Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSALAME v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv01784
Date Filed2020-06-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amy Berman Jackson
PlaintiffRICHARD SALAME
Case DescriptionRichard Salame, a journalist, submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records concerning complaints submitted to the voting section of the civil rights division. Salame also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and told Salame that it had received 167 complaints. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Salame filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-06-301COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7286748) filed by RICHARD SALAME. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-06-302NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of RICHARD SALAME (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 06/30/2020)
2020-07-01Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-07-013SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/01/2020)
2020-08-244NOTICE of Appearance by Paul A. Mussenden on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-08-245ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 08/24/2020)
2020-08-256ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of Local Civil Rule 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff, on or before September 22, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/25/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 08/25/2020)
2020-08-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule for the completion of its production of documents to plaintiff by 9/22/2020. (jth) (Entered: 08/26/2020)
2020-09-227Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-248RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 7/23/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-249RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 7/23/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-2410RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 7/23/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-25MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 7 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by November 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/25/2020. (lcabj3) (Entered: 09/25/2020)
2020-09-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/23/2020. (ztg) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-11-2311Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 11/23/2020)
2020-11-30MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 11 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by January 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/30/20. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2021-01-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Mussenden, Paul) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-01-19MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 12 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by March 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 1/19/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/19/2021)
2021-02-2113NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Paul A. Mussenden (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 02/21/2021)
2021-03-2314Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Palmer-Ball, Katherine) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 14 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 3/24/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/24/2021)
2021-05-0215NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Katherine Boyd Palmer-Ball (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/02/2021)
2021-05-2416ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) Modified on 5/25/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 05/24/2021)
2021-05-2417Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/24/2021)
2021-05-25NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re 16 Status Report was entered in error and refiled by counsel. (See Docket Entry 17 to view document)(zjf) (Entered: 05/25/2021)
2021-05-25MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 17 joint status report, the parties must submit another status report by July 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 5/25/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 05/25/2021)
2021-07-2318Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/23/2021)
2021-07-26MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 18 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by September 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 7/26/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 07/26/2021)
2021-09-2119Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-22MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 19 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by November 22, 2021. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/22/21. (lcabj2) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-11-2220Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 20 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by January 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 11/23/2021. (lcabj2) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2022-01-2121Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-24MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 21 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by March 22, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/24/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 01/24/2022)
2022-03-2222NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of RICHARD SALAME (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-2223Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-23MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' 23 joint status report, the parties must submit another joint status report by May 23, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/23/2022. (lcabj2) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-05-2324Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Johnson, Stephanie) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar