Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleROBERSON v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02431
Date Filed2020-08-18
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Carl J. Nichols
PlaintiffANTHONY ROBERSON
DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-08-18Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 8/18/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-181COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit)(adh, ) Modified on 11/10/2021 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-08-182MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY ROBERSON (adh, ) Modified on 11/10/2021 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 08/31/2020)
2020-09-293PRO SE ORDER directing within 30 days of this Order, unless an extension of time is granted, plaintiff to provide a six month trust fund prisoner account statement and failure to comply will result in dismissal of case. Plaintiff shall provide the requested information specific within this order. Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/29/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/29/2020)
2020-10-274PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY ROBERSON (Attachment: # 1 Exhibit) (adh, ) Modified on 11/10/2021 to edit docket text (znmg). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2021-11-115ORDER granting plaintiff's 2 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and directing the Clerk of Court to assign this case randomly to a judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/10/21. (psu2) (Entered: 11/11/2021)
2021-11-11Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (znmg) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-176SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshal Service. (znmg) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-297NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia K. McBride on behalf of All Defendants (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-138STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 13, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2021-12-169ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Extension of Time to by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) Modified on 12/16/2021 (zeg). (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-16NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to was entered in error and counsel was instructed to refile said pleading with correct case number. (zeg) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-1610MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2021-12-20MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of Defendant's 10 Motion for an Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by February 16, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on December 20, 2021. (lccjn1) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-02-1611MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Seidel Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2-Mem. Opinion, # 3 Exhibit 3-Appeal, # 4 Exhibit 4-Complaint 18-1993)(McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-1712ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on February 17, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-02-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 3/16/2022. Summary Judgment Motion due by 3/16/2022. (zcal) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-03-1613RESPONSE re 11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (Attachment: # 1 Exhibits)(zeg) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-04-0114MOTION for Leave to File MTE by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Defendant's 14 Motion for Leave to File/For Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Defendant's Reply is due on or before May 5, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 5, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-2215RESPONSE re 14 MOTION for Leave to File MTE filed by ANTHONY ROBERSON. (zeg) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
2022-05-0416REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (McBride, Patricia) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-10-1017ORDER denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 10, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/10/2022)
2022-10-1018MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 10, 2022. (lccjn1) (Entered: 10/10/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar