Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJARVIS v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv00088
Date Filed2021-01-08
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui
PlaintiffDEREK N. JARVIS
Case DescriptionDerek Jarvis submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Housing and Urban Development for records concerning an investigation of Grady Management. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Jarvis filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Recovery of Costs

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT
AppealD.C. Circuit 22-5280
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-01-08Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 01/08/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-081COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT with Jury Demand filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(zsb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-082MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by DEREK N. JARVIS (zsb) (Entered: 01/13/2021)
2021-01-15MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion 2 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk shall randomly assign this case to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Tanya S. Chutkan on 1/15/2021.(psu1) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-15Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zsb) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-01-153STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/15/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/15/2021)
2021-02-084SUMMONS (3) Issued as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service (zsb) (Entered: 02/08/2021)
2021-02-105RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/10/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 3/12/2021. (eg) (Entered: 02/12/2021)
2021-02-256NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth A. Adebonojo on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-257NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-25MINUTE ORDER. Given Defendant's 7 Notice of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge, Plaintiff shall inform the Court by March 25, 2021 whether he consents to referral of this action to a Magistrate Judge for all purposes. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/25/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 02/25/2021)
2021-02-26Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response due by 3/25/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 02/26/2021)
2021-03-098Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-09MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's 8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall respond to Plaintiff's 1 Complaint by April 13, 2021. Defendant is directed to Paragraph 9(A) of the Court's 3 Standing Order, which states that motions for extension of time "must be filed at least four business days prior to the first affected deadline." Future requests that do not comply with this requirement may be denied. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/9/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/09/2021)
2021-03-10Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's response to the Complaint due by 4/13/2021. (hmc) (Entered: 03/10/2021)
2021-03-119Consent to Proceed before US Magistrate Judge for All Purposes by DEREK N. JARVIS.. (eg) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-19MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE to a Magistrate Judge, to be assigned at random by the Clerk's Office, for all purposes, pursuant to the parties' 7 and 9 Notices of Consent to Assignment to Magistrate Judge. See LCvR 73.1(a). Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/19/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-19CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui for all purposes. (zsb) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-04-0810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) Modified event on 4/9/2021 (ztd). (Entered: 04/08/2021)
2021-04-09ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to file Answer; Defendant shall file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by May 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 4/9/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 04/09/2021)
2021-05-1411Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-14MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall answer the Complaint by June 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 5/14/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 05/17/2021)
2021-05-2112RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT served on 5/18/2021 (eg) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-05-2713STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. This Order shall replace Judge McFadden's earlier Standing Order 3 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 5/27/2021. (lclw) (Entered: 05/27/2021)
2021-06-1514ANSWER to 1 Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT.(Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1515NOTICE of Appearance by Heather D. Graham-Oliver on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-1616CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT re 14 Answer to Complaint . (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-06-1617CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT re 15 Notice of Appearance . (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-09-0918Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/09/2021)
2021-09-14ORDER adopting Proposed Briefing Schedule in 18 Parties' Joint Status Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 9/14/2021. (lcam) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1719NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. Attorney Heather D. Graham-Oliver terminated. (Graham-Oliver, Heather) (Entered: 09/17/2021)
2021-10-2820Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-29MINUTE ORDER: granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are directed to adhere to the following briefing schedule: (1) Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment is due on November 19, 2021; (2) Plaintiffs Opposition is due on January 7, 2022; (3) Defendants Reply is due on January 28, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 10/29/2021. (lcam) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-1921MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration Rachel Leith, # 3 Declaration Deborah Snowden, # 4 Exhibit Deborah Snowden Declaration Exhibits)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2022-01-0522Memorandum in opposition to re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (znmw) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-01-2823REPLY to opposition to motion re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/28/2022)
2022-08-2924ORDER advising Plaintiff of Summary Judgment standards. Plaintiff may supplement his previously filed opposition on or before September 12, 2022. Defendant may file any further reply on or before September 19, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 08/29/2022. (lcam) (Entered: 08/29/2022)
2022-09-1925NOTICE of Change of Address by DEREK N. JARVIS (zjm) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-1926Supplemental Memorandum in opposition to re 21 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Derek Jarvis, # 2 Affidavit of Shirley Pittman)(zjm) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-09-3027MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 9/20/2022. (lcia) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-09-3028ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui on 9/20/2022. (lcia) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
2022-10-2129NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to 28 Order by DEREK N. JARVIS. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (zjm) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-2430Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re 29 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjm) (Entered: 10/24/2022)
2022-10-25USCA Case Number 22-5280 for 29 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by DEREK N. JARVIS. (zjm) (Entered: 10/25/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar