Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLEGAL EAGLE, LLC v. COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv02896
Date Filed2020-10-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeCircuit Judge Florence Y Pan
PlaintiffLEGAL EAGLE, LLC
Case DescriptionLegal Eagle submitted FOIA requests to the Council of the Inspector General on Integrity and Efficiency and a number of agencies for records concerning the prevalence of allegations against Inspectors General throughout the executive branch. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agencies, Legal Eagle filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantCOUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY
DefendantCENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
DefendantUS DEPT OF INTERIOR
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUS DEPT OF JUSTICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF STATE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantUNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
Complaint attachment 14
Complaint attachment 15
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-10-091COMPLAINT against ALL DEFENDANTS ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7694138) filed by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons)(McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-092LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by LEGAL EAGLE, LLC (McClanahan, Kelly) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-09Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (zmd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-10-093SUMMONS (14) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 10/09/2020)
2020-11-184ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT.(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 11/18/2020)
2020-11-19MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before December 7, 2020. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 19, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 11/19/2020)
2020-11-19Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 12/7/2020 (zjch) (Entered: 11/20/2020)
2020-12-075Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 5 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another joint status report on or before February 6, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 7, 2020. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 12/07/2020)
2020-12-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 2/6/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 12/08/2020)
2021-02-086Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before April 6, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 8, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 4/6/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 02/09/2021)
2021-04-067Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 04/06/2021)
2021-04-07MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to submit another joint status report on or before June 7, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 7, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-04-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 6/7/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 04/07/2021)
2021-06-078Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-06-08MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint status report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before August 7, 2021. So ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on June 8, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 8/7/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-309NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Stephen DeGenaro on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-08-0610Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before October 5, 2021. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 6, 2021. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/5/2021 (zjch) (Entered: 08/09/2021)
2021-10-01Case directly reassigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. Judge Dabney L. Friedrich is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-0511Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 10/05/2021)
2021-10-15MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before November 29, 2021. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 10/15/21. (lcaa) (Entered: 10/15/2021)
2021-10-15Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 11/29/2021. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-11-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before January 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 11/30/21. (lcaa) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/28/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2022-01-2813Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 01/28/2022)
2022-01-31MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before March 29, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/31/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-01-31Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/29/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-03-2914Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-29MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before May 26, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 3/29/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-05-2615Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before July 25, 2022, and every 60 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/26/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-05-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/25/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/26/2022)
2022-07-2516Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 07/25/2022)
2022-09-2317Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-23Judge Florence Y. Pan has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Pan's former deputy clerk, Samantha Calloway, at 202-354-3163 or samantha_calloway@dcd.uscourts.gov. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-27MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 17 the parties' Joint Status Report, it ishereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit another joint status report on or before December 5, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9-27-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-09-27Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/5/2022. (zsmc) (Entered: 09/27/2022)
2022-12-0518Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, COUNCIL OF THE INSPECTORS GENERAL ON INTEGRITY AND EFFICIENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, UNITED STATES AGENCY FOR INTERNATIONAL DEVELOMENT, US DEPT OF INTERIOR, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (DeGenaro, Stephen) (Entered: 12/05/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar