Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePARSICK v. UNITED STATES ARMY
DistrictDistrict of New Jersey
CityNewark
Case Number2:2020cv15673
Date Filed2020-11-09
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Claire C. Cecchi
PlaintiffKEITH E. PARSICK
DefendantUNITED STATES ARMY
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [33]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-091COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ARMY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CNJDC-11624249), filed by KEITH PARSICK. (Attachments: # 1 Certification NOTICE OF LAWSUIT, # 2 Supplement NOTICE TO MAGISTRATE, # 3 Statement PRELIMINARY STATEMENT, # 4 Certificate of Service PROOF OF SERVICE, # 5 Summons SUMMONS IN A CIVIL ACTION)(ABATE, JAMES) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-09Case Assigned to Judge Claire C. Cecchi and Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk. (ak, ) (Entered: 11/09/2020)
2020-11-102SUMMONS ISSUED as to UNITED STATES ARMY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)
2021-04-09Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Chief Mag. Judge Mark Falk no longer assigned to the case. (seb) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-04-133Substitution of Attorney - Attorney JAMES A. ABATE terminated. Attorney JAMES V. LOEWEN for KEITH E. PARSICK added.. (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-144MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David A. Bahr, Esq. by KEITH E. PARSICK. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David A. Bahr, Esq., # 2 Certification of James V. Loewen, Esq., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-15Set Deadlines as to 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice David A. Bahr, Esq. . Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)
2021-04-165*WITHDRAWN* Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Rule 4(m). This action will be dismissed on April 30, 2021, for failure to effect service of the summons and complaint within 90 days of the filing of the complaint, unless Plaintiff establishes that proper service was effected within said 90 days, by filing proof of service with the Clerk of the Court before the return date of this notice, etc. (jl, ) (jl). Modified on 5/14/2021 (jl). (Entered: 04/16/2021)
2021-04-306SUMMONS Returned Executed by KEITH E. PARSICK. UNITED STATES ARMY served on 4/10/2021, answer due 6/9/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipts)(LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 04/30/2021)
2021-05-127Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to the United States Army. Attorney KRISTIN LYNN VASSALLO for UNITED STATES ARMY added. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
2021-05-13Clerk`s Text Order - The document 7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by UNITED STATES ARMY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 5/28/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-14CHAMBER'S NOTE - Notice of Call for Dismissal filed on 4/16/2021 (DE#5)is WITHDRAWN. (jl, ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-198ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to David A. Bahr, Esq. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/19/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-209Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice David A. Bahr, Esq. to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12481503.) (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-05-21Pro Hac Vice counsel, DAVID A. BAHR, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (ams, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-05-2710ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES ARMY.(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-06-2411ORDER scheduling Initial R16 Conference for 7/15/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 6/24/2021. (spc) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-3012Letter from the Government, with the consent of all parties, respectfully asking the Court to reschedule the initial conference. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-0213TEXT ORDER -- The Court has reviewed D.E. 12 and, accordingly, the Rule 16 conference previously scheduled for July 15, 2021 is adjourned to July 19, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. on the Courts teleconference line 866-434-5269, access code 1874589#. The Joint Discovery plan shall be filed on cm/ecf by July 12, 2021. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/2/2021. (spc) (Entered: 07/02/2021)
2021-07-1214Joint Discovery Plan by UNITED STATES ARMY.(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 07/12/2021)
2021-07-19Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 7/19/2021. amended scheduling order to be filed. (spc) (Entered: 07/27/2021)
2021-07-2715ORDER that the parties shall file letter briefs addressing the issue of discovery in this matter; Telephone Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 07/27/2021)
2021-08-0316Letter from the Army regarding pre-motion discovery. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 08/03/2021)
2021-08-1417MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Bar Discovery by KEITH E. PARSICK. (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/14/2021)
2021-08-1718Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 16 Letter by KEITH E. PARSICK. (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/17/2021)
2021-08-1819RESPONSE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Bahr, # 2 Declaration of Keith Parsick, # 3 Declaration of Robert Spine, # 4 Exhibit A, # 5 Exhibit B, # 6 Exhibit C, # 7 Exhibit D, # 8 Exhibit E, # 9 Exhibit F, # 10 Exhibit G, # 11 Exhibit H, # 12 Exhibit I, # 13 Exhibit J)(LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-2020Letter from the Army in further support of its position opposing pre-motion discovery. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-09-0321Joint Discovery Plan by UNITED STATES ARMY.(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-10Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa: Telephone Conference held on 9/10/2021. order to be filed. (Electronic Court Recording) (spc) (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-1722ORDER that Defendant's 16 Request to Stay Discovery is GRANTED; Defendant shall, and Plaintiff may, move for summary judgment. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/17/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-09-2923Letter from the Army, on behalf of all parties, respectfully proposing a motion schedule. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-0626ORDER granting 23 Letter re Briefing Schedule. Signed by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 10/6/2021. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-10-2224MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES ARMY. Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Supplement, # 2 Brief, # 3 Statement of Material Facts Not in Dispute, # 4 Declaration of Kristin Vassallo, # 5 Declaration of Timothy Hendrickson, # 6 Hendrickson Decl., Ex. A)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-2225Exhibit to 24 Motion for Summary Judgment, Declaration of Irassema Sullivan by UNITED STATES ARMY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ira Sullivan, Ex. A-H, # 2 Declaration of Christopher Johnson, # 3 Johnson Decl., Ex. A-C)(VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-27Set Deadlines as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Motion set for 2/7/2022 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 10/27/2021)
2021-11-1827MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by KEITH E. PARSICK. (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 11/18/2021)
2021-11-19CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The 27 Letter filed by KEITH E. PARSICK on 11/18/2021 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings of this nature, please select the event "Letter" found under Other Documents. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-2428Letter from plaintiff's counsel re 26 Order, 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 25 Exhibit (to Document),. (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-2429MOTION for Discovery by KEITH E. PARSICK. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Declaration of David Bahr, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Declaration of Bob Spine, # 5 Declaration of Keith Parsick, # 6 Exhibit A, # 7 Exhibit B, # 8 Exhibit C, # 9 Exhibit D, # 10 Exhibit E, # 11 Exhibit F, # 12 Exhibit G, # 13 Exhibit H, # 14 Exhibit I, # 15 Exhibit K, # 16 Exhibit L, # 17 Text of Proposed Order)(LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-29Set Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Discovery . Motion set for 2/7/2022 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ams, ) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-1030TEXT ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for limited discovery pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(d) (ECF No. 29) shall be referred to Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Defendant's pending motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 24) is administratively terminated without prejudice pending resolution of Plaintiff's motion for discovery (ECF No. 29). After Plaintiff's motion for discovery has been resolved, Defendant may move for summary judgment. So Ordered by Judge Claire C. Cecchi on 12/10/2021. (jl, ) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2021-12-1031MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by UNITED STATES ARMY re 29 MOTION for Discovery (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 12/10/2021)
2022-01-2132REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by KEITH E. PARSICK re 29 MOTION for Discovery (LOEWEN, JAMES) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-04-1133OPINION & ORDER that Plaintiff's 29 Motion for Discovery is DENIED. etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/11/2022. (ams, ) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-04-2934Letter from the Government, on behalf of all parties, respectfully providing the Court with an update in this matter. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-0235TEXT ORDER - The Court has received the parties' letter filed at D.E. 34. The parties shall continue their negotiations and file a status update by May 13, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/2/2022. (jis) (Entered: 05/02/2022)
2022-05-1336Letter from the Army, with the consent of all parties, respectfully seeking additional time to update the court. (VASSALLO, KRISTIN) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-1837TEXT ORDER - The Court has received the parties' letter filed at D.E. 36. The parties shall continue their negotiations and file a status update by June 1, 2022. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 5/18/2022. (jis) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar