Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleISIKOFF v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2020cv03479
Date Filed2020-11-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge Beryl A. Howell
PlaintiffMICHAEL ISIKOFF
Case DescriptionJournalist Michael Isikoff submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Justice for records. The Office of Information Policy acknowledged receipt of the request and told Isikoff that his reqeust fell witnin the unusual circumstances exception for processing. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Isikoff filed
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUS DEPT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-11-301COMPLAINT against MICHAEL ISIKOFF ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7894334) filed by MICHAEL ISIKOFF. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Defendant Summons, # 3 Summons AG Summons, # 4 Summons US Attny Summons)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 11/30/2020)
2020-12-01Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-012SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-013STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 1, 2020. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-144RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 12/9/2020. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 1/8/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service)(Zaid, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2020)
2020-12-155NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of MICHAEL ISIKOFF (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 12/15/2020)
2020-12-226NOTICE of Appearance by Kristin Brudy-Everett on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 12/22/2020)
2021-01-087ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/08/2021)
2021-01-228Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 01/22/2021)
2021-02-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by March 22, 2021, a joint status report explaining the status of defendants searches and productions to date and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 8, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/22/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-03-229Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by May 21, 2021, a joint status report explaining the status of defendants' searches and productions to date and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 23, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/21/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-05-2110Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Brudy-Everett, Kristin) (Entered: 05/21/2021)
2021-05-24MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by August 19, 2021, a joint status report explaining the status of defendants' searches and productions to date and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 24, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/24/2021)
2021-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/19/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 05/25/2021)
2021-06-2811NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants Substituting for attorney Kristin Brudy-Everett (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
2021-08-1912Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by October 18, 2021, a joint status report describing the status of defendants' searches and productions to date and proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 23, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-08-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/18/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 08/23/2021)
2021-10-1813Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Walker, Johnny) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-20MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by November 17, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 20, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-20Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-11-1014NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney AUSA Johnny H. Walker (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/10/2021)
2021-11-1715Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2021)
2021-11-18MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by December 20, 2021, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 18, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 11/18/2021)
2021-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/20/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-2016Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by January 21, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 22, 2021. (lcbah3) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2021-12-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/21/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2022-01-2117Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 17 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by February 4, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 25, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 01/25/2022)
2022-01-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 01/25/2022)
2022-02-0418Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/04/2022)
2022-02-08MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 18 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by February 18, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 8, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/08/2022)
2022-02-08Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/18/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 02/08/2022)
2022-02-1819Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-02-22MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 19 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by February 25, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 22, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-22Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/25/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2520Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties' 20 Joint Status Report ("JSR"), the parties to submit, by March 15, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings and addressing the question listed below. Defendant indicated that a motion for summary judgment is pending in an analogous case in the Eastern District of Texas, Huddleston v. FBI & DOJ , 4:20-cv-447 (E.D. Tex.), and propose a stay, which plaintiff opposes, pending resolution of the summary judgment motion there. JSR at 2-3 (citing a seemingly incorrect case number, "4:19-cv-00180-ALM-KPJ"). On February 24, 2022, the defendants in Huddleston filed an unopposed motion to stay the briefing schedule for 30 days, which the court granted, because "the FBI has agreed to conduct two additional searches" which may resolve certain issues "currently being briefed by the parties." Defs.' Unopposed Mot. Stay Br. Sched. at 1, Huddleston , No. 4:20-cv-447 (E.D. Tex.), ECF No. 48. It is unclear whether these "additional searches" relate to any of the disputes between the parties in the instant case. Accordingly, the Court requests this updated joint status report in two weeks, which report should include the parties' assessment of the extent, if any, to which the "additional searches" affect the scope of remaining disputes here or otherwise should affect the path forward in this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/01/2022)
2022-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/15/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 03/02/2022)
2022-03-1521Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-2522Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 03/25/2022)
2022-03-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless), ISSUING, in light of the parties' 21 22 Joint Status Reports, the following SCHEDULING ORDER: (1) by May 16, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by June 17, 2022, plaintiff shall file its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment; and (3) by July 1, 2022, defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 28, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 03/28/2022)
2022-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motion due by 5/16/2022; opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 6/17/2022; reply due by 7/1/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-05-1323Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Summary Judgement Briefs by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-16MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendant's 23 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; and MODIFYING the scheduling order issued March 28, 2022, as follows: (1) by May 23, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by June 24, 2022, plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment; and (3) by July 8, 2022, defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 16, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's summary judgment motion due by 5/23/2022; plaintiff's opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 6/24/2022; defendant's reply due by 7/8/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-05-2324MOTION for Extension of Time to File by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-25MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING, nunc pro tunc , defendant's 24 Unopposed Motion for a 2-Day Extension of Time; and MODIFYING the scheduling order issued March 28, 2022, as follows: (1) by May 25, 2022, defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment; (2) by June 28, 2022, plaintiff shall file its opposition to defendant's motion for summary judgment; and (3) by July 12, 2022, defendant shall file any reply in support of its motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on May 25, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25ENTERED IN ERROR.....Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 6/13/2022; cross-motion and opposition to summary judgment motion due by 7/28/2022; opposition to cross-motion and reply to summary judgment motion due by 8/25/2022; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 10/10/2022. (ztg) Modified on 5/25/2022 (ztg). (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25NOTICE OF ERROR regarding Set/Reset Deadlines. The set/reset deadlines were set in this case in error, please disregard the entry. (ztg) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-25Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 5/25/2022; opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 6/28/2022; Reply due by 7/12/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-05-2525MOTION for Summary Judgment , Memorandum of Points and Authorities, and Proposed Order by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 05/25/2022)
2022-06-2326NOTICE of Concession by MICHAEL ISIKOFF (Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-06-23MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the parties jointly to file, by June 28, 2022, a notice advising the Court whether or not the parties intend to file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), in light of plaintiff's 26 Notice of Concession. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 23, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-06-24Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Order of the Court due by 6/28/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 06/24/2022)
2022-06-2827Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-28MINUTE ORDER (paperless) STAYING proceedings in this matter until August 30, 2022, upon consideration of the parties' 27 Joint Status Report; and DIRECTING the parties jointly to file a status report by August 30, 2022, informing the Court of the status of settlement negotiation and proposing a schedule for further proceedings if necessary, unless a stipulation of dismissal has been filed before that time. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 28, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 06/28/2022)
2022-06-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/30/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-29Case Stayed until August 30, 2022. (ztg) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-08-3028Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' 28 Joint Status Report, the stay in this action through September 30, 2022, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by September 30, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court on the status of their settlement discussions and (1) whether the stay should be extended or (2) proposing a schedule for further proceedings in this matter, unless a proposed settlement agreement has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 1, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/30/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/02/2022)
2022-09-3029Joint STATUS REPORT by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-05MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' 29 Joint Status Report, the stay in this action through October 31, 2022, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by October 31, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court on the status of their settlement discussions and (1) whether the stay should be extended or (2) proposing a schedule for further proceedings in this matter, unless a proposed settlement agreement has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 5, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-10-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/31/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 10/05/2022)
2022-10-3130Joint STATUS REPORT by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-10-31MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the parties' 30 Joint Status Report, the stay in this action through November 30, 2022, and DIRECTING the parties to file, by November 30, 2022, a joint status report advising the Court on the status of their settlement discussions and (1) whether the stay should be extended or (2) proposing a schedule for further proceedings in this matter, unless a proposed settlement agreement has been filed prior to that date. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 31, 2022. (lcbah3) (Entered: 10/31/2022)
2022-11-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/30/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 11/01/2022)
2022-11-3031Joint STATUS REPORT by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar