Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleADAMS v. UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv00377
Date Filed2020-02-06
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffDALE BRENT ADAMS
DefendantUNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantGINA HASPEL CIA Director
DefendantALLISON FONG CIA FOIA Agent
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [42]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-02-06Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 2/6/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-061COMPLAINT against ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by DALE B. ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (zmd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-062MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DALE B. ADAMS (zmd) (Entered: 02/12/2020)
2020-02-243FIAT ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis"Leave to file without prepayment of costs GRANTED" Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 2/24/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-26Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-264SUMMONS (5) Issued as to ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (adh, ) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-265STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-02-265STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/26/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/26/2020)
2020-03-096MOTION to Consolidate Cases, MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by DALE B. ADAMS (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit A)(eg) (Entered: 03/11/2020)
2020-03-237MOTION to File Electronically CM/ECF by DALE B. ADAMS (eg) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-25MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 7 Motion for Leave to E-File. The Clerk of the Court is directed to register Plaintiff for ECF notifications at dadams41@hotmail.com, to register Plaintiff for an ECF account, and to send Plaintiff his account information so that he will be able to submit his filings electronically. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/25/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/25/2020)
2020-03-31MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff has filed two separate lawsuits against two separate sets of Defendants. Cf. Adams v. United States National Security Agency , 20-cv-00479 (TNM). Now pending before the Court is Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Upon consideration of the filings in both cases, Plaintiff's brief, and the relevant law, the Court finds that Plaintiff has failed to establish good cause to consolidate the two cases. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Consolidate is DENIED without prejudice. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff may amend his pleading by filing an Amended Complaint in compliance with applicable rules. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 ("A party may amend its pleading once as a matter of course within: (A) 21 days after serving it, or (B) if the pleading is one to which a responsive pleading is required, 21 days after service of a responsive pleading or 21 days after service of a motion under Rule 12(b), (e), or (f), whichever is earlier."). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/31/2020)
2020-04-298First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by DALE BRENT ADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C with Affidavits in Support)(ADAMS, DALE). Added MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on 5/1/2020 (eg). (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-05-01MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 8 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction or Restraining Order, to the extent intelligible, raises issues that have no apparent connection to the claims underlying this Freedom of Information Act case. Therefore, the motion is DENIED. See Aamer v. Obama, 742 F.3d 1023, 1038 (D.C. Cir. 2014) (noting that "the first and most important factor" in deciding a motion for preliminary injunction is "whether petitioners have established a likelihood of success on the merits" of the claims to be decided). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/1/2020.(lctnm3) (Entered: 05/01/2020)
2020-05-089RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General May 4, 2020. (ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 05/08/2020)
2020-05-0810RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/4/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/3/2020. (See Docket Entry 9 to view document). (znmw) (Entered: 05/12/2020)
2020-06-0311ANSWER to 1 Complaint by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/03/2020)
2020-06-0412Third MOTION to Amend/Correct by DALE BRENT ADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A-C)(ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-04MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 12 Motion to Amend/Correct, the Court finds that Plaintiff has not articulated the relief he seeks. Plaintiff's motion states that he "made an oversight failing to make necessary redactions in the original complaint." But aside from this statement, it is unclear what amendments Plaintiff seeks to make. It is therefore ORDERED that the 12 Motion to Amend/Correct is DENIED without prejudice to Plaintiff filing an Amended Complaint in compliance with applicable rules. In accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15, Plaintiff may amend his pleading once as a matter of course within 21 days after service of Defendants' 11 Answer. If Plaintiff intends to do so, he must file the proposed Amended Complaint along with a redline comparison indicating all changes. See 5 Standing Order, para. 6. And in accordance with Local Civil Rule 7(m), Plaintiff shall confer with opposing counsel before filing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/4/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/04/2020)
2020-06-1513RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/11/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/5/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/4/2020.) (eg) (Entered: 06/16/2020)
2020-06-2414First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Supplemental Complaint by DALE BRENT ADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline complaint corrections, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Proposed Amended Complaint Exhibits A-J)(ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-25MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/25/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-2515AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY filed by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(eg) (Entered: 06/26/2020)
2020-07-0916ANSWER to 15 Amended Complaint by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a Complaint and an Answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before July 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/09/2020)
2020-07-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/30/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-3017Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 28, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Trevor N. McFadden on 7/31/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-07-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-09-2818Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before November 6, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/29/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/6/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-11-0619Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/06/2020)
2020-11-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 18, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/9/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/18/2020. (hmc) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-1920APPLICATION for Writ of Petition for Writ of Prohibition by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-2321ORDER denying Plaintiff's 20 Application for Writ of Petition for Writ of Prohibition. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/23/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-12-1722Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before February 18, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/17/2020. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-18Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2021-02-0823Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 23 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before March 25, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/8/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/25/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-03-2524Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/25/2021)
2021-03-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before May 24, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/26/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-03-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/24/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 03/26/2021)
2021-05-2425STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/24/2021)
2021-05-26DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 6/2/2021.....MINUTE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court instructed the parties to file a Joint Status Report by May 24, 2021. See Min. Order (Mar. 26, 2021). The public docket reflects that the parties did not file a Joint Status Report by this deadline. See Status Report, ECF No. 25 (representing that "Plaintiff did not respond with consent to file the latest version"). It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall, by June 2, 2021, SHOW CAUSE as to why the claims against the Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See LCvR 83.23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/26/2021. (lctnm3) Modified on 6/3/2021 (hmc). (Entered: 05/26/2021)
2021-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause due by 6/2/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 05/26/2021)
2021-05-3026Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's Status Report by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 05/30/2021)
2021-06-02MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Plaintiff's 26 Emergency Motion for Order to Show Cause and Plaintiff's Status Report, the Court hereby discharges the Minute Order to Show Cause dated May 26, 2021. It is further ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before July 9, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/2/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 06/02/2021)
2021-06-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 06/03/2021)
2021-07-0527NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/05/2021)
2021-07-0928Joint STATUS REPORT by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-09MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 9, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/9/2021. (lctnm2) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 07/12/2021)
2021-08-0429Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Joint Status Report by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/04/2021)
2021-08-05MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants' 29 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their next Joint Status Report on or before August 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/5/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2021. (zhmc) (Entered: 08/05/2021)
2021-08-3030MOTION for Extension of Time to Joint Status Report by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-31MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 30 Motion for Extension of Time. It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file their next Joint Status Report on or before September 30, 2021. The Parties are directed to Paragraph 9(A) of the Court's 5 Standing Order requiring that motions for extensions of time be filed at least four business days prior to the first affected deadline. Future requests for extensions of time that do not comply with this request may be denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/31/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 08/31/2021)
2021-09-3031Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-10-01MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 31 Joint Status Report, the parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before November 12, 2021. Plaintiff shall file his combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before December 13, 2021. Defendant shall file its combined opposition and reply on or before January 13, 2022. Plaintiff shall file his reply, if any, on or before February 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/1/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by November 12, 2021. Plaintiff's combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment due by December 13, 2021. Defendant's combined opposition and reply due by before January 13, 2022. Plaintiff's reply, if any, due by February 11, 2022.(hmc) (Entered: 10/03/2021)
2021-11-0832Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to FILE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , Consent MOTION to Modify BRIEFING SCHEDULE by UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-09MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 32 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before December 13, 2021. Plaintiff shall file his combined cross-motion for summary judgment and opposition on or before January 12, 2022. Defendant shall file its combined opposition and reply on or before February 11, 2022. Plaintiff shall file his reply on or before March 14, 2022. Further extension requests will be disfavored. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/9/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-11-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 12/13/2021; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 1/12/2022; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 2/11/2022; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 3/14/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/09/2021)
2021-12-1133MOTION for Summary Judgment by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanna Blaine, # 2 Exhibit Declaration Exhibits, # 3 Central Intelligence Agency Vaughn Index)(Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 12/11/2021)
2021-12-1334ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond or the Court may deem Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment conceded. Plaintiff's response is due by January 12, 2022. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/13/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2022-01-0835Motion for a Time Extension to Respond re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment Response Time Extension filed by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in support of motion, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits A-J)(ADAMS, DALE) Modified docket event/entry on 1/10/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 01/08/2022)
2022-01-08MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 35 Motion for a Time Extension to Respond. Plaintiff claims, without evidence, that Defendants have hacked him and shared evidence with defense counsel. This is not a "valid reason" for delay, so the Court denies the motion. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 6(b)(1)(A) (allowing the Court to extend deadlines for good cause); Mann v. Castiel, 681 F.3d 368, 375 (stating that "good cause means a valid reason for delay") (cleaned up). More, Adams did not comply with Paragraph 9(A) of the Courts 5 Standing Order requiring him to file his motion for an extension four business days before the next affected deadline. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/8/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/08/2022)
2022-01-0936Proposed MOTION for Reconsideration of 01/08/2022 minute Order by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Reconsideration Exhibits A_C)(ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 01/09/2022)
2022-01-10MINUTE ORDER denying Adams' 36 Motion for Reconsideration. To merit reconsideration under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure (FRCP) 59(e), Adams must show "an intervening change of controlling law, the availability of new evidence, or the need to correct a clear error or prevent manifest injustice." Trudel v. SunTrust Bank, 924 F.3d 1281, 1287 (D.C. Cir. 2019) (cleaned up). Alternatively, FRCP 60(b) lists five grounds for reconsideration, including mistake, newly discovered evidence, fraud, or any reason that justifies relief. Adams' motion meets none of these standards. He claims, as before, that "someone" is deleting his files. He claims he took time to file a DC Bar complaint rather than working on his briefing. He cites his bad health, but he did not object to this schedule when it was proposed and cites no new health concerns that have arisen since the Court ordered the briefing schedule. Adams has therefore failed to show his motion has merit. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/10/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-1237RESPONSE re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit with Exhibits)(ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-02-1038REPLY to opposition to motion re 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ALLISON FONG, GINA HASPEL, UNITED STATES CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Vanna Blaine)(Johnson, Stephanie) Modified docket link on 2/14/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 02/10/2022)
2022-02-1139RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Reconsideration by DALE BRENT ADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Senators intent for CIA Oversight)(ADAMS, DALE) Modified docket event/text on 2/14/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 02/11/2022)
2022-02-2240First MOTION for More Definite Statement for Summary Judgment by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-23MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff Adams' First Motion for a More Definite Statement. Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(e) requires this motion to be "made before filing a responsive pleading." But Adams has already opposed the Government's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment in his 37 Response. Adams' motion is therefore untimely. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/23/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-2341MOTION to Take Judicial Notice by DALE BRENT ADAMS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(ADAMS, DALE) Modified docket event/text on 2/23/2022 (zeg). (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-07-1442MEMORANDUM ORDER re Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Take Judicial Notice. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/14/22. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: CIA's supplemental filing due by 10/13/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-09-1143First MOTION to Modify Standing Order for Cases Before Judge Trevor N McFadden by DALE BRENT ADAMS. (ADAMS, DALE) (Entered: 09/11/2022)
2022-09-12MINUTE ORDER denying the 43 Motion to Modify Standing Order. This Court has discretion to set its policies and procedures and declines to modify them at this time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/12/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar