Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleMUCKROCK, LLC v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02474
Date Filed2020-09-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Jia M. Cobb
PlaintiffMUCKROCK, LLC
Case DescriptionMuckRock submitted six FOIA requests to the CIA for records concerning regulatory issuances. The agency acknowledged receipts of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency pertaining to any of its six requests, MuckRock filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fee Category - Media or Educational, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-041COMPLAINT against CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7550241) filed by MUCKROCK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-042NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by MUCKROCK, LLC. Case related to Case No. 14-997. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-043LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by MUCKROCK, LLC (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-04Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)
2020-09-084SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-165Case randomly reassigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case as deemed not related. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-09-246RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/17/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/17/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/17/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY served on 9/17/2020 (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-247NOTICE of Erroneous Reassignment by MUCKROCK, LLC re 5 Case Assigned/Reassigned, 2 Notice of Related Case (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 09/24/2020)
2020-09-288Case directly reassigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson by consent. Judge James E. Boasberg is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-09-289GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES APPLICABLE TO FOIA CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Court's instructions for processing and production of records, batching motions, and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 9/28/2020. (jag) (Entered: 09/28/2020)
2020-10-1910NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-10-1911ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY.(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/19/2020)
2020-11-05MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall review this Court's 9 General Order and Guidelines Applicable to FOIA Cases, and promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for disclosure or briefing motions for summary judgment, on or before 11/19/2020. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/4/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit AR 1-3, # 2 Exhibit C05584446, # 3 Exhibit C05584449)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-20MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 2/5/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 11/20/2020. (jag) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2021-02-0513Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/05/2021)
2021-02-09MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 4/5/2021, the parties shall file a further joint status report, which shall include a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 2/9/2021. (jag) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-04-0214Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/02/2021)
2021-04-29MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 141 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 6/7/2021, the parties shall file further joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 4/29/2021. (jag) (Entered: 04/29/2021)
2021-06-0715Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-06-07MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before 8/6/2021, the parties shall file further joint status report, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/7/2021. (jag) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-06-22Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Jackson's former deputy clerk, Gwendolyn Franklin, at 202-354-3145 or gwen_franklin@dcd.uscourts.gov. (rj) (Entered: 06/22/2021)
2021-08-0616Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before October 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/7/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 08/07/2021)
2021-08-09Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/6/2021. (zgdf) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-10-0617Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/06/2021)
2021-10-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before December 6, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/7/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 10/07/2021)
2021-10-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/6/2021. (zacr) (Entered: 10/07/2021)
2021-11-15Case directly reassigned to Judge Jia M. Cobb. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson has been appointed to the D.C. Circuit and is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-12-0618Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-06MINUTE ORDER re 18 Status Report filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY: The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another joint status report by February 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on December 6, 2021. (lcjmcl) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-0619MOTION to Compel Defendant to Seek an Open America Stay by MUCKROCK, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/06/2021)
2021-12-2020Memorandum in opposition to re 19 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Seek an Open America Stay filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Vanna Blaine, # 2 Exhibit Letter dated Jan. 29, 2021 to Plaintiff's counsel from Defendant's counsel, # 3 Exhibit Email dated April 2, 2021 to Plaintiff's counsel from Defendant's counsel)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-2621REPLY to opposition to motion re 19 MOTION to Compel Defendant to Seek an Open America Stay filed by MUCKROCK, LLC. (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 12/26/2021)
2022-02-0722Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-07MINUTE ORDER: The Court has reviewed 22 Joint Status Report and directs the Parties to file another joint status report by April 7, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 7, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-22MINUTE ORDER: The Parties are ORDERED to appear for a status conference on Tuesday, March 15, 2022, at 12 PM. The status conference will be on the record and conducted via telephone. The Court's Deputy Clerk will provide the information necessary to access the call. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on February 22, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-03-15Minute Entry for Telephonic Status Conference held before Judge Jia M. Cobb on 3/15/2022, previously ordered status report due April 7th, 2022 is hereby VACATED. Parties directed to confer and file a new Joint Status Report on April 8, 2022. (Court Reporter Janice Dickman) (zgdf) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-04-0823Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Email chain)(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/08/2022)
2022-04-11MINUTE ORDER denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Seek an Open America Stay: Plaintiff Muckrock, LLC sent six requests under the Freedom of Information Act (FOIA), 5 U.S.C. § 552, to Defendant Central Intelligence Agency (CIA), and subsequently filed this case concerning its requests. Relevant here, as this case unfolded, the Parties agreed that the CIA would release seventy-five documents to Plaintiff every two months for two of the FOIA requests. ECF 13. Now, seeking to speed up the CIA's production of documents, Muckrock has moved to compel the agency to seek a stay under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976). ECF 19 at 1-2. Muckrock has pointed to no authority to support its position that it would be appropriate for the Court to compel the CIA to seek an Open America stay to resolve the Parties' dispute about the rate of document production. Muckrock's motion is thus DENIED. The Parties are ordered to submit by April 22, 2022, a joint status report to apprise the Court of next steps in this case, including a proposed schedule for briefing dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 11, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-2224Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22MINUTE ORDER re 24 Joint Status Report: The Court has reviewed the joint status report and directs the Parties to file another joint status report by June 3, 2022. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on April 22, 2022. (lcjmc1) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar