Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. United States National Archives and Records Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2021cv00565
Date Filed2021-04-27
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tana Lin
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe State of Washington submitted a FOIA request to the National Archives and Records Administration for records concerning the Federal Records Center building in Seattle. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUnited States National Archives and Records Administration an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [13]
Opinion/Order [21]
Opinion/Order [30]
Opinion/Order [32]
Opinion/Order [34]
Opinion/Order [39]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-04-271COMPLAINT against defendant(s) National Archives and Records Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-7060150), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - B, # 2 Summons, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-04-272NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL; 2:20-cv-1364-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 04/27/2021)
2021-04-28U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (CDA) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-04-283Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration (CDA) (Entered: 04/28/2021)
2021-04-30Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) (Entered: 04/30/2021)
2021-05-114CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re 3 Summons Issued, 1 Complaint, 2 Notice of Related Case (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 05/11/2021)
2021-06-085NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-06-096ANSWER to 1 Complaint by United States National Archives and Records Administration.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 06/09/2021)
2021-07-277CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages by December 3, 2021, Defendant shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment of no more than 36 pages by December 21, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition of no more than 24 pages by January 10, 2022, Defendant shall file a reply of no more than 12 pages by January 14, 2022. If filed on this schedule, the cross-motions for summary judgment shall be noted for consideration on the Court's calendar for January 14, 2022. The parties may, however, file dispositive motions before the deadlines set in this order, in which case they shall be noted for consideration as specified in the Local Civil Rules. (KERR) (Entered: 07/27/2021)
2021-08-198MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2021 9/24/2021 9/10/2021 , (Fraas, Lauryn) Modified noting date on 8/30/2021, per Dkt. 10 (LH). Modified noting date on 9/15/2021 (LH). (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-199DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-2710NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-1411NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 10/1/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1412Stipulated MOTION on Briefing Schedule , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 9/14/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1513ORDER re Parties' 12 Stipulated Motion on Briefing Schedule re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendant's response is now due by 9/22/2021. Plaintiff's reply is now due by 10/1/2021. The motion is re-noted for 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-2214RESPONSE, by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration, to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2215DECLARATION of Katie D. Fairchild filed by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2216DECLARATION of Joseph A. Scanlon filed by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-0117NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Hunt Rowe on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-0118REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-0119DECLARATION of Brian H. Rowe filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 8 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-11-2920Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. Noting Date 11/29/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-3021ORDER re Parties' 20 Stipulated MOTION. Within 14 days of the Court's ruling on the pending 8 motion for summary judgment, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether additional motions practice is necessary and proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-13MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2022-01-0722STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-02-1023NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
2022-02-1624MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2022, (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-1625DECLARATION of Brian H. Rowe filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 24 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-2226MINUTE ORDER made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (LH) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2827RESPONSE, by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration, to 24 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2022)
2022-03-0428REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 24 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2022)
2022-03-1029NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 03/10/2022)
2022-03-1830ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 24 Motion for a status conference. Defendant to produce all non-exempt records within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Defendant to produce a Vaughn index within ten (10) days of the completion of all remaining productions (or within ten (10) days of the date of this Order if all productions have already been completed). A joint status report and proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule is due by April 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin.(LH) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-2531JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-1732ORDER in Response to the Parties' 31 Joint Status Report. Defendant shall complete all supplemental productions and necessary revisions to the Vaughn index by no later than May 23, 2022. The Parties shall file a jointly proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule by no later than June 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-06-1333JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-07-0634MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts the Parties' 33 proposed consolidated dispositive motion briefing schedule. Defendants shall file a consolidated dispositive motion by no later than 8/29/2022. Plaintiff shall file a consolidated response in opposition and dispositive cross-motion by no later than 10/10/2022. Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion by no later than 10/21/2022. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-08-1935Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE , filed by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. Noting Date 8/19/2022, (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-1936ORDER re Parties' 35 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE . Defendants' consolidated dispositive motion is now due by 9/28/2022. Plaintiff's consolidated response and cross-motion is now due by 10/19/2022. Defendants' consolidated reply to motion and response to cross-motion is now due by 11/9/2022. Plaintiff's reply to cross-motion is now due by 11/21/2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-2637NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Nathan Bays for Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-09-1938Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE , filed by Defendant United States National Archives and Records Administration. Noting Date 9/19/2022, (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-2039ORDER re Parties' 38 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE . Defendants' consolidated dispositive motion is now due by 11/10/2022. Plaintiff's consolidated response and cross-motion is now due by 12/2/2022. Defendants' consolidated reply to motion and response to cross-motion is now due by 12/22/2022. Plaintiff's reply to cross-motion is now due by 1/5/2023. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar