Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleRYO v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01166
Date Filed2020-05-05
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Timothy J. Kelly
PlaintiffEMILY RYO
Case DescriptionEmily Ryo, law professor at the University of Southern California, submitted three FOIA requests to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records containing data on detention of individuals who were picked up by and detained by the agencies. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency provided some data in response to Ryo's first FOIA request but after she appealed, ICE agreed to conduct a new search. In response to her second FOIA request, the agency told Ryo that it found no records. She filed an administrative appeal of that decision but heard nothing further. After hearing nothing further from the agencies pertaining to any of her requests, Ryo filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantU.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION
DefendantU.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-05-051COMPLAINT against U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7091016) filed by Emily Ryo. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons)(Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. (adh, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-052SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)
2020-05-283RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/12/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/11/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/12/2020., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION served on 5/11/2020; U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 5/11/2020; U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT served on 5/13/2020 (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 05/28/2020)
2020-06-114ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/11/2020)
2020-06-12MINUTE ORDER: Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure by July 14, 2020. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 6/12/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 06/12/2020)
2020-07-145Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 07/14/2020)
2020-07-15MINUTE ORDER: In light of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report by August 14, 2020, and every sixty days thereafter, until the Court orders otherwise. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 7/15/2020. (lctjk1) (Entered: 07/15/2020)
2020-08-146Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 08/14/2020)
2020-09-217NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Kaiser Creighton on behalf of EMILY RYO (Creighton, Sara) (Main Document 7 replaced on 9/23/2020) (znmw). (Entered: 09/21/2020)
2020-10-138Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-12-109Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2021-02-0510Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-04-0911Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-06-0812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-3013NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to EMILY RYO. Attorney Sara Kaiser Creighton terminated. (Creighton, Sara) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-3014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-08-0615Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-10-0516Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
2021-11-0517STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant CBP only by EMILY RYO. (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-12-0318Joint STATUS REPORT by EMILY RYO. (Rasheed, Mehreen) (Entered: 12/03/2021)
2022-02-0219Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 02/02/2022)
2022-04-0420Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-05-2621Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. CUSTOMS AND BORDER PROTECTION, U.S. IMMIGRATION AND CUSTOMS ENFORCEMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar