Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-06-16 | | Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 06/16/2021. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zsb) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | 1 | COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION filed by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit)(zsb) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | 2 | MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (zsb) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-06-16 | 3 | PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III (zsb) (Entered: 06/22/2021) |
2021-08-05 | 4 | ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $47.57 from Prison Account of GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 08/04/2021. (zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2021) |
2021-08-09 | | Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zsb) (Entered: 08/10/2021) |
2021-08-23 | 5 | NOTICE of Change of Address by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (ztth) (Entered: 08/27/2021) |
2021-09-02 | 6 | SUMMONS (3) Issued as to FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. (znmg) (Entered: 09/02/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 7 | ENTERED IN ERROR AS A DUPLICATE ENTRY TO DE# 7 ..RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/27/2021. (ztth) Modified on 10/12/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 9 | ENTERED IN ERROR AS A DUPLICATE ENTRY TO DE# 7 ..RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/27/2021. (zjf) Modified on 10/12/2021 (zjf). (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-09-29 | 11 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/27/2021. (zjf) (Entered: 10/12/2021) |
2021-10-04 | 12 | NOTICE of Change of Address by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (ztth) (Entered: 10/14/2021) |
2021-10-05 | 8 | GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on October 5, 2021. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 10/05/2021) |
2021-10-05 | 10 | RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION served on 10/4/2021. (ztth) (Entered: 10/06/2021) |
2021-10-12 | | NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document Nos. re 7 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney, 9 Summons Returned Executed in FOIA as to U.S. Attorney was entered in error and refiled 11 by the Clerk's Office. (zjf) (Entered: 10/12/2021) |
2021-10-26 | 13 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 10/26/2021) |
2021-10-27 | | MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that the defendant's 13 First Motion to Enlarge Time to File a Response to the Complaint is hereby GRANTED for good cause shown. The defendant shall respond to the Complaint by November 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 10/27/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 10/27/2021) |
2021-10-28 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 11/30/2021, (hs) (Entered: 10/28/2021) |
2021-11-30 | 14 | ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION.(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 11/30/2021) |
2021-12-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. To ensure the expeditious resolution of this action, and because this qualifies as an exempted case under Local Civil Rule 16.3(b), it is hereby ORDERED that, on or before January 5, 2022, the parties shall file a joint proposed briefing schedule governing further proceedings. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/6/2021. (psu3) (Entered: 12/06/2021) |
2021-12-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 1/5/2022. (adh ) (Entered: 12/06/2021) |
2022-01-05 | 15 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/05/2022) |
2022-01-06 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 15 Status Report, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint status report on or before May 5, 2022, regarding how they wish to proceed in this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on January 6, 2022. (lcrbw3) (Entered: 01/06/2022) |
2022-01-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2022. (adh, ) (Entered: 01/06/2022) |
2022-02-28 | 16 | NOTICE of Change of Address by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (ztth) (Entered: 03/02/2022) |
2022-05-05 | 17 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/05/2022) |
2022-05-06 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the defendant's 17 Status Report, it is ORDERED that the defendant shall file another Status Report by September 12, 2022, addressing the status of production. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 5/6/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 05/06/2022) |
2022-05-06 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Status Report due by 9/12/2022. (zcdw) (Entered: 05/06/2022) |
2022-05-09 | 18 | STATUS REPORT by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (ztth) (Entered: 05/11/2022) |
2022-09-12 | 19 | STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/12/2022) |
2022-09-28 | | MINUTE ORDER: In its most recent 19 Status Report, the defendant indicates that it recently completed its FOIA production. Therefore, the Court hereby adopts the summary judgment deadline proposed by the defendant and hereby enters the following BRIEFING SCHEDULE: The defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by December 13, 2022; the plaintiff shall file an Opposition, and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by January 12, 2023; the defendant shall file its Reply, and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by February 13, 2023, and; the plaintiff shall file any Reply, if necessary, by March 15, 2023. It is further ORDERED that, on June 9, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., the parties shall appear before the Court for a status conference, via teleconference, by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). This status conference will serve as a target date for the resolution of the pending Motion for Summary Judgment. In the event that the Court is unable to resolve the Motion by this date, the parties will be advised in advance that the status conference will be continued to a later date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 9/28/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 09/28/2022) |
2022-09-29 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/13/2022. Plaintiff Opposition, And Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 1/12/2023. Defendant Reply and Opposition To Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 2/13/2023. Plaintiff Reply, If Necessary, due by 3/15/2023. Status Conference set for 6/9/2023 at 10:00 AM in Telephonic/VTC before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (mac) (Entered: 09/29/2022) |
2022-12-12 | 20 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/12/2022) |
2022-12-14 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's 20 Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 20 Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file file its Motion for Summary Judgment by January 13, 2023; the plaintiff shall file an Opposition, and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by February 13, 2023; the defendant shall file its Reply, and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by March 15, 2023, and; the plaintiff shall file any Reply, if necessary, by April 14, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the status conference, currently scheduled for June 9, 2023, shall remain on the calendar as scheduled. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 12/14/2022. (psu3) (Entered: 12/14/2022) |
2022-12-15 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 01/13/2023. Plaintiff Opposition, And Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 02/13/2023. Defendant Reply, And Opposition To Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 03/15/2023. Plaintiff Reply, If Necessary, due by 04/14/2023. (mac) (Entered: 12/15/2022) |
2023-01-13 | 21 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/13/2023) |
2023-01-17 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's 21 Second Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 21 Second Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by January 24, 2023; the plaintiff shall file an Opposition, and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by February 24, 2023; the defendant shall file its Reply, and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by March 28, 2023, and; the plaintiff shall file any Reply, if necessary, by April 28, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the status conference, currently scheduled for June 9, 2023, shall remain on the calendar as scheduled. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/17/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 01/17/2023) |
2023-01-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 01/24/2023. Plaintiff Opposition And Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 02/24/2023. Defendant Reply And Opposition To Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 03/28/2023. Plaintiff Reply due by 04/28/2023. (mac) (Entered: 01/18/2023) |
2023-01-23 | 22 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/23/2023) |
2023-01-24 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the defendant's 22 Third Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 22 Third Motion for Extension to Briefing Schedule is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by January 30, 2023; the plaintiff shall file an Opposition, and any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by March 1, 2023; the defendant shall file its Reply, and Opposition to any Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, by April 4, 2023, and; the plaintiff shall file any Reply, if necessary, by May 4, 2023. The defendant is forewarned, however, that any additional requests to extend its Summary Judgment deadline will be viewed with disfavor. It is further ORDERED that the Status Conference, currently scheduled for June 9, 2023, shall remain on the calendar as scheduled. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/24/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 01/24/2023) |
2023-01-25 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant Motion For Summary Judgment due by 01/30/2023. Plaintiff Opposition, And Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 03/01/2023. Defendant Reply, And Opposition To Any Cross-Motion For Summary Judgment due by 04/04/2023. Plaintiff Reply, If Necessary, due by 05/04/2023. (mac) (Entered: 01/25/2023) |
2023-01-30 | 23 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Declaration, # 4 Exhibit)(Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/30/2023) |
2023-01-31 | 24 | ORDER advising the plaintiff to respond by March 1, 2023, to the defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment 23 or risk dismissal of the case or entry of judgment in the defendant's favor (see document for details). Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 1/31/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-01-31 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff Response To The Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/1/2023. (mac) (Entered: 01/31/2023) |
2023-03-03 | 25 | RESPONSE re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(ztth) (Entered: 03/09/2023) |
2023-04-04 | 26 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/04/2023) |
2023-04-05 | | MINUTE ORDER: Upon review of the defendant's 26 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Reply to the plaintiff's Opposition, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the defendant's 26 Motion for Extension to of Time is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the defendant shall file its Reply on or before April 28, 2023, and the plaintiff shall file any Response to the defendant's Reply, if necessary, by May 29, 2023. It is further ORDERED that the existing status teleconference date is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to now be held on August 29, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., and the parties shall dial in by calling 1-877-873-8017 and entering the Court's access code (8583213) followed by the pound key (#). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 4/5/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 4/28/2023. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/29/2023. Status Conference rescheduled to 8/29/2023 at 10:00 AM via teleconference before Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zalh) (Entered: 04/05/2023) |
2023-04-28 | 27 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/28/2023) |
2023-05-26 | 28 | MOTION to Amend/Correct 25 Response to motion by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts)(zjm) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-05-26 | 29 | SURREPLY to re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (zjm) (Entered: 06/01/2023) |
2023-06-28 | 30 | MOTION for CM/ECF Password by GARY SEBASTIAN BROWN, III. (ztth) (Entered: 06/30/2023) |
2023-08-18 | 31 | MEMORANDUM OPINION GRANTING Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Amend/Correct; and DENYING as moot Plaintiff's 30 Motion for CM/ECF Password. An 32 Order consistent with this Memorandum Opinion will be issued contemporaneously.Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/18/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 08/18/2023) |
2023-08-18 | 32 | ORDER GRANTING Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING Plaintiff's 28 Motion to Amend/Correct; and DENYING as moot Plaintiff's 30 Motion for CM/ECF Password. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on 8/18/2023. (psu3) (Entered: 08/18/2023) |
Hide Docket Events |