Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleTOBIAS v. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02080
Date Filed2020-07-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJIMMY TOBIAS
Case DescriptionJournalist Jimmy Tobias submitted nine FOIA requests to the National Park Service for records concerning policies for deploying Park Police to federal sites where protests were taking place. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Tobias filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantNATIONAL PARK SERVICE
DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-07-301COMPLAINT against NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7404436) filed by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-J, # 3 Exhibit K-O, # 4 Exhibit P-S, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-302NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-303NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-30Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (zsb) (Entered: 07/30/2020)
2020-07-314SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)
2020-09-165NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Landrum von Bokern on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-166ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR.(von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-16MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before September 30, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/16/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/30/2020 (tj) (Entered: 09/17/2020)
2020-09-297RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR served on 8/13/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-298RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. NATIONAL PARK SERVICE served on 8/17/2020 (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-299RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/17/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-2910RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/17/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/16/2020. (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-09-3011Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-09-3012NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C. Lynch on behalf of All Defendants (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a periodic joint status report on or before the 30th day of each month, or, if the 30th day of the month is not a business day, on the next business day after the 30th day of the month. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/1/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-3013Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-3014Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-3015Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-02-0116Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-03-0117Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 03/01/2021)
2021-03-3018Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 03/30/2021)
2021-04-3019Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 04/30/2021)
2021-06-0120Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/01/2021)
2021-06-3021Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-3022Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-08-3023Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-3024Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 09/30/2021)
2021-11-0125Joint STATUS REPORT by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 11/01/2021)
2021-11-3026Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-11-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before December 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/30/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/30/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/01/2021)
2021-12-3027Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
2021-12-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 27 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before January 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/30/21. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
2022-01-3128Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-02-2229NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Clendenen on behalf of NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2830Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 02/28/2022)
2022-03-3031NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of JIMMY TOBIAS (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-3132Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-03-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 32 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before April 29, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/31/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/31/2022)
2022-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/29/2022. (tj) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-2933Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-04-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 33 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before May 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/29/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-0534NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. Attorney Jordan Landrum Von Bokern terminated. (Von Bokern, Jordan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-2735Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Lynch, Jason) (Entered: 05/27/2022)
2022-05-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 35 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before June 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 05/28/2022.(lcrc2) (Entered: 05/28/2022)
2022-06-3036Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-2937Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-3138Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-08-31MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 38 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/31/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/31/2022)
2022-09-3039Joint STATUS REPORT by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 39 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment on or before October 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/30/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-2140Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by NATIONAL PARK SERVICE, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF INTERIOR. (Clendenen, Michael) (Entered: 10/21/2022)
2022-10-24MINUTE ORDER granting 40 the parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule for cross-motions for summary judgment on or before October 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/24/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2741Joint STATUS REPORT by JIMMY TOBIAS. (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
2022-10-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 41 the parties' Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendants shall provide a draft Vaughn index to Plaintiff on or before January 10, 2023; Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment and supporting Vaughn index on or before January 31, 2023; Plaintiff shall file an opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 2, 2023; Defendants shall file a cross-opposition and reply on or before March 23, 2023; and Plaintiff shall file any cross-reply on or before April 13, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the parties need not file separate statements of fact. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/27/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/27/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar