Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2020-12-14 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-7954121) filed by JASON LEOPOLD, BUZZFEED INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet, # 6 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 2 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 3 | LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BUZZFEED INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-14 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-14 | 4 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/14/2020. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/14/2020) |
2020-12-15 | 5 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent) (zmd) (Entered: 12/15/2020) |
2021-02-10 | 6 | NOTICE of Appearance by Marcia Kay Sowles on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/10/2021) |
2021-02-10 | 7 | ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/10/2021) |
2021-02-11 | | MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before March 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/11/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 02/11/2021) |
2021-02-15 | 8 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 1/11/2021 (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2021) |
2021-02-15 | 9 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 1/11/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2021) |
2021-02-15 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 1/11/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 2/10/2021. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 02/15/2021) |
2021-03-08 | 11 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/08/2021) |
2021-03-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before April 7, 2021, addressing the status of Defendant's search and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/8/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/08/2021) |
2021-03-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/7/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 03/09/2021) |
2021-04-07 | 12 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 12 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before May 6, 2021, addressing the status of Defendant's search and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/7/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-04-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/6/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 04/07/2021) |
2021-05-06 | 13 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/06/2021) |
2021-05-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before June 8, 2021, addressing the status of Defendant's search and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/6/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/06/2021) |
2021-05-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 05/06/2021) |
2021-06-08 | 14 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-08 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before August 9, 2021, addressing the status of Defendants processing and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/8/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/08/2021) |
2021-06-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/9/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 06/09/2021) |
2021-08-06 | 15 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 08/06/2021) |
2021-08-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 15 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before October 7, 2021, addressing the status of Defendant's processing and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/6/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 08/06/2021) |
2021-08-09 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/7/2021. (zhmc) (Entered: 08/09/2021) |
2021-10-07 | 16 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-10-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 16 Joint Status Report, the parties shall submit a further Joint Status Report on or before December 7, 2021, addressing the status of Defendant's processing and recommending further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/7/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/07/2021) |
2021-10-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/7/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 10/08/2021) |
2021-12-07 | 17 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 12/07/2021) |
2021-12-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the 17 Joint Status Report, the parties shall file a further Joint Status Report on or before February 4, 2022, or within 14 days of Defendant completing its response to Plaintiffs' FOIA request, whichever is sooner. The Joint Status Report should update the Court on the status of production since the previous report and propose a schedule for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/7/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/07/2021) |
2021-12-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/4/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 12/08/2021) |
2022-02-04 | 18 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 02/04/2022) |
2022-02-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 18 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file a further status report on or before April 5, 2022 or 14 days after the Defendant completes production, whichever is sooner. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/4/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 02/04/2022) |
2022-02-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/5/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 02/07/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 19 | NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Loevy on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Loevy, Joshua) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-05 | 20 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 04/05/2022) |
2022-04-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 20 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file another status report on or before June 3, 2022, or 14 days after the Defendant completes its production, whichever is sooner. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/6/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 04/06/2022) |
2022-04-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/3/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 04/06/2022) |
2022-06-03 | 21 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 06/03/2022) |
2022-06-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 21 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file another status report on or before July 8, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 6/6/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 06/06/2022) |
2022-06-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/8/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 06/07/2022) |
2022-07-08 | 22 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 07/08/2022) |
2022-07-08 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 22 Joint Status Report, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file another status report on or before September 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/8/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 07/08/2022) |
2022-07-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/6/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 07/08/2022) |
2022-09-06 | 23 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 09/06/2022) |
2022-09-07 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 23 Joint Status Report, the parties are ORDERED to file another status report by November 4, 2022 or 14 days after the Defendant makes its supplemental production, whichever is sooner. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/7/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-09-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/4/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 09/07/2022) |
2022-11-04 | 24 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-04 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall file another Joint Status Report by January 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/4/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/04/2022) |
2022-11-07 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/10/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 11/07/2022) |
2023-01-10 | 25 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
2023-01-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report by March 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/10/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 01/10/2023) |
2023-01-11 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/10/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 01/11/2023) |
2023-02-28 | 26 | NOTICE of Appearance by Merrick Jason Wayne on behalf of BUZZFEED INC., JASON LEOPOLD (Wayne, Merrick) (Entered: 02/28/2023) |
2023-03-10 | 27 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-10 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by May 9, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/10/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/10/2023) |
2023-03-13 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/9/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 03/13/2023) |
2023-05-09 | 28 | Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Sowles, Marcia) (Entered: 05/09/2023) |
2023-05-09 | | MINUTE ORDER: The parties shall submit another Joint Status Report by July 10, 2023. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 5/9/2023. (lctnm1) (Entered: 05/09/2023) |
2023-05-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2023. (hmc) (Entered: 05/10/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |