Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleCALLIMACHI v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01119
Date Filed2020-04-29
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffRUKMINI CALLIMACHI
Case DescriptionRukmini Callimachi, an investigative reporter for the New York Times, submitted six FOIA requests to the CIA for records concerning her stepfather, Mihail Horia Botez. Callimachi's requests also asked for records on various individuals who had worked in the Romanian communist government. The agency eventually acknowledged receipt of all the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Callimachi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-04-291COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7072756) filed by RUKMINI CALLIMACHI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet, # 13 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-292NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of RUKMINI CALLIMACHI (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 04/29/2020)
2020-04-30Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-303SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-04-304STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 30, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/30/2020)
2020-05-095NOTICE of Appearance by Alan Burch on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 05/09/2020)
2020-06-086ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Burch, Alan) (Entered: 06/08/2020)
2020-06-187RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 5/7/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-188RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 5/7/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-189RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/7/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/6/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/18/2020)
2020-06-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties to submit their overdue Joint Meet and Confer Report, see 4 Standing Order, ¶ 3(b)(ii), by June 29, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 24, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/24/2020)
2020-06-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Report due by 6/29/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 06/25/2020)
2020-06-2910Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by August 28, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 29, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 06/29/2020)
2020-08-2811Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Burch, Alan) (Entered: 08/28/2020)
2020-08-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by October 15, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 31, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/15/2020. (zhmc) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-2112NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Alan Burch (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-10-1513Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by November 13, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 18, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 10/18/2020)
2020-10-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/13/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-11-1314Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 11/13/2020)
2020-11-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by December 14, 2020. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 16, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/14/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 11/17/2020)
2020-12-1415Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-17MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 29, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 17, 2020. (lcbah1) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/29/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2021-01-2816Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-29MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by March 10, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint status report due by 3/10/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-03-1017ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) Modified on 3/11/2021 (zeg). (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-11NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 17 Status Report was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct case number. (zeg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-1118NOTICE of Errata by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Attachments: # 1 Joint Status Report dated March 10, 2021)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' [18-1] Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by April 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 11, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-04-0919Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-04-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by May 7, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 12, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-04-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/7/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 04/12/2021)
2021-05-0720Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 05/07/2021)
2021-05-07MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by July 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 7, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/07/2021)
2021-05-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-07-0921Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by September 9, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 13, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 07/13/2021)
2021-07-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-09-0922Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-10MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 22 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by November 12, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 10, 2021. (lcbah1) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-09-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2021-11-0223NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY Substituting for attorney Kathleene Molen (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/02/2021)
2021-11-1224Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-12MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 24 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit a joint status report by January 13, 2022. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 12, 2021. (lcbah1) Modified on 11/12/2021 (lcam). (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-12Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/13/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2022-01-1325Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-13MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 14, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court about the status of this matter and any proposed schedule governing the production of responsive records. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 13, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/14/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-03-1126NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of RUKMINI CALLIMACHI (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-03-1427Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-14MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by May 25, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court about the status of this matter and any proposed schedule governing the production of responsive records. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 14, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-05-2528Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 25, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court about the status of this matter and any proposed schedule governing the production of responsive records. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 25, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/25/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-08-2529Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/25/2022)
2022-08-26MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 29 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by November 17, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court about the status of this matter and any proposed schedule governing the production of responsive records. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 26, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-11-1730Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit another joint status report regarding the defendant's progress on the production of responsive records and a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings by May 31, 2023. At this time, the Court will not require the defendant to increase its proposed processing rate. "Courts have broad discretion to determine a reasonable processing rate for a FOIA request" and "often give deference to the agencys release policies." Colbert v. FBI , No. 16-cv-1790 (DLF), 2018 WL 6299966, at *3 (D.D.C. Sept. 3, 2018). Due to the nature of plaintiff's request and the large number of sensitive documents requiring multiple levels of review, the current rate of production appears reasonable and in line with other comparable FOIA cases. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 18, 2022. (lcbah1) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-11-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/31/2023. (ztg) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar