Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CitySan Francisco
Case Number3:2020cv06641
Date Filed2020-09-22
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge William Alsup
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
Case DescriptionAnayansi Diaz-Cortes, a reporter for the Center for Investigative Reporting, submitted FOIA requests to the CIA, the FBI, the State Department, and the Department of Defense for records concerning the disappearance of 43 Mexican students and related issues. CIR also requested expedited processing. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Expedited processing, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCentral Intelligence Agency
DefendantU.S. Department of Justice
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
DefendantU.S. Drug Enforcement Administration
DefendantU.S. Department of State
DefendantU.S. Department of Defense
DefendantNorthern Command
DefendantU.S. Defense Intelligence Agency
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-09-221COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14973024.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/22/2020) (Entered: 09/22/2020)
2020-09-232Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 10/7/2020. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-233Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 1/1/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/8/2021 02:00 PM. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2020) (Entered: 09/23/2020)
2020-09-304Proposed Summons. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 9/30/2020) (Entered: 09/30/2020)
2020-10-015Summons Issued as to U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration.(mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2020) (Entered: 10/01/2020)
2020-10-066Rule 7.1 Disclosures by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/6/2020) (Entered: 10/06/2020)
2020-10-307SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. Federal Bureau of Investigation served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-308SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting Central Intelligence Agency served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-309SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3010SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Burke, Thomas) U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3011SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. U.S. Department of Defense served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3012SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. U.S. Department of Justice served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3013SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. U.S. Department of State served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-10-3014SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. U.S. Northern Command served on 10/08/2020, answer due 12/7/20. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 10/30/2020) Modified on 11/2/2020 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/30/2020)
2020-11-02Electronic filing error . Incorrect event used. The correct event is SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED under the Initial Pleadings and Service/Service of Process category. [err10 1]Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: 10 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 7 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 13 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 14 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 11 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 9 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 12 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting, 8 Affidavit of Service filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2020) (Entered: 11/02/2020)
2020-11-0415NOTICE of Appearance by Sharanya Mohan (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-0416STIPULATION To Extend Time for Response to Complaint filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 11/4/2020) (Entered: 11/04/2020)
2020-11-1617CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by The Center for Investigative Reporting.. (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)
2020-12-0918CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-0919ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William Alsup for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 12/09/2020. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2020) (Entered: 12/09/2020)
2020-12-1420CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ON REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 12/31/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. Standing orders can be downloaded from the Court's webpage at www.cand.uscourts.gov/whaorders. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-1521ANSWER to Complaint byCentral Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 12/15/2020) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-1822ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-1823ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Burke, Thomas) (Filed on 12/18/2020) (Entered: 12/18/2020)
2020-12-3024JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 12/30/2020) (Entered: 12/30/2020)
2021-01-0725Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/7/2021 by AT&T Conference line. Defendants are in the process of searching for responsive documents to certain of the FOIA requests and thus the parties propose to continue to work together and file a further case management statement by 2/1/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM. Total Time in Court: 8 minutes. Court Reporter: JoAnn Bryce. Plaintiff Attorney: Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney: Sharanya Mohan. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-0726CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 2/1/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/4/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)
2021-01-2027STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER , with declaration, to extend deadline for further case management statement and continue case management conference filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Mohan, Sharanya) (Filed on 1/20/2021) (Entered: 01/20/2021)
2021-01-2528NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by Benjamin Joseph Wolinsky (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 1/25/2021) (Entered: 01/25/2021)
2021-02-0129JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/1/2021) (Entered: 02/01/2021)
2021-02-0330ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 27 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:00 AM. (whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-1131CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. The Further Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup will occur telephonically. Case Management Statement due by 2/15/2021 This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2021) (Entered: 02/11/2021)
2021-02-1232JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-1833Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/18/2021 by AT&T Conference line. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 11:00 AM. Total Time in Court: 2 minutes. Court Reporter: Ana Dub. Plaintiff Attorney: Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney: Ben Wolinksy. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-2234CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge William Alsup. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: (888) 684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-04-0635NOTICE of Appearance by Sam F Cate-Gumpert for Plaintiff The Center for Investigative Reporting (Cate-Gumpert, Sam) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-05-1336JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 5/13/2021) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-2037Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/20/2021 by AT&T Conference line. The Court asked the parties to meet and confer to resolve the disputes discussed at the hearing. Further Case Management Conference set for 7/22/2021 at 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. If the Court remains closed for civil hearings at this time due to the COVID-19 pandemic, the hearing will be held telephonically. FTR Time: 11:17 - 11:31. Plaintiff Attorney: Sam Cate-Gumpert / Thomas Burke. Defendant Attorney: Benjamin Wolinsky. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amd2S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/20/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-07-0238STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER , with declaration, to continue case management conference and associated deadlines filed by The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Cate-Gumpert, Sam) (Filed on 7/2/2021) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-0839ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 11:00 AM.(whalc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2021) (Entered: 07/08/2021)
2021-09-1340CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING TELEPHONIC HEARING: Joint Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 11:00 AM - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Case Management Statement due by 9/16/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. (ecS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2021) (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-1641JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/16/2021) Modified on 9/17/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-2342Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William Alsup: Further Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2021. Defendant to produce 100 de-classified documents per month using the four keyword/phrases stated on the record. Case Management Statement due by 10/28/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 11/4/2021 11:00 AM in San Francisco, - Telephonic Only. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code: 3707514 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Total Time in Court: 25 minutes. Court Reporter: Debra Pas. Plaintiff Attorney: Sam Cate-Gumpert. Defendant Attorney: Benjamin Wolinsky. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/23/2021) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-09-2443TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 23, 2021 before Judge William Alsup by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-2444TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on September 23, 2021 before Judge William Alsup by The Center for Investigative Reporting, for Court Reporter Debra Pas. (Cate-Gumpert, Sam) (Filed on 9/24/2021) (Entered: 09/24/2021)
2021-09-2645Transcript of AT&T Teleconference Proceedings held on 9-23-2021, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CRR, telephone number (415) 431-1477/Email: Debra_Pas@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 43 Transcript Order, 44 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2021. (Related documents(s) 43 , 44 ) (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 9/26/2021) (Entered: 09/26/2021)
2021-10-2846JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 10/28/2021) Modified on 10/29/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-11-0447Minute Entry for further case management conference held on 11/4/2021 before Judge William Alsup. The Court proposes Plaintiff carry the burden of reviewing the 15,000 pages discussed on the record. The government shall consider the proposal; then the parties shall meet, confer and then update the Court by way of a written statement filed within one week. Total Time in Court: 13 mins. Court Reporter: Belle Ball. Plaintiff Attorney: Sam Cate-Gumpert. Defendant Attorney: Ben Wolinsky. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)
2021-11-1048Joint Response re 47 Case Management Conference Re. Court's Proposal by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration, the Center for Investigative Reporting. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 11/10/2021) Modified on 11/12/2021 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-12-2349STATUS REPORT AND PROPOSED ORDER by Central Intelligence Agency, Federal Bureau of Investigation, Northern Command, U.S. Defense Intelligence Agency, U.S. Department of Defense, U.S. Department of Justice, U.S. Department of State, U.S. Drug Enforcement Administration and The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Wolinsky, Benjamin) (Filed on 12/23/2021) Modified on 12/27/2021 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-2850ORDER RE JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2021). (Entered: 12/28/2021)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar