit Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 08/17/2023)
2023-08-1884MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 83 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 8/18/2023) (vfr) (Entered: 08/18/2023)
2023-09-2285LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated September 22, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to File Further Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/22/2023)
2023-09-2586MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: 85 Letter filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 9/25/2023) (ama) (Entered: 09/25/2023)
2023-10-2787LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated October 27, 2023 re: Joint Status Report and Request for Leave to File Further Status Report and for Telephonic Conference. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 10/27/2023)
2023-10-3088MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 87 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Defendants' request for an adjournment of the October 27, 2023 production deadline is GRANTED nunc pro tune to December 5, 2023. The Court will hold a telephonic status conference in this matter on December 5, 2023 at 12:00 p.m. The dial-in information is (866) 390-1828, access code 1582687. The parties shall file a joint proposed agenda by Friday, December 1, 2023. (Telephone Conference set for 12/5/2023 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 10/30/2023) (rro) (Entered: 10/30/2023)
2023-12-0189LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca Tinio dated December 1, 2023 re: Joint Proposed Agenda for Telephonic Conference. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 12/01/2023)
2023-12-0590ORDER The Court held a status conference on December 5, 2023. Pursuant to instructions given on the record at the conference, Defendants shall inform Plaintiffs, by December 22, 2023, whether Defendants will run the narrower test searches for additional documents as discussed at the conference. Defendants are further directed to produce to Plaintiffs, no later than January 19, 2024, the second batch of previously produced documents. The parties are directed to file a joint status letter updating the Court on this matter on Friday, February 2, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 12/5/2023) (jca) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-05Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Status Conference held on 12/5/2023. (Quinn, Diane) (Entered: 12/21/2023)
2024-01-1291TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/5/2023 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/2/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/12/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/11/2024..(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-1292NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERNECE proceeding held on 12/5/2023 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-1993LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca Tinio dated January 19, 2024. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/19/2024)
2024-01-2394ORDER granting 93 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 1/23/2024) (rro) (Entered: 01/23/2024)
2024-02-0295LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated February 2, 2024 re: Status Report and Request for Enlargement of Time. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/02/2024)
2024-02-0596MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 95 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement ENDORSEMENT Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/5/2024) (jca) (Entered: 02/05/2024)
2024-02-1697LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Rebecca S. Tinio dated February 16, 2024 re: Request for Enlargement of Time and Joint Status Report. Document filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement..(Tinio, Rebecca) (Entered: 02/16/2024)
2024-02-2098MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 97 Letter, filed by Department Of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. ENDORSEMENT Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 2/20/2024) (rro) (Entered: 02/20/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar