Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSafe Horizon, Inc. et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
DistrictSouthern District of New York
CityFoley Square
Case Number1:2021cv02328
Date Filed2021-03-17
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Lewis A. Kaplan
PlaintiffSafe Horizon, Inc.
PlaintiffASISTA Immigration Assistance
Case DescriptionSafe Horizon, Inc. and Asista Immigration Assistance submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services for records concerning the agency's policies for adjudicating U-visa petitions. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Safe Horizon filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States Citizenship and Immigration Services
DefendantUnited States Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Opinion/Order [27]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-03-171COMPLAINT against United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24265732)Document filed by Safe Horizons, Inc., ASISTA Immigration Assistance. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Letter, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Letter, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Letter).(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-172CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-173RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-174REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-175FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) Modified on 3/18/2021 (sj). (Entered: 03/17/2021)
2021-03-18CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions . .(sj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf . (sj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18Case Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-186ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Citizenship and Immigration Services. (sj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-18***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Akiva Shapiro to RE-FILE Document No. 5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party as to whom the summons request is for must be listed first in the "TO" field. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-187REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Homeland Security, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizons, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 03/18/2021)
2021-03-198ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Homeland Security. (sj) (Entered: 03/19/2021)
2021-03-239ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation); All such motions: X. Referred to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/23/2021) (jca) (Entered: 03/23/2021)
2021-04-0110SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021; United States Department of Homeland Security served on 3/19/2021, answer due 4/9/2021. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Safe Horizon, Inc.; ASISTA Immigration Assistance..(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 04/01/2021)
2021-04-2111ANSWER to 1 Complaint,. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Hogan, Alexander) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-23Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 5/12/2021 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. The parties should call Toll-Free Number: 877-411-9748 and use Access Code: 9612281. (aba) (Entered: 04/29/2021)
2021-04-2712NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Emil Natanson Nachman on behalf of ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Nachman, Emil) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-05-12Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Initial Pretrial Conference held via telephone on 5/12/2021. Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2021. (aba) (Entered: 05/12/2021)
2021-06-0413JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated June 4, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 06/04/2021)
2021-06-0514MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 13 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 6/5/2021) (mml) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-07-2915LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated July 29, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 07/29/2021)
2021-08-0216MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 15 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The parties are directed to provide an updated status report regarding the progress of discovery and their settlement discussions by 9/2/2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 8/2/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 08/02/2021)
2021-09-0217JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated September 2, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-2718MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 17 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: Request that the parties submit another joint status report to the Court on October 13, 2021, to update the Court on the status of parties' discussions and to propose next steps. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 9/27/2021) (tg) Modified on 9/28/2021 (tg). (Entered: 09/27/2021)
2021-10-1319LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated October 13, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-1420MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 19 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 10/14/2021) (ks) (Entered: 10/14/2021)
2021-12-1521LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated December 15, 2021 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Bach, Nathaniel) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2022-02-1622The parties are directed to provide an updated status report no later than 2/18/2022. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Debra Freeman) (Text Only Order) (Freeman, Debra) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-1623LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated February 16, 2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-1624MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 23 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 2/16/2022) (ks) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-04-1525LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman from Akiva Shapiro dated April 15, 2022 re: Joint Status Report. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-1526MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 25 Letter filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman on 4/15/2022) (jca) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-04-30NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (laq) (Entered: 04/30/2022)
2022-04-30NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF A REFERRAL TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The referral in the above entitled action has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo, for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman no longer referred to the case. (laq) (Entered: 04/30/2022)
2022-05-0327ORDER: On April 30, 2022, this case was reassigned to me for general pretrial supervision and to report and recommend on any dispositive motions. The parties are ordered to file a joint status letter no later than May 10, 2022, providing the Court a brief statement of claims and defenses, the current pre-trial schedule, the status of discovery and whether the parties have had settlement talks or wish to schedule a settlement conference at this time. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 5/3/2022) (rro) (Entered: 05/03/2022)
2022-05-1028LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from Akiva Shapiro dated May 10, 2022 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by ASISTA Immigration Assistance, Safe Horizon, Inc...(Shapiro, Akiva) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-05-1829PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Homeland Security..(Tarczynska, Dominika) (Entered: 05/18/2022)
2022-05-1930CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Attorney Dominika Natalia Tarczynska for United States Citizenship and Immigration Services,Dominika Natalia Tarczynska for United States Department of Homeland Security added. Attorney Alexander James Hogan terminated.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/19/22) (yv) (Entered: 05/19/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar