Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCentro de Trabajadores Unidos v. United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DistrictNorthern District of Illinois
CityChicago
Case Number1:2020cv02300
Date Filed2020-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeHonorable John Robert Blakey
PlaintiffCentro de Trabajadores Unidos
Case DescriptionCentro de Trabajadores Unidos submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records concerning I-9 audits in Illinois and policy and operational documents related to such audits. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and indicated that it intended to classify CTU as a commercial requester. CTU informed the agency that it was not a commercial requester and asked for a fee waiver instead. After hearing nothing further from the agency, CTU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-131COMPLAINT filed by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16928958. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - G, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-132ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Centro de Trabajadores Unidos by Matthew Vincent Topic (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/13/2020)
2020-04-14CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Beth W. Jantz. Case assignment: Random assignment. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-143NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (aee, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-14SUMMONS Issued as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ng, ) (Entered: 04/14/2020)
2020-04-154ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Centro de Trabajadores Unidos by Wallace Bertram Hilke (Hilke, Wallace) (Entered: 04/15/2020)
2020-04-175MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Pursuant to General Order 17-0005, this case falls within the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) Project, and the "Standing Order in MIDP Cases" now governs the conduct of the litigants in this matter. Under the MIDP, this Court shall enforce the MIDP Standing Order via the Court's inherent authority (including the contempt of court power) and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Consequently, both the parties and their attorneys are hereby ordered to review and fully comply with the MIDP Standing Order, which is available on the Court's homepage: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/_assets/_documents/MIDP%20Standing%20Order.pdf. The parties are further advised that in light of the MIDP's intended goal of reducing the traditional cost and delay of federal civil litigation, this Court will not grant routine motions for extensions of time to meet the deadlines imposed by the MIDP Standing Order (even agreed motions made jointly by the parties). During the course of the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312)818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. The litigants are further ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Courts own standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. An initial status conference is hereby set for 6/18/2020 at 9:45 a.m. in Courtroom 1203. At the status conference, the Court will discuss the MIDP and ask the parties questions to verify that they have reviewed and complied with the MIDP Standing Order. Without exception, the parties must also file a status report no later than 6/8/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/17/2020)
2020-04-246ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)
2020-05-187ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Centro de Trabajadores Unidos by Joshua Lee Loevy (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-188STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 05/18/2020)
2020-05-269ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)
2020-06-1010MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The 6/18/20 initial status conference is stricken. A review of the docket shows that summons issued 4/14/20, suggesting that any answer or other responsive pleading would be due under the Federal Rules and the Third Amended General Order 20-0012, 7/13/20 at the earliest (the docket does not indicate whether or when summons was returned executed). Based upon this schedule, the parties shall file a joint status report by 7/27/20 using the model status report template available on the Court's webpage under the "initial/reassignment status conferences and reports" tab. The Court will set additional dates in a future order. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/10/2020)
2020-06-1811SUMMONS Returned Executed by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos as to United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/28/2020, answer due 6/29/2020 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - US Attorney General, # 2 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed - US Attorney)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-2212MOTION by Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint 1 (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2213NOTICE of Motion by Jimmy Lorenzo Arce for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 12 before Honorable John Robert Blakey on 6/30/2020 at 09:45 AM. (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 06/22/2020)
2020-06-2314MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's motion for extension of time to file answer 12 is granted. Any answer shall be filed on or before 7/13/2020. Motion hearing set for 6/30/2020 is stricken. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-1015ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk9, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)
2020-07-1316MOTION by Defendant United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement for extension of time to file answer (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/13/2020)
2020-07-1417MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer 16 is granted and any answer shall be filed on or before 7/17/2020. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-1718ANSWER to Complaint by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/17/2020)
2020-07-2719STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/27/2020)
2020-08-2520ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Centro de Trabajadores Unidos by Emma Melton (Melton, Emma) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-2521WITHDRAWING Wallace Hilke as counsel for Plaintiff Centro de Trabajadores Unidos and substituting Emma Melton as counsel of record (Melton, Emma) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2021-04-3022MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties shall file an updated status report by 5/27/21 proposing a reasonable schedule for summary judgment briefing. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/30/2021)
2021-05-2723STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-06-0124MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties shall file an updated status report by 6/25/21. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/01/2021)
2021-06-2525STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-07-0726MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the parties' representations, see 25 , the Court directs the parties to file an updated status report by 7/26/21. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)
2021-07-2627STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-08-2528STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-2629MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the parties' representations, see 28 , the Court directs the parties to file an updated status report by 9/24/21. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-09-2930MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court previously ordered the parties to file an updated status report by 9/24/21. 29 ; they failed to comply. If the parties fail to file an updated status report by 10/15/21, the Court will dismiss this case. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-1531STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-1932MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the parties' representations, see 31 , the Court directs the parties to file an updated status report by 11/19/21. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/19/2021)
2021-11-1933STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-2334MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court has reviewed the parties' 11/19/21 status report 33 and hereby directs the parties to file an updated status report by 1/19/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes with regard to Defendant's production. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2022-01-1935STATUS Report Joint by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2022)
2022-01-2136MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The Court has reviewed the parties' 1/19/22 status report 35 and hereby directs the parties to file an updated status report by 3/21/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes with regard to Defendant's production. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-03-2137STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-2538MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 3/21/22 status report 37 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 5/20/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes with regard to Defendant's production. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-05-2039STATUS Report Joint by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/20/2022)
2022-06-0140MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 5/20/22 status report 39 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 7/20/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes with regard to Defendant's production. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-07-2041STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2242MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 7/20/22 status report 41 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 8/22/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes with regard to Defendant's production and proposing next steps to advance this matter. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-08-2243STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 08/22/2022)
2022-08-2444MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 7/20/22 status report 43 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 9/30/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes about Defendant's production and proposing next steps to advance this matter. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 08/24/2022)
2022-09-3045STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-0546MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 9/30/22 status report 45 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 11/4/22 concerning any remaining issues or disputes about Defendant's production and proposing next steps to advance this matter. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-11-0447STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2022)
2022-11-2848MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 11/4/22 status report 47 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 1/19/23 concerning any remaining issues or disputes about Defendant's production and proposing next steps to advance this matter. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2023-01-1949STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/19/2023)
2023-01-2350MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 1/19/23 status report 49 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 3/17/23 concerning any remaining issues or disputes about Defendant's production and proposing next steps to advance this matter. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 01/23/2023)
2023-03-1751STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 03/17/2023)
2023-04-1352MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties shall file an updated status report by 5/16/23 proposing next steps to bring this matter to a close. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 04/13/2023)
2023-05-1653STATUS Report Joint Status Report by United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Arce, Jimmy) (Entered: 05/16/2023)
2023-05-2354MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: The parties shall file an updated status report by 7/14/23 proposing next steps to bring this matter to a close. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
2023-07-1455STATUS Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/14/2023)
2023-07-1756MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in the parties' 7/14/23 status report 55 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 9/13/23 proposing next steps to bring this matter to a close. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 07/17/2023)
2023-09-1357STATUS Report Plaintiff's Status Report by Centro de Trabajadores Unidos (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 09/13/2023)
2023-09-1558MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: Based upon the representations in Plaintiff's 9/13/23 status report 57 , the Court orders the parties to file an updated status report by 11/13/23 proposing next steps to bring this matter to a close. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a stipulation of dismissal by this date. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 09/15/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar