Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-04-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7019015) filed by CITIZENS UNITED, DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Summons to the Attorney General, # 5 Summons to the DOJ OIG, # 6 Summons to the US Attorney)(Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-14 | 2 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS UNITED, DAILY CALLER NEWS FOUNDATION (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-14 | | Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-14 | 3 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) (Entered: 04/14/2020) |
2020-04-30 | 4 | ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 04/30/2020. (DM) (Entered: 04/30/2020) |
2020-05-07 | 5 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. All Plaintiffs, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 4/21/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 5/21/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 04/21/2020. (Morgan, Jeremiah) (Entered: 05/07/2020) |
2020-05-21 | 6 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL.(Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/21/2020) |
2020-05-22 | 7 | ORDER requiring parties to meet and confer and submit joint status report by no later than JUNE 19, 2020. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 22, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-05-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 6/19/2020. (dot) (Entered: 05/22/2020) |
2020-06-19 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT on Behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/19/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 8 Joint Status Report. The parties indicate that there is limited access to and review of the documents potentially responsive to Plaintiffs' request due to restrictions implemented in light of COVID-19. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the parties' suggestion that they file a further status report with the Court on or before JULY 10, 2020 updating the Court on their progress. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on June 22, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-06-22 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2020, updating the Court on their progress. (dot) (Entered: 06/22/2020) |
2020-07-10 | 9 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/10/2020) |
2020-07-13 | | MINUTE ORDER: The Court has received the parties' 9 Second Joint Status Report. The parties explain that the Department of Justice's Office of the Inspector General has determined that many of the documents potentially responsive to the FOIA requests will have to be processed by other DOJ components, and so the Office has approved a single staff member to collect and disseminate the materials for processing. The Office hopes to complete this by the end of August 2020. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS the parties' suggestion that they file a further joint status report with the Court on or before SEPTEMBER 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on July 13, 2020. (lccck1) (Entered: 07/13/2020) |
2020-07-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2020. (kt) (Entered: 07/13/2020) |
2020-09-04 | 10 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/04/2020) |
2020-10-15 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/15/2020) |
2020-12-03 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/03/2020) |
2021-01-29 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/29/2021) |
2021-03-22 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/22/2021) |
2021-05-21 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/21/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the Parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-09-21 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2021) |
2021-11-22 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/22/2021) |
2022-01-21 | 19 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/21/2022) |
2022-03-23 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/23/2022) |
2022-05-25 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 05/25/2022) |
2022-07-22 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/22/2022) |
2022-09-22 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT on behalf of the parties by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Kossak, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/22/2022) |
2022-11-02 | 24 | NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Danielle Enlow on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 11/02/2022) |
2022-11-22 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 11/22/2022) |
2023-01-23 | 26 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-03-24 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 03/24/2023) |
2023-05-23 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE OFFICE OF THE INSPECTOR GENERAL. (Enlow, Courtney) (Entered: 05/23/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |