Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC, et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv01601
Date Filed2021-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge John D. Bates
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
PlaintiffGUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Gun Owners of America and the Gun Owners Foundation submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning communications between the agency and officials of the State Virginia pertaining to a voluntary background check recently established in Virginia. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the request and divided it into four separate requests. In response to the requests, the FBI told Gun Owners that its request was too vague to search. Gun Owners filed administrative appeals of those decisions. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Gun Owners filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantFEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Opinion/Order [10]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-06-111COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8522392) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Summons AG, # 6 Summons USA, # 7 Summons FBI, # 8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-112LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC (Olson, Robert) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-14Case Assigned to Judge John D. Bates. (adh, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-143SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-08-064NOTICE of Appearance by Dedra Seibel Curteman on behalf of All Defendants (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-065MOTION to Dismiss by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/06/2021)
2021-08-206RESPONSE re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olson, Robert) (Entered: 08/20/2021)
2021-08-257Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file Reply Memorandum by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-25MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of 7 the consent motion for extension of time, and the entire record herein, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and it is further ORDERED that defendant shall file its reply to plaintiffs' response by not later than September 10, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 8/25/2021. (lcjdb1) (Entered: 08/25/2021)
2021-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Response due by 9/10/2021. (tb) (Entered: 08/30/2021)
2021-09-108REPLY to opposition to motion re 5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 09/10/2021)
2022-03-239ORDER granting in part and denying in part 5 defendant's partial motion to dismiss. See text of Order and accompanying Memorandum Opinion for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/23/2022. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-2310MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 3/23/2022. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 03/23/2022)
2022-03-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 4/6/2022. (tb) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-04-0611ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/06/2022)
2022-04-0712ORDER regarding scheduling. See text of Order for details. Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 4/7/2022. (lcjdb3) (Entered: 04/07/2022)
2022-04-11Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Order due by 4/29/2022. (tb) (Entered: 04/11/2022)
2022-04-2813MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Curteman, Dedra) (Entered: 04/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar