Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleBioscience Advisors, Inc. v. United States Securities and Exchange Commission et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv00866
Date Filed2021-02-03
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
PlaintiffBioscience Advisors, Inc. a California corporation
Case DescriptionBioscience Advisors, Inc. submitted a series of FOIA requests to the Securities and Exchange Commission for records concerning requests by companies for confidential treatment of information and the expiration date of those confidentiality claims. In 2020, the SEC began to respond to Bioscience Advisors requests by telling the company that it found no records. Bioscience Advisors ultimately filed suit under both FOIA and the Federal Records Act.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Jurisdiction - Injunction

DefendantUnited States Securities and Exchange Commission
DefendantAllison Herren Lee in her official capacity as Acting Chair of the United States Securities and Exchange Commission
DefendantAllison Herren Lee in her official capacity as Acting Chair of the United States Securities and Exchange Commission
TERMINATED: 05/24/2021
DefendantNational Archives and Records Administration
DefendantDavid S. Ferriero in his official capacity as Archivist of the United States
DefendantGary Gensler
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [31]
Opinion/Order [36]
Opinion/Order [39]
Opinion/Order [41]
Opinion/Order [46]
Opinion/Order [51]
Opinion/Order [56]
Opinion/Order [58]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-02-031NO PROCESS- COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15530987). Filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/3/2021) Modified on 2/4/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/03/2021)
2021-02-042Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/18/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-043Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 5/4/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/11/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2021) (Entered: 02/04/2021)
2021-02-164Proposed Summons. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-165Proposed Summons. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-166Proposed Summons. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/16/2021) (Entered: 02/16/2021)
2021-02-177Summons Issued as to David S. Ferriero, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-178Summons Issued as to National Archives and Records Administration. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-179Summons Issued as to Allison Herren Lee, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)
2021-02-1810Proposed Summons. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/18/2021) (Entered: 02/18/2021)
2021-02-19Electronic filing error . Name on Summons must match the corresponding name on the Complaint exactly. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 10 Proposed Summons filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2021) (Entered: 02/19/2021)
2021-02-2211Proposed Summons. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-2212CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/8/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2021) (Entered: 02/22/2021)
2021-02-2313Summons Issued as to United States Securities and Exchange Commission, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2021) (Entered: 02/23/2021)
2021-03-1114CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 3/25/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2021) (Entered: 03/11/2021)
2021-03-1515CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bioscience Advisors, Inc... (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 3/15/2021) (Entered: 03/15/2021)
2021-03-1816NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra Rachel Saslaw (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-2217CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by David S. Ferriero, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission.. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-2218CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) (Entered: 03/22/2021)
2021-03-2319ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case, Signed by the Clerk on 3/23/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-03-2320CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 11, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 4, 2021. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:21-cv-00866-HSG. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-04-2021ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-2022ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-2323CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 20 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference set for May 11th will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2021) (Entered: 04/23/2021)
2021-04-2624MOTION to Dismiss filed by David S. Ferriero, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 5/10/2021. Replies due by 5/17/2021. (Attachments: # 1 McInerney Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Proposed Order)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/26/2021) (Entered: 04/26/2021)
2021-04-27Electronic filing error . REMINDER TO COUNSEL: Judges name is incorrect on the signature line of the Proposed Order. Counsel need not re-file the document , but should refere nce the Judges name as Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on future filings. Re: 24 MOTION to Dismiss filed by National Archives and Records Administration, David S. Ferriero, United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Allison Herren Lee (bnsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-05-0425MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement filed by David S. Ferriero, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/4/2021) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-05-0526ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Case Management Statement. Joint Case Management Statement due by 5/6/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2021) (Entered: 05/05/2021)
2021-05-0627JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by David S. Ferriero, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission, and Bioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/6/2021) Modified on 5/7/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/06/2021)
2021-05-1028CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that on July 22, 2021 at 2:00 PM the Honorable Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. will conduct the Initial Case Management Conference previously notice for May 11, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2021) (Entered: 05/10/2021)
2021-05-1229ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. DIRECTING Plaintiff TO SHOW CAUSE why Dkt. No. 24 Defendant's motion to dismiss should not be granted for failure to file a response by the May 10, 2021 deadline, or a statement of non-opposition as required by Civil L.R. 7-3(b). Plaintiff shall file a statement of two pages or less by May 19, 2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2021) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
2021-05-1430STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Amendment and Briefing Schedule, filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc., David S. Ferriero, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 5/14/2021) Modified on 5/17/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/14/2021)
2021-05-1831ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 30 Stipulation Re Amendment and Briefing Schedule. Admissions due by 5/24/2021; Motions due by 6/14/2021; and Responses due by 6/28/2021. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)
2021-05-2432FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bioscience Advisors, Inc., David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filed byBioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 5/24/2021) Modified on 5/25/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/24/2021)
2021-06-1433MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/22/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/28/2021. Replies due by 7/6/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Order)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 6/14/2021) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-2434MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan A. Collier (Filing fee $ 317, receipt number 0971-16111642.) filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Utah))(Collier, Jonathan) (Filed on 6/24/2021) Modified on 6/25/2021 (jlmS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/24/2021)
2021-06-2835OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byBioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 6/28/2021) (Entered: 06/28/2021)
2021-06-3036ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 34 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan A. Collier. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-0637REPLY (re 33 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byDavid S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 7/6/2021) (Entered: 07/06/2021)
2021-07-2138CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the Court takes the pending 33 motion to dismiss filings under submission. The hearing and the case management conference previously scheduled for July 22, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. The Court will issue a written order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2021) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2022-02-0839ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 33 MOTION TO DISMISS. Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2022; Case Management Statement due by 2/22/2022; and Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/1/2022 02:00 PM. Given the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the parties will be advised closer to the hearing whether it will take place telephonically or in person.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2022) (Entered: 02/08/2022)
2022-02-1840STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-02-2241ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 40 STIPULATION REQUESTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Given the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic, the parties will be advised closer to the hearing whether it will take place telephonically or in person (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2542CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 41 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for March 15, 2022 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-0143AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, Allison Herren Lee, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Filed byBioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Spreadsheet Listing FOIA Violations,, # 2 Exhibit B - Email from Felicia Taylor to Plaintiff dated May 20, 2020, # 3 Exhibit C - Email from Carrie Hyde-Michaels to Plaintiff dated July 20, 2020, # 4 Exhibit D - Emails from SEC Dated 5-21-20, # 5 Exhibit E - Email from Lizzette Katilius to Plaintiff dated September 11, 2020, # 6 Exhibit F - FOIA Appeal Response October 28, 2021, # 7 Exhibit G - FOIA Log October 2020, # 8 Exhibit H - FOIA Log October 2021, # 9 Exhibit I - Order Granting Confidential Treatment re Forty Seven, # 10 Exhibit J - Forty Seven FOIA Request, # 11 Exhibit K - Forty Seven FOIA Response, # 12 Exhibit L - Order Granting Confidential Treatment - Keryx, # 13 Exhibit M - FOIA Request - Keryx, # 14 Exhibit N - Order re FOIA Request - Keryx)(Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)
2022-03-0844JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)
2022-03-1545Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/15/2022. Total Time in Court: 7 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Chad Pehrson. Defendant Attorney: Alexandra Saslaw. Parties are each directed to submit a letter brief of no more than 5 pages by March 22, 2022, and responsive briefs of no more than 5 pages by March 29, 2022, regarding discovery issues as stated on the record. The Court sets the following deadlines: Answer to Complaint Due 4/12/2022; Motion for Summary Judgment Due 5/17/2022; Opposition Due 6/15/2022; Reply Due 7/6/2022; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment set for 8/4/2022 at 2:00pm. Written scheduling order to issue. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (wft, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/15/2022) Modified on 3/28/2022 to correct hearing date for Motion for Summary Judgment.(wft, COURT STAFF). Modified on 3/28/2022 to clarify hearing held telephonically. (wft, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/16/2022)
2022-03-2146SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/21/2022. Motions due by 5/17/2022. Responses due by 6/15/2022. Replies due by 7/6/2022. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2022) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-2247Discovery Letter Brief filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-2248Discovery Letter Brief filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 3/22/2022) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-2949Discovery Letter Brief filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-2950Second Discovery Letter Brief filed by Bioscience Advisors, Inc.. (Pehrson, Chad) (Filed on 3/29/2022) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-04-0751ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. STAYING DISCOVERY. This order terminates docket nos. 47 , 48 , 49 , and 50 . (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2022) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-1152****DISREGARD, SEE DOCKET NO. 53.*** CLERKS NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the dispositive motion hearing previously scheduled for August 4, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. will be held on July 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) Modified on 4/11/2022 to identify location for motion hearing (cwlc4, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/11/2022 (ndr, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-1153ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Notice is hereby given that the dispositive motion hearing previously scheduled for August 4, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. will be held on July 28, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 2, 4th Floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cwlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-11Reset Hearing, See Docket No. 53 : Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-1254ANSWER to Amended Complaint byDavid S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 4/12/2022) (Entered: 04/12/2022)
2022-05-1355STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/13/2022) (Entered: 05/13/2022)
2022-05-1656ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 55 Stipulation. Motions due by 5/24/2022; Responses due by 6/22/2022; and Replies due by 7/13/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/16/2022) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-05-2457STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Leave to File Excess Pages filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-2458ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 57 Stipulation Regarding Leave to File Excess Pages. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-2459NOTICE by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission of Filing of Administrative Record (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Administrative Record, # 2 Index to Administrative Record, # 3 Administrative Record, # 4 Certification of Administrative Record, # 5 Index to Administrative Record, # 6 Administrative Record, # 7 Certification of Administrative Record)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
2022-05-2460MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by David S. Ferriero, Gary Gensler, National Archives and Records Administration, United States Securities and Exchange Commission. Motion Hearing set for 7/28/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S Gilliam Jr.. Responses due by 6/22/2022. Replies due by 7/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Decl. of Raymond McInerney, # 2 Decl. of Mark Tallarico, # 3 Proposed Order)(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Filed on 5/24/2022) (Entered: 05/24/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar