Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHuddleston v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictEastern District of Texas
CitySherman
Case Number4:2020cv00447
Date Filed2020-06-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeDistrict Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III
PlaintiffBrian Huddleston
Case DescriptionBrian Huddleston submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning Seth Rich or Aaron Rich. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Huddleston filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [25]
FOIA Project Annotation: A federal court in Texas has ruled that the FBI failed to show exceptional circumstances existed because of the pandemic and has ordered the agency to begin to process Brian Huddleston's request which encompassed a potential 20,000 pages of responsive records. The court showed sympathy for the plight of the FBI, noting that "if the COVID-19 crisis is not an 'exceptional circumstance' under ยง552(a)(6)(C)(i), the court is unsure when the exception would ever apply." But the court then pointed out that "even in these extraordinary times, the degree of malleability Defendants propose for the proceedings is unreasonable. . . The shapeless nature of the relief Defendants seek is anything but transparent." Explaining the agency's proposed schedule further, the court indicated that "the proposed processing rate is impermissible. Given the information currently before the Court, processing 250 pages per month during this reduced-staffing period and 500 pages per month when staffing returns to normal would be an unreasonable delay." The court observed that "the vague and dragged-out timeline Defendants suggest cannot be sustained without a greater showing of exceptional circumstances because 'stale information' produced pursuant to FOIA requests 'is of little value.' Granting the relief Defendants seek would thwart FOIA's 'basic purpose' of 'opening agency action to the light of public scrutiny.'"
Issues: Delay - Exceptional circumstance
Opinion/Order [70]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-011COMPLAINT against Federal Bureau of Investigation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7814390.), filed by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (FOIA request), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01Case ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-01In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-06-012SUMMONS Issued as to Federal Bureau of Investigation. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2020)
2020-07-073AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brian Huddleston.(Clevenger, Ty) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/7/2020: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3) (baf, ). (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-074SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice (Attn: Office of the Attorney General). (baf, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-07-075SUMMONS Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice (Attn: U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Texas). (baf, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)
2020-08-126ANSWER to 3 Amended Complaint by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice.(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 08/12/2020)
2020-08-13In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (baf, ) (Entered: 08/13/2020)
2020-09-017ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/6/2020. Rule 16 Management Conference set for 10/22/2020 at 09:00 AM in Ctrm 208 (Sherman) before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/1/2020. (rpc, ) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-10-058REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 10/05/2020)
2020-10-14The Court hereby CANCELS the 10/22/20 Scheduling Conference. The Court will enter a Scheduling Order. (tls) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-229SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/22/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)
2020-12-1610MOTION to Stay re 9 Scheduling Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 12/16/2020)
2020-12-3011RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION to Stay re 9 Scheduling Order filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (FOIA request letter), # 2 Exhibit 2 (FBI response to FOIA), # 3 Exhibit 3 (FOIA appeal), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Brooklyn complaint), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Hardy declaration), # 6 Exhibit 6 (Letter to Judge Bloom), # 7 Exhibit 7 (Motion re supplemental evidence), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Hersh deposition), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Butowsky declaration))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-05Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of pleadings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place voluminous pleadings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls) (Entered: 01/05/2021)
2021-01-0612REPLY to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Stay re 9 Scheduling Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 01/06/2021)
2021-01-0713SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 10 MOTION to Stay re 9 Scheduling Order filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-1414Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-1415RESPONSE in Support re 10 MOTION to Stay re 9 Scheduling Order Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice . (Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 01/14/2021)
2021-01-1516ORDER - granting 14 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/15/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-2017Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendants' Proposed Schedule by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/20/2021) (baf, ). (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2018RESPONSE to 15 Response in Support of Motion filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2219ORDER - granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Response. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/22/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-02-0120MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines (Dkt. 10 ) is hereby GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is FURTHER ORDERED the Scheduling Order in this case is amended as follows: April 23, 2021 Deadline for Defendants' Complete Production of Documents and Vaughn Index; May 24, 2021 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; June 23, 2021 Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; July 7, 2021 Defendants' Reply and Opposition; July 21, 2021 Plaintiff's Reply. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/1/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-04-0821Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,, Scheduling Order by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-1322RESPONSE in Opposition re 21 Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,, Scheduling Order filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-2023REPLY to Response to Motion re 21 Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,, Scheduling Order filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation . (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-2624SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 21 Second MOTION to Stay re 20 Memorandum & Opinion,,, Order,, Scheduling Order filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Partial production))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 04/26/2021)
2021-05-0725MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. It is therefore ORDERED that Defendants' Second Motion to Stay Scheduling Order Deadlines (Dkt. 21 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Order in this case is amended as follows: April 23, 2021 First Production, May 24, 2021 Second Production, June 24, 2021 Third Production, July 24, 2021 Final Production. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/7/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/07/2021)
2021-06-1426***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Copies and In Camera Review by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (April FBI production), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Sines transcript), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Hardy declaration), # 4 Exhibit 4 (NY motion to permit discovery), # 5 Exhibit 5 (NY motion for evidentiary hearing), # 6 Exhibit 6 (NY response to MSJ), # 7 Exhibit 7 (NY complaint), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Joint status report), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Letter from Ronald Mapp), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Special counsel production), # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) Modified on 6/15/2021 (baf, ). (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-15NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION TO COMPEL submitted DOCUMENT 26 - DOCUMENT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMIT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1527Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1528Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Copies and to Review In Camera by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (April FBI production), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Sines transcript), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Hardy declaration), # 4 Exhibit 4 (NY motion to permit discovery), # 5 Exhibit 5 (NY motion for evidentiary hearing), # 6 Exhibit 6 (NY response to MSJ), # 7 Exhibit 7 (NY complaint), # 8 Exhibit 8 (Joint status report), # 9 Exhibit 9 (Letter from Ronald Mapp), # 10 Exhibit 10 (Special counsel production), # 11 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1629ORDER - granting 27 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/16/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-06-2830RESPONSE to Motion re 28 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Copies and to Review In Camera filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation . (Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
2021-07-0531REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 Amended MOTION to Compel Production of Unredacted Copies and to Review In Camera filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 07/05/2021)
2021-07-0632ORDER. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for In Camera Review (Dkt. # 28 ) is hereby DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/6/2021. (rpc, ) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-08-1033Joint MOTION To Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 08/10/2021)
2021-08-1334ORDER granting 33 Joint Motion to Enter Proposed Briefing Schedule. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 08/13/2021. (las) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-11-0535Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Vaughn Index by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-0836ORDER - granting 35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and Vaughn Index. Defendants shall submit their motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index on or before December 15, 2021. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/8/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-12-1537***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael G. Seidel, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Vanessa R. Brinkmann, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore B. Smith, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) Modified on 12/16/2021 (baf, ). (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-16NOTICE of Deficiency regarding the MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMEMT submitted DOCUMENT 37 - DOCUMENT EXCEEDS THE PAGE LIMIT. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-1638Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-1639MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Seidel, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Vanessa Brinkman, # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Theodore Smith, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-2040ORDER - granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 12/20/2021. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-01-0541Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 01/05/2022)
2022-01-0642ORDER granting 41 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 1/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/6/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-20Counsel are reminded that the Court has not opted out of this court's Local Rules concerning courtesy copies; therefore, Counsel are asked to comply with Local Rule CV-5(a)(9) and Local Rule CV-10(b) with respect to sending courtesy copies to Judge Mazzant. Please send copies of filings that exceed 20 pages to Judge Mazzant's chambers. Please use tabs and dividers for exhibits, and please place very voluminous filings in three-ring binder(s). Staples are fine; no binder clips, please. (tls) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-2643Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 01/26/2022)
2022-01-2744ORDER granting 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Responses due by 2/7/2022. Replies due by 2/28/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/27/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/27/2022)
2022-02-0745Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-0746RESPONSE in Opposition re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (FBI production), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Email exchange), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Aaron Mate record), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-0947ORDER - granting 45 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/9/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/09/2022)
2022-02-2448Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 34 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 02/24/2022)
2022-02-2549ORDER - granting 48 Motion to Stay. The briefing schedule is stayed for thirty (30) days. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 2/25/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-3150STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-20NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference on the Parties' JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING NEW SEARCHES AND PROPOSED PRODUCTION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE (Dkt. #50) set for Thursday 4/28/2022 8:15 AM before District Judge Amos L. Mazzant III. Attorneys are instructed to call the Conference Number at 8:10 AM: 888-363-4749; Access Code: 1588844, followed by #. (tls) (Entered: 04/20/2022)
2022-04-2151ORDER - ORDERED that the production and briefing schedule applicable to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. #39) be reinstated and modified as follows. ORDERED that the telephone conference set for April 28, 2022, is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 4/21/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/21/2022)
2022-04-2552MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Ty Clevenger), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Invoice))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-0253Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0254REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0255Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Exhibit In Camera by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0256SEALED ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to Main Document: 54 Reply to Response to Motion, 55 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Exhibit In Camera . (Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-0657RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Exhibit In Camera filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/06/2022)
2022-05-0758RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 Opposed MOTION for Leave to File to Submit Exhibit In Camera (Amended) filed by Brian Huddleston . (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/07/2022)
2022-05-0959RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice . (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-1660Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document by Brian Huddleston. (Clevenger, Ty) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2022: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (baf, ). (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1661Sealed Document. (Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1662REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Huddleston declartion))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-1963ORDER - granting 60 Motion to Seal Document 60 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Document . Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 5/19/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
2022-05-2164Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/21/2022)
2022-05-2165SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Email exchange), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Email exchange), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Notice of compliance), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Docket sheet))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 05/21/2022)
2022-05-2366SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Federal Bureau of Investigation, U.S. Department of Justice . (Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-06-0867ORDER - granting 64 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 6/8/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 06/08/2022)
2022-07-2868ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Submit Exhibit In Camera,. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for In Camera Review (Dkt. #46; Dkt. #58) is DENIED.Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 7/28/2022. (mmc) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-1769ORDER - granting 53 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 8/17/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2022)
2022-09-2970MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 9/29/2022. (ch, ) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-10-1271Unopposed MOTION to Stay re 70 Memorandum & Opinion by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 10/12/2022)
2022-10-1872ORDER - granting 71 Motion to Stay Court's Production Order. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 10/18/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-2773MOTION Clarification re 70 Memorandum & Opinion or in the Alternative , MOTION for Reconsideration re 70 Memorandum & Opinion by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-11-1076RESPONSE in Opposition re 73 MOTION Clarification re 70 Memorandum & Opinion or in the Alternative MOTION for Reconsideration re 70 Memorandum & Opinion filed by Brian Huddleston . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Epoch Times article), # 2 Exhibit 2 (Email exchange), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Sines deposition exhibit), # 4 Exhibit 4 (Transcript of Sines deposition), # 5 Exhibit 5 (Rolling Stone article), # 6 Exhibit 6 (FD-302 form))(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 11/10/2022)
2022-11-1477MOTION re 70 Memorandum & Opinion by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (FBI email), # 2 Exhibit 2 (FBI property receipt), # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 11/14/2022)
2022-11-1578STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Brian Huddleston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (CrowdStrike report), # 2 Exhibit 2 (CrowdStrike report), # 3 Exhibit 3 (CrowdStrike report), # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Clevenger, Ty) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1579Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 77 MOTION re 70 Memorandum & Opinion by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-1780ORDER granting 79 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 77 MOTION re 70 Memorandum & Opinion . Responses due by 11/30/2022. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 11/17/2022. (baf, ) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-3081MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 76 Response in Opposition to Motion,, 77 MOTION re 70 Memorandum & Opinion by Federal Bureau of Investigation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Parker, Andrea) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar