Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleConnecticut Fair Housing Ctr v. United States Department of Housing and Urban Development
DistrictDistrict of Connecticut
CityNew Haven
Case Number3:2020cv01775
Date Filed2020-11-25
Date Closed2022-02-13
JudgeJudge Victor A. Bolden
PlaintiffConnecticut Fair Housing Ctr
Case DescriptionThe Connecticut Fair Housing Center submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning the identity of foreclosure commissioners used to foreclose on Home Equity Foreclosure Mortgages. CFHC also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, CFHC filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Public Interest Fee Waiver, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Department of Housing and Urban Development
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-251COMPLAINT against United States Department of Housing and Urban Development ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6244209.), filed by Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr.(Gentes, Jeffrey) Modified on 11/25/2020 to correct party(Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-25Request for Clerk to issue summons as to United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Gentes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-25Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-252Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr. (Gentes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/25/2020)
2020-11-253ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-254STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-305NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 1 Complaint filed by Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr, 3 Electronic Filing Order, 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr, 4 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 11/25/2020.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-11-306ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United States Department of Housing and Urban Development* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jeffrey S Gentes* *Connecticut Fair Housing Center / Yale Law School* *60 Popieluszko Court or PO Box 209090,* *New Haven CT 06520 Hartford, CT 06106*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-027NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Pottenger, Jr on behalf of Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr (Pottenger, John) (Entered: 12/02/2020)
2021-01-088NOTICE of Appearance by Julie G. Turbert on behalf of United States Department of Housing and Urban Development (Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-089ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development.(Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-03-0810MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Student Interns NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Gentes on behalf of Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr Law Student Appearance Forms for Shannon Eddy, Morgan Savige, and Jeffrey Schroeder (Gentes, Jeffrey) Modified on 3/9/2021 to add motion relief (Perez, J.). (Entered: 03/08/2021)
2021-03-0911ORDER granting 10 Motion to Appear as to Law Student Appearance Shannon Eddy, Morgan Savige, and Jeffrey Schroeder. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/9/2021. (Perez, J.) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-11-0812ORDER. The parties shall, by November 19, 2021 , file a status report updating the Court on the progress of the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/8/2021. (Dalton, A.) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-11-2214ORDER. The parties shall, by January 7, 2022 , file a status report updating the Court on the progress of the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 11/22/2021. (Dalton, A.) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2022-01-0715Second STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-01-1016ORDER. The parties shall, by February 11, 2022 , file a status report updating the Court on the progress of the case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/10/2022. (Dalton, A.) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-02-1117Joint STATUS REPORT by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 02/11/2022)
2022-02-1318ORDER. Based on the most recent status report, ECF No. 17, the last category of responsive information in this case under the Freedom of Information Act has been provided, and no further relief from this Court may be necessary. As a result, rather than keep this case open, the Court will administratively close it, and by March 11, 2022 , the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal or a motion to reopen the case, to the extent further action is required. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/13/2022. (Dalton, A.) (Entered: 02/13/2022)
2022-02-13JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 02/14/2022)
2022-03-1119Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until April 11, 2022 to file a Stipulation of Dismissal or Motion to Reopen 18 Order,, by United States Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Turbert, Julie) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar