Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleZIRVI v. UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH et al
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityTrenton
Case Number3:2020cv07648
Date Filed2020-06-23
Date Closed2022-04-28
JudgeJudge Zahid N. Quraishi
PlaintiffMONIB ZIRVI MD, PH.D
Case DescriptionMonib Zirvi, a co-inventor on a patent application, submitted a FOIA request to the National Institutes of Health, the National Institutes of Standards and Technology, and U.S. Patent and Trademark Office for records concerning communications between agency officials and Illumina officials. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. Zirvi received some redacted records from agencies, while others denied his requests under Exemption 4 (confidential business information) and Exemption 5 (privileges). Zirvi filed administrative appeals but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, Zirvi filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH
DefendantUNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY
DefendantUNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE
DefendantILLUMINA, INC.
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
Complaint attachment 16
Complaint attachment 17
Complaint attachment 18
Complaint attachment 19
Complaint attachment 20
Complaint attachment 21
Complaint attachment 22
Complaint attachment 23
Complaint attachment 24
Complaint attachment 25
Opinion/Order [47]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-231COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10977960), filed by MONIB ZIRVI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 25 Civil Cover Sheet)(SPIRO, JASON) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Party Information is to be entered in CAPITAL LETTERS . It was selected that this case has been filed AGAINST the Plaintiff . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, ) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-23Judge Michael A. Shipp and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert added. (mg) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-232NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MICHAEL KENNY on behalf of Monib Zirvi (KENNY, THOMAS) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-06-233SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mg) (Entered: 06/23/2020)
2020-07-024MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy M. Kolman by MONIB ZIRVI. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jason C. Spiro, # 2 Declaration of Timothy M. Kolman, # 3 Text of Proposed Order to Admit Timothy M. Kolman Pro Hac Vice)(SPIRO, JASON) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-02Set Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy M. Kolman . Motion set for 8/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 07/02/2020)
2020-07-225AMENDED DOCUMENT by MONIB ZIRVI. Amendment to 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Timothy M. Kolman Revised Declaration of Timothy M. Kolman . (SPIRO, JASON) (Entered: 07/22/2020)
2020-07-236Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants NIH, NIST, and USPTO. Attorney KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH,KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY,KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE added. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-237ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy Kolman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 7/23/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-07-23Clerk`s Text Order - The document 6 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order, submitted by UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 8/10/2020. (jem) (Entered: 07/23/2020)
2020-08-078NOTICE of Appearance by PETER GREGORY VIZCARRONDO on behalf of UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE (VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-079Letter from Defendants Requesting an Extension of Time Until August 24, 2020 to Respond to the Complaint. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 08/07/2020)
2020-08-1010ORDER granting Defendants' 9 application for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint 1 by 8/24/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 8/10/2020. (jem) (Entered: 08/10/2020)
2020-08-2411ANSWER to Complaint and Separate Defenses by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-09-0112MOTION to Intervene by ILLUMINA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Appendix Proposed Answer, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(HANEY, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-0113Corporate Disclosure Statement by ILLUMINA, INC.. (HANEY, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-01Set Deadlines as to 12 MOTION to Intervene . Motion set for 10/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/01/2020)
2020-09-1114Ordered Initial Conference set for 10/6/2020 at 2:30 PM via telephone before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff is to set up and initiate the call to chambers (609-989-2144). Attention Counsel: The Joint Discovery Plan is due (7) days prior to the conference. Please email the Joint Discovery Plan to dea_orders@njd.uscourts.gov. (Attachment: JDP Instructions) Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 9/11/2020. (eh, ) (Entered: 09/11/2020)
2020-09-2215NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC H. JASO on behalf of MONIB ZIRVI (JASO, ERIC) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-2916MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Barnett by ILLUMINA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kevin T. Barnett, # 2 Declaration of Robert P. Haney, Jr., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(HANEY, ROBERT) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-29Set Deadlines as to 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin Barnett . Motion set for 11/2/2020 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-06TEXT Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/6/2020, via telephone. (eh, ) (Entered: 10/07/2020)
2020-10-0817TEXT ORDER: The parties are to submit a joint status report by 10/13/2020. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/8/2020. (eh, ) (Entered: 10/08/2020)
2020-10-1318Letter from the Agency Defendants, on behalf of all parties, respectfully enclosing a proposed motion schedule. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 10/13/2020)
2020-10-1419ORDER that the Agency Defendants and Intervenor Illumina will file motions for summary judgment/partial summary judgment by 12/11/2020; Plaintiff's opposition to these motions are due 1/20/2021; the Agency Defendants and Intervenor Illumina's rely briefs are due 2/05/2021. Telephone Status Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Plaintiff's counsel is to initiate the call to 609-989-2144. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/14/2020. (jem) (Entered: 10/14/2020)
2020-10-1520ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kevin Barnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/15/2020. (abr) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-10-1521ORDER that Illumina, Inc.'s unopposed 12 Motion to Intervene is granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 10/15/2020. (abr) (Entered: 10/15/2020)
2020-11-0222Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Kevin T. Barnett to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-11595350.) (HANEY, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-02Pro Hac Vice counsel, KEVIN T. BARNETT, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jem) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-2423Letter from the Agency Defendants, on behalf of all parties, respectfully seeking a one-week extension of the motion schedule. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 11/24/2020)
2020-11-2524LETTER ORDER granting request for a one week extension of the Motion for Summary Judgment schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 11/25/2020. (jmh) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-12-0725NOTICE of Appearance by DAVID A. LUTTINGER on behalf of ILLUMINA, INC. (LUTTINGER, DAVID) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-1026Letter from Agency Defendants seeking 30-day extension of motion schedule. (VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 12/10/2020)
2020-12-1427LETTER ORDER granting the request that the Agency Defendants and Intervenor Illumina shall file motions for summary judgment/partial summary judgment by 1/18/2021; Plaintiff's oppositions due 2/26/2021; Reply briefs due 3/15/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 12/14/2020. (jem) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2021-01-1128Letter from the Agency Defendants, with the consent of all parties, respectfully requesting additional time to submit summary judgment motion. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/11/2021)
2021-01-1229LETTER ORDER granting the request 28 for an additional two-week extension of the motion schedule in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 1/12/2021. (jem) (Entered: 01/12/2021)
2021-01-2030Letter from the Agency Defendants, on behalf of all parties, setting out the redactions/withholdings that remain at issue in this case. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-02-0131MOTION for Summary Judgment by ILLUMINA, INC.. Responses due by 3/12/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Statement, # 3 Declaration of A McCourt, # 4 Declaration of J. Picuri, # 5 Declaration of K. Barnett, # 6 Declaration of P. Pannala, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(LUTTINGER, DAVID) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0132MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. Responses due by 3/12/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement Rule 56.1 Statement, # 3 Declaration of Louis J. Boston Jr., # 4 Exhibit to Boston Declaration, # 5 Declaration of Allyson Deitrick, # 6 Exhibit to Deitrick Declaration, # 7 Declaration of Suzanne Milliard, # 8 Exhibit to Milliard Declaration, # 9 Declaration of Marianne Manheim, # 10 Exhibit 1-7 to Manheim Declaration, # 11 Declaration of Michael Shapero, # 12 Text of Proposed Order)(VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0133Exhibit to 32 Motion for Summary Judgment,, Exhibit 8 to Manheim Declaration by UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. (VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-02Set Deadlines as to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motions set for 3/1/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 02/02/2021)
2021-02-0534ORDER that the Telephone Status Conference presently scheduled for 2/08/2021 is adjourned and rescheduled to 4/12/2021 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 2/05/2021. (jem) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-03-0335Letter from Plaintiff to Request an Increase of the Page Limit in its Summary Judgment Opposition Brief. (KENNY, THOMAS) (Entered: 03/03/2021)
2021-03-0436LETTER ORDER granting Plaintiff's request to increase the page limit for Plaintiff's opposition brief to 50 pages from the 40-page limit. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 03/04/2021. (jdb) (Entered: 03/04/2021)
2021-03-1137Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Authorize Plaintiff to Conduct Limited Discovery by All Plaintiffs. Responses due by 3/29/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Opposition to Motions for Summary Judgment and in Support of Cross-Motion, # 2 Statement of Material Facts in Support of Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Statement Response to Defendants' and Defendant-Intervenor's Statement of Material Facts, # 4 Declaration of Eric H. Jaso, # 5 Exhibit A to Jaso Declaration, # 6 Exhibit B to Jaso Declaration, # 7 Exhibit C to Jaso Declaration, # 8 Exhibit D to Jaso Declaration, # 9 Exhibit E to Jaso Declaration, # 10 Exhibit F to Jaso Declaration, # 11 Exhibit G to Jaso Declaration, # 12 Exhibit H to Jaso Declaration, # 13 Exhibit I to Jaso Declaration, # 14 Exhibit J to Jaso Declaration, # 15 Text of Proposed Order, # 16 Certificate of Service)(JASO, ERIC) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-12Set Deadlines as to 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Authorize Plaintiff to Conduct Limited Discovery . Motion set for 4/5/2021 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 03/12/2021)
2021-03-2938REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by ILLUMINA, INC. re 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Authorize Plaintiff to Conduct Limited Discovery , 31 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Statement Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Facts)(LUTTINGER, DAVID) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-03-2939MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE re 37 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Authorize Plaintiff to Conduct Limited Discovery and in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Statement in response to Plaintiff's 56.1 Statement, # 2 Declaration of Gorka Garcia-Malene, # 3 Exhibit 1 to Garcia-Malene Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 2 to Garcia-Malene Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 3 to Garcia-Malene Declaration)(VIZCARRONDO, PETER) (Entered: 03/29/2021)
2021-04-0940TEXT ORDER: Cancelling the Telephone Status conference previously set for 4/12/21 has been cancelled by consent. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 4/9/2021. (eh, ) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-04-2341MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kevin Barnett , MOTION to Withdraw by ILLUMINA, INC.. (LUTTINGER, DAVID) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-04-23Set Deadlines as to 41 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Kevin Barnett MOTION to Withdraw . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jem) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-06-2342ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw Pro Hac Vice admission of Kevin T. Barnett. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Arpert on 6/23/2021. (jem) (Entered: 06/23/2021)
2021-06-2443Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney ROBERT PATRICK HANEY, JR terminated. (LUTTINGER, DAVID) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-2544TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Zahid N. Quraishi for all further proceedings. Judge Michael A. Shipp no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 6/25/2021. (jem) (Entered: 06/25/2021)
2021-07-2845Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTE OF HEALTH, UNITED STATES NATIONAL INSTITUTES OF STANDARDS AND TECHNOLOGY, UNITED STATES PATENT AND TRADEMARK OFFICE. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-08-0246Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by All Plaintiffs. (KENNY, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
2022-04-2847OPINION Filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/28/2022. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-04-2848ORDER granting 31 Defendant Illumina, Inc.'s motion for Summary Judgement; Granting 32 motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants the United States Patent and Trademark Office, the National Institutes of Health, the National Cancer Institute, the National Institute of Standards and Technology, and the National Human Genome Research Institute; Denying 37 cross motion for Summary Judgement filed by Plaintiff Dr. Monib Zirvi; The Clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 4/28/2022. (jal, ) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar