Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEOPOLD et al v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02508
Date Filed2020-09-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffJASON LEOPOLD
PlaintiffBUZZFEED INC.
Case DescriptionJason Leopold submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the decision to send extra agency personnel to either Portland, Oregon or Chicago, Illinois. Leopold also requested expedited processing and a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and later told Leopold that the request would take at least three months to process. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Leopold filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantFEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE
DefendantOFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES
DefendantU.S. SECRET SERVICE
DefendantOFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-081COMPLAINT against FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7564214) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet, # 9 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-082NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-083LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/08/2020)
2020-09-09Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-094SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 09/09/2020)
2020-09-165AMENDED COMPLAINT against FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E, # 2 Exhibit F-J, # 3 Exhibit K-M)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2020)
2020-10-126RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/23/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-127RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE served on 10/5/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-128RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES served on 9/23/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-129RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. SECRET SERVICE served on 9/23/2020 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-1210RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/22/20. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-1211RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/22/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/22/2020. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2020)
2020-10-2212NOTICE of Appearance by Vinita B. Andrapalliyal on behalf of FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-2213ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE.(Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-22MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule, on or before November 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/22/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-10-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 11/5/2020. (tj) (Entered: 10/22/2020)
2020-11-0514Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 14 Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before December 17, 2020. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/5/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-11-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/17/2020 (tj) (Entered: 11/05/2020)
2020-12-1715Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-18MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 15 Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before January 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/18/2020. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 1/28/2021. (tj) (Entered: 12/21/2020)
2021-01-2816Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 01/28/2021)
2021-01-29MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 16 Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before March 9, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/29/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-01-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/9/2021 (tj) (Entered: 01/29/2021)
2021-03-0917Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the Parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before April 27, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/9/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/27/2021 (tj) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-04-2718Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-04-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 18 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before June 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/28/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-04-28Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/8/2021. (tj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-06-0819Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-09MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 19 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before July 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 6/9/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/09/2021)
2021-07-2020Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 07/20/2021)
2021-07-21MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 20 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a status report, on or before September 14, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/21/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-09-1421Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-14MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 21 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit another status report on or before October 26, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/14/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-10-2622Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 22 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 7, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/26/2021. (lcrc2) (Entered: 10/26/2021)
2021-10-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/7/2021 (tj) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-12-0723Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 12/07/2021)
2021-12-08MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 23 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before January 11, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 12/8/21. (lcrc2) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2022-01-1124Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
2022-01-11MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 24 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before February 22, 2022. SO ORDERED Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 1/11/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
2022-02-2225Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 25 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before March 5, 2022. SO ORDERED Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 2/22/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-03-0726Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 03/07/2022)
2022-03-07MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 26 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before April 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 3/7/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 03/07/2022)
2022-04-0527NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-0528Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-06MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 28 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before May 17, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 4/6/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-05-1729Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-17MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 29 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before June 21, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 5/17/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-06-2230Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-22MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 30 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before July 26, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 06/22/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-07-2631Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-26MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 31 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before August 30, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7/26/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-3032Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-30MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 32 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another Joint Status Report on or before September 27, 2022. SO ORDERED.Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 8/30/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-2733Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Andrapalliyal, Vinita) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-28MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 33 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before November 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/28/2022. (lcrc2) (Entered: 09/28/2022)
2022-11-0234NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Chuzi on behalf of All Defendants (Chuzi, Amanda) (Entered: 11/02/2022)
2022-11-1535Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, FEDERAL PROTECTIVE SERVICE, OFFICE FOR CIVIL RIGHTS AND CIVIL LIBERTIES, OFFICE OF INTELLIGENCE & ANALYSIS, U.S. SECRET SERVICE. (Chuzi, Amanda) (Entered: 11/15/2022)
2022-11-16MINUTE ORDER adopting the parties' proposed briefing schedule: Upon consideration of 35 the parties' Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this matter: Defendants shall file a motion for summary judgment on or before March 15, 2023; Plaintiffs shall file an opposition to Defendants' motion and any cross-motion for summary judgment on or before April 14, 2023; Defendants shall file any reply and opposition to Plaintiffs' cross-motion on or before May 5, 2023; and Plaintiffs shall file any cross-reply on or before May 26, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the requirement to submit a statement of material facts with the parties' motions is waived. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/16/22. (lcrc2) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 3/15/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion due by 4/14/2023. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to Cross Motion due by 5/5/2023. Reply to Cross Motion due by 5/26/2023. (zgf) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar