Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleState of Washington v. US General Services Administration
DistrictWestern District of Washington
CitySeattle
Case Number2:2021cv00794
Date Filed2021-06-11
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Tana Lin
PlaintiffState of Washington
Case DescriptionThe State of Washington submitted FOIA requests to the General Services Administration for records concerning the condition of the National Archives Building in Seattle. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, the State of Washington filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Fees, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUS General Services Administration
DefendantU.S. General Services Administration an agency of the United States
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [16]
Opinion/Order [23]
Opinion/Order [32]
Opinion/Order [34]
Opinion/Order [36]
Opinion/Order [41]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-06-111COMPLAINT against defendant(s) U.S. General Services Administration (Receipt # AWAWDC-7121673), filed by State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-112NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:20-cv-1231-RSL; 2:20-cv-1232-RSL; 2:20-cv-1233-RSL; 2:20-cv-1364-RSL; 2:21-cv-00564-BAT; 2:21-cv-00565-RSL, by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 06/11/2021)
2021-06-14U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (SG) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-143Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) U.S. General Services Administration (SG) (Entered: 06/14/2021)
2021-06-154ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-155MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Gabriel_Traber@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 10/5/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (GT) (Entered: 06/15/2021)
2021-06-166NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 10/5/2021. (GT) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-06-16Case Reassigned to Judge Robert S. Lasnik. U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour no longer assigned to the case. (GT) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-06-167CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff State of Washington re 3 Summons Issued, 2 Notice of Related Case, 1 Complaint (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 06/16/2021)
2021-07-158NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katie Denise Fairchild on behalf of Defendant US General Services Administration. (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-159ANSWER to 1 Complaint by US General Services Administration.(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-2710CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment of no more than 24 pages by December 3, 2021, Defendant shall file a combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment of no more than 36 pages by December 21, 2021, Plaintiff shall file a combined reply and opposition of no more than 24 pages by January 10, 2022, Defendant shall file a reply of no more than 12 pages by January 14, 2022. If filed on this schedule, the cross-motions for summary judgment shall be noted for consideration on the Court's calendar for January 14, 2022. The parties may, however, file dispositive motions before the deadlines set in this order, in which case they shall be noted for consideration as specified in the Local Civil Rules. (KERR) (Entered: 07/27/2021)
2021-08-1911MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/1/2021 9/24/2021 9/10/2021 , (Fraas, Lauryn) Modified noting date on 8/30/2021, per Dkt. 13 (LH). Modified noting date on 9/15/2021 (LH). (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-1912DECLARATION of Lauryn K. Fraas filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/19/2021)
2021-08-2713NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 9/24/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/27/2021)
2021-09-1414NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 10/1/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1415Stipulated MOTION on Briefing Schedule , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. Noting Date 9/14/2021, (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 09/14/2021)
2021-09-1516ORDER re Parties' 15 Stipulated Motion on Briefing Schedule re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Defendant's response is now due by 9/22/2021. Plaintiff's reply is now due by 10/1/2021. The motion is re-noted for 10/1/2021. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 09/15/2021)
2021-09-2217RESPONSE, by Defendant US General Services Administration, to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2218DECLARATION of Katie D. Fairchild filed by Defendant US General Services Administration re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-2219DECLARATION of Travis Lewis filed by Defendant US General Services Administration re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-10-0120NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian Hunt Rowe on behalf of Plaintiff State of Washington. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-10-0121REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 10/01/2021)
2021-11-2922Stipulated MOTION , filed by Defendant US General Services Administration. Noting Date 11/29/2021, (Fairchild, Katie) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-3023ORDER re Parties' 22 Stipulated MOTION. Within 14 days of the Court's ruling on the pending 11 motion for summary judgment, the parties shall file a joint status report indicating whether additional motions practice is necessary and proposing a briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (LH) (Entered: 11/30/2021)
2021-12-13MINUTE ORDER (text only) authorized by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Case reassigned to Judge Tana Lin. Judge Robert S. Lasnik no longer assigned to the case. (KERR) (Entered: 12/13/2021)
2022-01-0724STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP) (Entered: 01/07/2022)
2022-02-1025NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brian C Kipnis on behalf of Defendant US General Services Administration. (Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
2022-02-1626MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference , filed by Plaintiff State of Washington. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 3/4/2022, (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-1627DECLARATION of Brian H. Rowe filed by Plaintiff State of Washington re 26 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 02/16/2022)
2022-02-2228MINUTE ORDER made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at http://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures . All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (LH) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2829RESPONSE, by Defendant US General Services Administration, to 26 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kipnis, Brian) (Entered: 02/28/2022)
2022-03-0430REPLY, filed by Plaintiff State of Washington, TO RESPONSE to 26 MOTION State of Washington's Motion for Status Conference (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 03/04/2022)
2022-03-1031NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Nickolas Bohl on behalf of Defendant US General Services Administration. (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 03/10/2022)
2022-03-1832ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's 26 Motion for a status conference. Defendant is to produce all non-exempt records within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Defendant is to produce a Vaughn index within ten (10) days of the completion of all remaining productions (or within ten (10) days of the date of this Order if all productions have already been completed). A joint status report and proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule is due by April 25, 2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-04-2533JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 04/25/2022)
2022-05-1734ORDER in Response to the Parties' 33 Joint Status Report. Defendant shall complete all supplemental productions and necessary revisions to the Vaughn index by no later than May 23, 2022. The Parties shall file a jointly proposed dispositive motion briefing schedule by no later than June 13, 2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 05/17/2022)
2022-06-1335JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Rowe, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2022)
2022-07-0636MINUTE ORDER: The Court adopts the Parties' 35 proposed consolidated dispositive motion briefing schedule. Defendants shall file a consolidated dispositive motion by no later than 8/29/2022. Plaintiff shall file a consolidated response in opposition and dispositive cross-motion by no later than 10/10/2022. Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of its cross-motion by no later than 10/21/2022. Authorized by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-08-1937Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE , filed by Defendant US General Services Administration. Noting Date 8/19/2022, (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-1938ORDER re Parties' 37 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE . Defendants' consolidated dispositive motion is now due by 9/28/2022. Plaintiff's consolidated response and cross-motion is now due by 10/19/2022. Defendants' consolidated reply to motion and response to cross-motion is now due by 11/9/2022. Plaintiff's reply to cross-motion is now due by 11/21/2022. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-08-2639NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Nathan Bays for Plaintiff State of Washington. (Fraas, Lauryn) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-09-1940Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE , filed by Defendant US General Services Administration. Noting Date 9/19/2022, (Bohl, Nickolas) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-2041ORDER re Parties' 40 Stipulated MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF DISPOSITIVE BRIEFING SCHEDULE . Defendants' consolidated dispositive motion is now due by 11/10/2022. Plaintiff's consolidated response and cross-motion is now due by 12/2/2022. Defendants' consolidated reply to motion and response to cross-motion is now due by 12/22/2022. Plaintiff's reply to cross-motion is now due by 1/5/2023. Signed by Judge Tana Lin. (LH) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar