Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleLos Angeles Times Communications LLC v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2020cv10911
Date Filed2020-12-01
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha
PlaintiffLos Angeles Times Communications LLC
Case DescriptionLos Angeles Times Communications filed five FOIA requests with the Department of Homeland Security for records concerning the preparation of an Inspector General's report faulting the agency's operation of immigration detention centers. The newspaper also requested a fee waiver. The agency acknowledged request of the requests but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Los Angeles Times Communications filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - In camera review, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantOffice of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Complaint attachment 11
Complaint attachment 12
Complaint attachment 13
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2020-12-011COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-29289138 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M) (Attorney Daniel Aaron Laidman added to party Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(pty:pla))(Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-012CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-013NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-014Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-015Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Selina Jessie MacLaren counsel for Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Adding Selina MacLaren as counsel of record for Los Angeles Times Communications LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attorney Selina Jessie MacLaren added to party Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(pty:pla))(MacLaren, Selina) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-016Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kelli L Sager counsel for Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Adding Kelli L. Sager as counsel of record for Los Angeles Times Communications LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communicaitons LLC. (Attorney Kelli L Sager added to party Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(pty:pla))(Sager, Kelli) (Entered: 12/01/2020)
2020-12-037NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-038NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-03960 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (et) (Entered: 12/03/2020)
2020-12-0410NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) (Entered: 12/04/2020)
2020-12-1711NOTICE of New Case Order filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-New Case Order, # 2 Proof of Service)(Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/17/2020)
2020-12-2912STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendants U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security.(Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew Jimenez Barragan added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2020-12-2913ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-195) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-10911 FLA (MRWx). (mrgo) (Entered: 12/29/2020)
2021-02-0314ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 filed by Defendant Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Attorney Matthew J Smock added to party Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Smock added to party U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew J Smock added to party U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft))(Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-2415INITIAL STANDING ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (rrey) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2416NOTICE Of Initial Standing Order filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Initial Standing Order)(Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2417PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC, re Notice (Other) 16 of Initial Standing Order served on February 24, 2021. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/24/2021)
2021-02-2518NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: ATTACHMENT ONLY to Notice (Other)[16-1]. The following error(s) was/were found: Filer attached copy of court order with its active electronic headers intact, thus making current electronic headers to the attachment illegible. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-03-1919ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2021 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (gga) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-04-2820ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case DECLINED by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:20-cv-03512-ODW (JPRx) (aco) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-05-2821JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 1 day, filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet)(MacLaren, Selina) (Entered: 05/28/2021)
2021-06-0422TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on June 11, 2021 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 06/04/2021)
2021-06-2423ORDER RE: SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES, TRIAL REQUIREMENTS, AND CONDUCT OF ATTORNEYS AND PARTIES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/11/2022 03:00 PM; Motion in Limine set for hearing on 2/11/2022 at 03:00 PM;Bench Trial set for 2/22/2022 08:30 AM (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES). (lc) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-2424MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER GRANTING THE PARTIES REQUEST FOR A FURTHER STATUS REPORT DEADLINE AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ORDERS RELATED TO DEFENDANTS' DOCUMENT PRODUCTION 21 . Havingreviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report, the court GRANTS the parties' joint request, in part, and ORDERS the parties to file a further Joint Status Report to the court by July 30, 2021. The parties are ORDERED to continue to meet and confer regarding the scope and pace of Defendants' document production. Failure to produce non-exempt documents in a robust and timely manner may result in the imposition of sanctions. (lc) (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-07-3025STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Setting Summary Judgment Deadlines)(MacLaren, Selina) (Entered: 07/30/2021)
2021-08-1326NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/10/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jie Jenny Zou, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Jie Jenny Zou, # 3 Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 6 Exhibit D to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 7 Exhibit E to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 8 Exhibit F to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 9 Exhibit G to Declaration of Selina MacLaren, # 10 Proposed Order) (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 08/13/2021)
2021-08-1927STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 26) filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to file First Amended Complaint 26 . (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-09-0128TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT 26 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On August 13, 2021, Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications, LLC filed a motion for leave to file a First Amended Complaint ("Motion"). Dkt. 26. On August 19, 2021, Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, and U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement filed a notice of non-opposition to the Motion. Dkt. 27. Accordingly, the court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file the First Amended Complaint (Dkt. 26-4) within two (2) days of this order. The hearing on the Motion set for September 10, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. is hereby VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv) (Entered: 09/01/2021)
2021-09-0229First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-First FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B-Zou Follow-up Correspondence 153 and 175, # 3 Exhibit C-Acknowledgement Letter-153, # 4 Exhibit D-Second FOIA Request, # 5 Exhibit E-Acknowledgement Letter-175, # 6 Exhibit F-Third FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit G-Acknowledgement Letter 154, # 8 Exhibit H-Fourth FOIA Request, # 9 Exhibit I-Acknowledgement Letter-59244, # 10 Exhibit J-Zou Follow-up Correspondence 59244 and 62076, # 11 Exhibit K-Fifth FOIA Request, # 12 Exhibit L-Correspondence re CBP, # 13 Exhibit M-Acknowledgement Letter-62076, # 14 Exhibit N-Sixth FOIA Request, # 15 Exhibit O-ICE FOIA Administrative Appeals 59229 and 66549, # 16 Exhibit P-ICE Oct 26 2020 Response to Requester re 59229, # 17 Exhibit Q-Zou Piniero Emails, # 18 Exhibit R-April Admin Appeals, # 19 Exhibit S-June 17 2021 Letter, # 20 Exhibit T-Seventh FOIA Request, # 21 Exhibit U-March 12 2021 Letter re 66549, # 22 Exhibit V-June 15 2021 Letter)(Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-1630ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition,,,, 29 Answer to First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.(Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-11-0831STIPULATION to Vacate SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES (DKT NO. 23) Scheduling Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, 23 AND SET STATUS CONFERENCE IN THIS FOIA ACTION; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. BARRAGAN filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 11/08/2021)
2021-11-1632ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE SCHEDULE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL DATES AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE 31 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The Court GRANTS the parties' request in part, VACATES the Final Pretrial Conference and trial dates, and SETS an in-person Status Conference for December 3, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6B, regarding a production schedule and summary judgment deadlines. The court ORDERS the parties to submit a further Joint Status Report to the court by November 19, 2021 regarding: (1) any fully responded to FOIA requests that can be dismissed from the action; (2) the status of any rolling releases, and projected completion date for the production of any non-exempt documents; (3) a proposed briefing schedule for the parties' cross-motions for summary judgment; and (4) case law demonstrating the appropriate pace of document production in this FOIA action. (lc) (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-11-1933STATUS REPORT and Proposed Briefing Schedule filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2021-12-0234(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER ADVANCING THE TIME FOR THE STATUS CONFERENCE (DKT. 32 ) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: This Court, on its own motion, hereby ADVANCES the TIME for the Status Conference from December 3, 2021, at 1:30 p.m. TO December 3, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) (Entered: 12/02/2021)
2021-12-0335MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE RE: JOINT STATUS REPORT held before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: In light of the parties representations and arguments in the Joint Status Report 33 and at the Hearing, the court GRANTS Plaintiffs request and ORDERS Defendants to complete processing of all responsive pages no later than June 3, 2022 and to process a minimum of 3,000 pages per month. Defendants are ORDERED to complete all review no later than June 3, 2022; The parties are ORDERED to file a joint status report regarding Defendants pace of review and production no later than January 14, 2022; and The parties are ORDERED to appear for a status conference on January 21, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. The court further ORDERS the following briefing schedule regarding the parties anticipated cross-motions for summary judgment: 30 days after Defendants notify Plaintiff that final production is complete, Defendantsshall file their motion for summary judgment (MSJ); 30 days after Defendants file their MSJ, Plaintiff shall file its cross-MSJ and opposition to Defendants' MSJ; 21 days after Plaintiff's cross-MSJ and opposition, Defendants shall file their reply and opposition; 21 days after Defendants file their reply and opposition, Plaintiff shall file its reply; and 14 days after Plaintiff files its reply or on the first available date, a hearing shall be held on the various motions. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lc) (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-1736TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement DCN number: R22CACA0376 for Court Reporter. (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 12/17/2021)
2021-12-2037TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC for Court Reporter. Court will contact Dan Laidman at danlaidman@dwt.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-01-1438STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lynnea Schurkamp, # 2 Exhibit 1 (CBPs Response, dated December 6, 2021), # 3 Exhibit 2 (ICEs Fifth Interim Response, dated December 22, 2021), # 4 Exhibit 3 (ICEs Fourth Interim Response, dated December 1, 2021), # 5 Exhibit 4 (ICEs Sixth Interim Response, dated December 29, 2021))(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-1439NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Status Conference - optional html form,,,,, 35 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Schurkamp, # 2 Proposed Order) (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-01-1940(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On December 3, 2021, the court ordered the Defendants in this action to process a minimum of 3,000 pages per month relevant to Plaintiff's requests under the Freedom of Information Act. (Dkt. 35 ). The court further ordered the parties to file a Joint Status Report no later than January 14, 2022 regarding Defendants' pace of review and to appear for a Status Conference on January 21, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. ("Status Conference") to assess Defendants' compliance with the court's order. (Dkt. 35 ). On January 14, 2022, the Defendants filed a Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order ("Motion"), noticed for hearing on March 4, 2022, in which Defendants request the court modify the required pace of review. (Dkt. 39 ). Because the hearing on the Motion will address the same subject matter as would be addressed at the Status Conference, the court hereby VACATES the Status Conference scheduled for January 21, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/19/2022)
2022-01-1941TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 12/3/21 - 11:00 a.m.. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: ANNE KIELWASSER, phone number anne.kielwasser@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 2/9/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/19/2022. (Kielwasser, Anne) (Entered: 01/19/2022)
2022-01-1942NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 12/3/21 re Transcript 41 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Kielwasser, Anne) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/19/2022)
2022-02-1143OPPOSITION in opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Amend Status Conference - optional html form,,,,, 35 MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF 39 filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Laidman, Daniel) (Entered: 02/11/2022)
2022-02-1844REPLY filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement to Status Conference - optional html form,,,,, 35 in Support of Motion to Amend Scheduling Order (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-02-2445TEXT ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING DEFENDANT U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al. MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER (Dkt. 39 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court finds that the Motion to Amend Scheduling Order currently scheduled for hearing on March 4, 2022, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, this motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. The court expects the parties to continue litigating this action diligently, while awaiting the court's ruling on this motion. No appearances are necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 02/24/2022)
2022-03-0746MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER 39 . For the foregoing reasons, the court ORDERS as follows: Defendants Motion to Amend Scheduling Order is DENIED. The parties are ORDERED to file monthly joint status reports regarding Defendants' pace of review and production, with the next joint status report due no later than March 15, 2022 and another joint status report due no later than the 15th day of each month thereafter until the review and production are complete. The court REAFFIRMS its prior order as follows: Defendants are ORDERED to process at least 3,000 pages per month. Defendants are ORDERED to complete all review no later than June 3, 2022. (lc) (Entered: 03/07/2022)
2022-03-1547STATUS REPORT filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-04-1548STATUS REPORT [JOINT] filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-05-1349STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-06-2250(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On March 7, 2022, the court ordered the parties to file monthly joint status reports regarding Defendants' pace of review and production, with each status report due no later than the 15th day of each month until the review and production are complete. The parties did not file a joint status report on or before June 15, 2022. Accordingly, the court ORDERS the parties to file a joint status report regarding Defendants' pace of review and production, on or before June 29, 2022.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-2951STATUS REPORT Joint filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-2952Joint STIPULATION to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action: Declaration of Matthew J. Barragan filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2022)
2022-06-3053MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES 52 . The Court ORDERS as follows: 1. Defendants' deadline to file a motion for summary judgment ("MSJ") shall be August 19, 2022. 2. Plaintiff's deadline to file a cross-MSJ and opposition to Defendants' MSJ shall be September 19, 2022. 3. Defendants' deadline to file a reply in support of their MSJ and opposition toPlaintiffs MSJ shall be October 10, 2022. 4. Plaintiff's deadline to file a reply in support of its MSJ shall be October 31, 2022. 5. The court reserves November 18, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. as the hearing date and time for the parties' potential MSJs. (lc) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-2854Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Selina Jessie MacLaren counsel for Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Selina MacLaren is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (MacLaren, Selina) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-1155Joint STIPULATION to Continue Summary Judgment Deadlines in this FOIA Action: Declaration of Matthew J. Barragan filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1156NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proposed order ONLY to the Stipulation to Continue 55 . The following error(s) was/were found: L.R. 58-10 at least 2 lines of text must accompany the Signature Line for Signature of Judge on a last page of proposed order. HOWEVER, No date nor Signature line found...both MISSING. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 08/11/2022)
2022-08-1257ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES 55 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Defendants' deadline to file their Motion forSummary Judgment ("MSJ"):10/3/2022; Plaintiff's deadline to file its cross-MSJ and Opposition to Defendants MSJ: 11/3/2022; Defendants' deadline to file their Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's MSJ: 11/25/2022; Plaintiff's deadline to file its Reply: 12/15/2022;Hearing on Cross-Motions: 1/6/2023 1:30 PM. (lc) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-09-1958STIPULATION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. BARRAGAN filed by Defendant Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Smock, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-2259ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES 58 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Defendants shall file their motion for summary judgment : 11/17/2022; Plaintiff shall file its cross-MSJ and opposition to Defendants MSJ: 12/15/2022; Defendants shall file their reply and opposition: 1/5/2023; Plaintiff shall file its reply: 1/26/2023; Hearing on Cross-Motions: 2/17/2023 1:30 PM. (lc) (Entered: 09/22/2022)
2022-11-1660STIPULATION to Continue SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES IN THIS FOIA ACTION; DECLARATION OF MATTHEW J. BARRAGAN filed by Defendants Office of Inspector General, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Barragan, Matthew) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-1661Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Zoe Nicole McKinney counsel for Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. Adding Zoe McKinney as counsel of record for Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Los Angeles Times Communications LLC. (Attorney Zoe Nicole McKinney added to party Los Angeles Times Communications LLC(pty:pla))(McKinney, Zoe) (Entered: 11/16/2022)
2022-11-2162ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SUMMARY JUDGMENT DEADLINES by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha, re Stipulation to Continue, 60 . Having reviewed the Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, the court hereby GRANTS the parties' request, and CONTINUES the briefing schedule on the parties' anticipated Motions for Summary Judgment ("MSJ") as follows: Defendants' deadline to file a MSJ 12/16/2022; Plaintiff's deadline to file its cross-MSJ and Opposition to Defendants' MSJ 1/13/2023 ; Defendants' deadline to file a Reply and Opposition to Plaintiff's cross-MSJ 2/3/2023; Plaintiff's deadline to file a Reply 2/24/2023. Hearing on Cross-Motions 3/17/2023 at 1:30 p.m. (es) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar