Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California et al v. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement et al
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv02632
Date Filed2021-04-13
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Civil Liberties Union of Northern California
PlaintiffMijente Support Committee
PlaintiffJust Futures Law
PlaintiffImmigrant Defense Project
Case DescriptionThe ACLU of Northern California, Muente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and the Immigrant Defense Project submitted FOIA requests to the Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, and U.S. Customs and Border Protection for records concerning the agency's contract with Clearview AI to use its facial recognition software. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the requests. After hearing nothing from the agencies, the ACLU filed an administrative appeal of the request. After hearing nothing further from any of the agencies, the ACLU filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees, Adequacy - Search

DefendantU.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
DefendantU.S. Customs and Border Protection
DefendantU.S. Department of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [30]
Opinion/Order [39]
Opinion/Order [47]
Opinion/Order [53]
Opinion/Order [58]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-04-131COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (Filing Fee $402, receipt number 0971-15829272). Filed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021) Modified on 4/14/2021 (anjS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-132Proposed Summons. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-133Certificate of Interested Entities by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/13/2021) (Entered: 04/13/2021)
2021-04-144Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/28/2021. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-145Summons Issued as to U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-146Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2021) (Entered: 04/14/2021)
2021-04-207SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-208SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Customs and Border Protection served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-209SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 4/20/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-2010SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Service on United States (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executed Summons for Attorney General's Office)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/20/2021)
2021-04-20Electronic filing error . No title Page. Certificates/Proofs of Service e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, 9 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, 10 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, 8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, filed by Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-2211SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 7 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-04-2212SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 8 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-04-2213SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 9 (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-04-2214SUMMONS Returned Executed by Immigrant Defense Project, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. Correction of Dkt 10 (Attachments: # 1 Summons Executed Summons for Attorney General's Office)(Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/22/2021) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
2021-04-2715CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee.. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 4/27/2021) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-05-1916ANSWER to Complaint byU.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 5/19/2021) (Entered: 05/19/2021)
2021-05-2017CLERK'S NOTICE TO DEFENDANTS Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 6/3/2021. (dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2021) (Entered: 05/20/2021)
2021-06-0318CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement.. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 6/3/2021) (Entered: 06/03/2021)
2021-06-3019ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-3020ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-3021ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Immigrant Defense Project (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-3022ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Just Futures Law (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-06-3023ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Mijente Support Committee (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-0924CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig , COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-1425JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, the U.S. Customs and Border Protection and the U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-2126Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/21/2021. Case Management Statement due by 8/25/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 9/1/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined.Recorded via Zoom: 2:07 - 2:13. Plaintiff Attorney: Vasudha Talla. Defendant Attorney: Savith Iyengar. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2021) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-08-2527JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and Immigrant Defense Project. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/25/2021) Modified on 8/26/2021 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-2628CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Case Management Conference previously set for 9/1/2021 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 9/29/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by no later than 9/22/2021. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcast ing of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)
2021-09-2229STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law and Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 9/22/2021) Modified on 9/23/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2330ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 29 Stipulation continuing Further Case Management Conference: Parties shall submit an updated Joint Case Management Statement by 10/13/2021. Further Case Management Conference is continued to 10/20/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and reb roadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/ zoom/ . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 9/23/2021. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2021) (Entered: 09/23/2021)
2021-10-1331JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law and Mijente Support Committee. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 10/13/2021) Modified on 10/14/2021 (bnsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-2032PLEASE DISREGARD DOCKET ENTRY 32 , SEE DOCKET ENTRY 33 AMENDED MINUTES INSTEAD. Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/20/2021 by Zoom video conference. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Please see minute Order for all particulars. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Recorded in Zoom: 2:19-2:54. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/20/2021) Modified on 10/21/2021 (ig, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/20/2021)
2021-10-2033AMENDED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 10/20/2021 by Zoom video conference. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/8/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/15/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Please see minute Order for all particulars. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Recorded in Zoom: 2:19-2:54. Attachment: Amended Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/20/2021) (Entered: 10/21/2021)
2021-11-1634Declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA Officer Lynnea Schurkamp Regarding ICE's Process for Marking Duplicates re 33 Case Management Conference - Further by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 11/16/2021) Modified on 11/17/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/16/2021)
2021-12-0835JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law and Mijente Support Committee. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 12/8/2021) Modified on 12/9/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/08/2021)
2021-12-1536Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 12/15/2021 by Zoom video conference. Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcastin g of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . Recorded in Zoom: 10:01-10:15. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/15/2021) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-1637Supplemental Declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA Officer Lynnea Schurkamp Regarding ICE's Process for Marking Duplicates re 33 Case Management Conference - Further, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 12/16/2021) Modified on 12/16/2021 (bns, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2022-01-1238STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 1/12/2022) Modified on 1/13/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/12/2022)
2022-01-1339ORDER [AS MODIFIED] Granting 38 Stipulation Continuing Further Case Management Conference: Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Statement by 1/26/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2022 01:30 PM is vacated and continued to 2/2/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroad casting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom / . Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 1/13/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2022) (Entered: 01/13/2022)
2022-01-1940AFFIDAVIT re 33 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, Supplemental Declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA Officer Lynnea Schurkamp Regarding ICE's Process for Marking Duplicates by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 1/19/2022) (Entered: 01/19/2022)
2022-01-2641JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Immigrant Defense Project, Just Futures Law, Mijente Support Committee. (Talla, Vasudha) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)
2022-02-0242Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference held on 2/2/2022 by Zoom video conference. Per the parties' agreement, CBP shall process records from the first tranche at a rate of 750 pages per month, without prejudice to Plaintiffs arguing for a higher process rate in the future.Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/27/2022. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Recorded in Zoom: 3:30-3:35. Attachment: Civil Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/2/2022) (Entered: 02/03/2022)
2022-02-1743AFFIDAVIT re 33 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, Supplemental Declaration of ICE deputy FOIA Officer Lynnea Schurkamp regarding ICE's process for marking duplicates by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 2/17/2022) Modified on 2/18/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/17/2022)
2022-03-1844AFFIDAVIT re 33 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 3/18/2022) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-1945Supplemental Declaration re 33 Case Management Conference - Further, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 4/19/2022) Modified on 4/20/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/19/2022)
2022-04-2746Stipulation to Continue Further Case Management Conference with Proposed Order filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement,American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 4/27/2022) Modified on 4/28/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-04-2747ORDER (AS MODIFIED) 46 granting Stipulation Continuing Further Case Management Conference: Further Case Management Conference is continued to 6/29/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties shall file an updated joint Case Management Statement by 6/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 4/27/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2022) (Entered: 04/27/2022)
2022-05-2348SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ICE DEPUTY FOIA OFFICER LYNNEA SCHURKAMP REGARDING ICES PROCESS FOR MARKING DUPLICATES by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 5/23/2022) Modified on 5/23/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-06-2249AFFIDAVIT re 33 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-2250STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 6/22/2022) Modified on 6/23/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-2251NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Freeman (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/22/2022) (Entered: 06/22/2022)
2022-06-2352NOTICE of Appearance by William S. Freeman (Freeman, William) (Filed on 6/23/2022) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-06-2353ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 50 Stipulation to Continue Further Case Management Conference: Parties shall file a joint updated Case Management Conference Statement by 8/10/2022. Further Case Management Conference is continued to 8/17/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties can find Judge Ryu's virtual Zoom courtroom at: https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/23/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2022) (Entered: 06/23/2022)
2022-07-0554NOTICE of Change In Counsel by William S. Freeman Withdrawal of Vasudha Talla (Freeman, William) (Filed on 7/5/2022) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-07-1155NOTICE of Appearance by Sana Singh (Singh, Sana) (Filed on 7/11/2022) (Entered: 07/11/2022)
2022-07-2256AFFIDAVIT re 33 Case Management Conference - Further,,,, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 7/22/2022) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-08-0357Stipulation to Continuing Further Case Management Conference filed by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, American Civil Liberties Union of Northern California, Mijente Support Committee, Just Futures Law, and Immigrant Defense Project. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Savith Iyengar)(Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/3/2022) Modified on 8/4/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0558ORDER (AS MODIFIED) granting 57 Stipulation to Continuing Further Case Management Conference: Updated Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/12/2022. Further Case Management Conference is continued to 10/19/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Parties are reminded that they should always consult Judge Ryu's scheduling notes when proposing a new date for further case management conference and also per Judge Ryu's StandingOrder, Civil case management conferences are heard on the first, third, and fifth Wednesdays of the month at 1:30 PM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 8/5/2022. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2022) (Entered: 08/05/2022)
2022-08-2359Supplemental Declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA officer Lynnea Schurkamp regarding ICE's process for making duplicates re 33 Case Management Conference - Further, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 8/23/2022) Modified on 8/24/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/23/2022)
2022-09-2160Supplemental declaration of ICE Deputy FOIA Officer Lynnea Schurkanp regarding ICE's process for marking duplicates re 33 Case Management Conference - Further, by U.S. Customs and Border Protection, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Iyengar, Savith) (Filed on 9/21/2022) Modified on 9/22/2022 (anj, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-3061CLERK'S NOTICE: Notice is hereby given to all parties that the Further Case Management Conference set for 10/19/2022 01:30 PM is vacated and rescheduled to 11/2/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Parties shall file an updated Joint Case Management Conference Statement by 10/26/2022. All counsel and parties may access the webinar information at https://cand.uscourts.gov/judges/ryu-donna-m-dmr/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2022) (Entered: 09/30/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar