Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv01216
Date Filed2021-05-04
Date Closed2022-07-21
JudgeJudge Royce C. Lamberth
PlaintiffJUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
Case DescriptionJudicial Watch submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the agency and financial institutions pertaining to credit card charges in Washington, DC, Virginia, or Maryland on Jan. 6, 2021. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Judicial Watch filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
AppealD.C. Circuit 22-5209
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [21]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-05-041COMPLAINT against U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8424878) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for US Attorney for DC, # 3 Summons for US Attorney General, # 4 Summons for U.S. Department of Justice)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-05-042LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/04/2021)
2021-05-05Case Assigned to Judge Royce C. Lamberth. (znmg) (Entered: 05/05/2021)
2021-05-053SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 05/05/2021)
2021-05-134RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 5/6/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 6/5/2021. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-135RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 05/11/21. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-05-136RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 5/13/2021 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Rothstein)(Orfanedes, Paul) (Entered: 05/13/2021)
2021-06-077ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Early, Cormac) (Entered: 06/07/2021)
2021-06-088MINUTE ORDER: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 7/8/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 06/08/2021. (lcrcl2) Modified on 6/9/2021 (lsj). (Entered: 06/08/2021)
2021-07-079Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file dispositive motion by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Early, Cormac) (Entered: 07/07/2021)
2021-07-08MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motion; Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Dispositive Motion due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/08/2021. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/08/2021)
2021-09-0210MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Declaration)(Early, Cormac) (Entered: 09/02/2021)
2021-09-1111NOTICE of Appearance by James F. Peterson on behalf of JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 09/11/2021)
2021-09-1312Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Set Briefing Schedule by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James). Added MOTION for Briefing Schedule on 9/14/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 09/13/2021)
2021-09-1413ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time and Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendant's motion for summary judgment and any cross-motion for summary judgment due by 10/14/2021. Defendant's reply in support of its motion for summary judgment and opposition to any cross-motion for summary judgment due by 10/28/2021. Plaintiff's reply in support any cross motions due by 11/5/2021. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/14/2021. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-10-1214Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-2815Memorandum in opposition to re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Response to Statement of Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Decl of Brock), # 4 Exhibit D (Decl of Heily with exhibits), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-2816Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Pltf's Statement of Facts) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Decl of Brock), # 4 Exhibit D (Decl of Heily with exhibits), # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-11-1517REPLY to opposition to motion re 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Early, Cormac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-1518Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Pltf's Statement of Facts) filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Declaration)(Early, Cormac) (Entered: 11/15/2021)
2021-11-2319REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (with Pltf's Statement of Facts) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Peterson, James) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-1420MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Sur-Reply, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Early, Cormac) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2022-07-2021MEMORANDUM OPINION: Separate order to follow. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/20/2022.(lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-07-2022ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that defendant's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and plaintiff's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. It is further ORDERED that 14 Motion for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED nunc pro tunc and 20 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 07/20/2022. (lcrcl2) (Entered: 07/20/2022)
2022-08-0323NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-9416946. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Peterson, James) (Entered: 08/03/2022)
2022-08-0424Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re 23 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zjf) (Entered: 08/04/2022)
2022-08-08USCA Case Number 22-5209 for 23 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (zjf) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar