Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleAmerican Small Business League v. United States Small Business Administration
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv02877
Date Filed2021-04-21
Date Closed2022-06-07
JudgeMagistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu
PlaintiffAmerican Small Business League
DefendantUnited States Small Business Administration
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [30]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-04-211ORDER Granting Motion to Sever. Signed by Judge Donna M. Ryu on April 21, 2021. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-212Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/14/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2021) (Entered: 04/21/2021)
2021-04-283COMPLAINT against United States Small Business Administration ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15901734.). Filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-04-284Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons)(Olson, Karl) (Filed on 4/28/2021) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-04-295Summons Issued as to United States Small Business Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2021) (Entered: 04/29/2021)
2021-05-116DEFENDANT UNITED STATES SMALL BUSINESS ADMIMISTRATON'S ANSWER to Complaint byUnited States Small Business Administration. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 5/11/2021) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-06-047Application for Refund re 3 Complaint, Receipt Number 0971-15901585 by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)
2021-06-088Refund Status re 7 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2021) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-309ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)
2021-07-0110ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 7/1/2021) (Entered: 07/01/2021)
2021-07-0911CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. The Initial Case Management Conference is set for 7/21/2021 01:30 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/dmr General Order 58. Persons granted a ccess to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/ . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ig , COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)
2021-07-1412JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by United States Small Business Administration, American Small Business League. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-1413JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 7/14/2021) Modified on 7/15/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-2114Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Initial Case Management Conference held on 7/21/2021. Dispositive Motion due by 8/30/2021. Responses due by 10/8/2021. Replies due by 10/29/2021. Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.Recorded via Zoom: 1:50 - 2:03. Plaintiff Attorney: Irene Lee, Karl Olson. Defendant Attorney: Kenneth Brakebill. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/21/2021) (Entered: 07/21/2021)
2021-08-3015MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by American Small Business League. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/8/2021. Replies due by 10/29/2021. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3016Declaration of Lloyd Chapman in Support of 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Related document(s) 15 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3017Declaration of Karl Olson in Support of 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 15 ) (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-08-3018Proposed Order re 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment by American Small Business League. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 8/30/2021) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-10-0819MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by United States Small Business Administration. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 10/29/2021. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-0820Declaration of Eric S. Benderson in Support of 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed byUnited States Small Business Administration. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exh. A, # 2 Exhibit Exh. B, # 3 Exhibit Exh. C, # 4 Exhibit Exh. D, # 5 Exhibit Exh. E, # 6 Exhibit Exh. F, # 7 Exhibit Exh. G, # 8 Exhibit Exh. H, # 9 Exhibit Exh. I, # 10 Exhibit Exh. J, # 11 Exhibit Exh. K, # 12 Exhibit Exh. L, # 13 Exhibit Exh. M, # 14 Exhibit Exh. N, # 15 Exhibit Exh. O, # 16 Exhibit Exh. P, # 17 Exhibit Exh. Q, # 18 Exhibit Exh. R)(Related document(s) 19 ) (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-0821Proposed Order re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by United States Small Business Administration. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)
2021-10-2922OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT , 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment ) filed byAmerican Small Business League. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Karl Olson)(Field, Aaron) (Filed on 10/29/2021) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2021-11-0423CLERK'S NOTICE Changing Time for Motion Hearing and Case Management Conference as to 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND CROSS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT and Further Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2021) (Entered: 11/04/2021)
2021-11-1224STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re 23 Clerk's Notice, Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings, 14 Case Management Conference - Initial, Set Deadlines/Hearings, STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER REGARDING HEARING DATE ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DECLARATION filed by United States Small Business Administration. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/12/2021) Modified on 11/15/2021 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/12/2021)
2021-11-1525Order by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting 24 Stipulation as modified. Hearing on Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment set for 2/10/2022 at 1:00 PM in Oakland via Zoom Videoconference, followed by Further Case Management Conference also set for 2/10/2022 at 1:00 PM in Oakland via Zoom Videoconference before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu.(dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2021) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-1926REPLY Memorandum in Support of (re 19 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross Motion for Summary Judgment; Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) filed by United States Small Business Administration. (Brakebill, Kenneth) (Filed on 11/19/2021) Modified on 11/21/2021 (gba, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/19/2021)
2022-02-1027Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu: Further Case Management Conference not held on 2/10/2022. Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2022 by Zoom video conference re 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and 16 Defendant's Cross-motion for Summary Judgment. Cross-motions for Summary Judgment are taken under submission, court's written order to follow. For the reasons stated on the record, the court denies American Small Business League's request for leave to amend the complaint to add FOIA Requests No. SBA-2020-000566 and SBA-2020-001133. Recorded in Zoom: 1:02-2:03 (Assigned Transcriber: Joan Columbini). Attachment: Civil Law & Motion and Conference Minute Order. (ig, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/10/2022) Modified on 2/23/2022 (nap, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/10/2022)
2022-02-2228TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 2/10/2022 before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu by American Small Business League, for Court Reporter FTR - Oakland. (Olson, Karl) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-03-0129Transcript of Proceedings held on February 10, 2022, before Judge Donna M. Ryu. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, CSR, RPR, telephone number joan.columbini.csr@gmail.com, 510-367-3043. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re 28 Transcript Order ) Redaction Request due 3/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/31/2022. (Related documents(s) 28 ) (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 3/1/2022) (Entered: 03/01/2022)
2022-06-0730ORDER by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu granting in part and denying in part 15 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, and granting in part and denying in part 19 Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
2022-06-0731JUDGMENT. ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu on 6/7/2022. (dmrlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2022) (Entered: 06/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar