Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-07-09 | 1 | PRO SE COMPLAINT against Christopher Anderson, Andrew Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce (Filing & Administrative fee $ 402, receipt# 500003303.), filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Cover Letter, # 3 Attachment A, # 4 Envelope)(jv) (Entered: 07/12/2021) |
2021-07-09 | 2 | Proposed Summons for Christopher Anderson, Andrew Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce by John Osborne Crandell, III (jv) (Entered: 07/12/2021) |
2021-07-12 | 3 | Summons Issued as to Christopher Anderson, Andrew Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce.(jv) |
2021-08-13 | 4 | SUMMONS & Affidavit of Service Returned Executed on 7/26/2021 as to Christopher Anderson and Andrew R. Fiddes by John Osborne Crandell, III.(jv) |
2021-08-17 | 5 | MOTION to Substitute Party by United States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification of Scope of Employment)(Frith, Krista) |
2021-08-17 | 6 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Osborne Crandell, III as to U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jv) |
2021-08-17 | 7 | PRO SE MOTION for leave to file electronically by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jv) |
2021-08-23 | 8 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 5 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(kld) |
2021-09-27 | 9 | Letter regarding Service of Process by United States (jv) |
2021-10-14 | 10 | Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney (jv) |
2021-10-21 | 11 | PRO SE SECOND MOTION for leave to file electronically by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(jv) |
2021-10-21 | 12 | PRO SE MOTION for extension of time to Correct Deficiency in Service of Process by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Envelope)(jv) |
2021-10-21 | 13 | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Osborne Crandell, III (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jv) |
2021-10-29 | 14 | SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (jv) (Entered: 11/01/2021) |
2021-12-10 | 15 | MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and Leave to File Out of Time by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce, United States. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Frith, Krista) |
2021-12-13 | 16 | Magistrate Consent Notice to Parties. Click here to access the Consent Form (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv) |
2021-12-20 | 17 | PRO SE RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and Leave to File Out of Time . filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 certificate of service, # 5 Envelope)(kld) |
2021-12-27 | 18 | MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of 20 by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Frith, Krista) Modified on 12/27/2021 Docket text was modified to reflect the correct docket entry (jv). Modified on 12/27/2021 to add link to motion (jv). |
2021-12-27 | 19 | Brief / Memorandum in Support re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment . filed by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10)(Frith, Krista) Modified on 12/27/2021 to add correct link to motion (jv). |
2021-12-27 | 20 | MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Frith, Krista). |
2021-12-27 | 21 | Roseboro Notice re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment as to John Osborne Crandell, III. Deadline set for 1/20/2022. (Notice mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv) |
2022-01-20 | 22 | PRO SE RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit Endnotes & exhibits, # 3 Envelope)(jv) |
2022-01-21 | 23 | CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Osborne Crandell, III re 22 Response to Motion. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jv) |
2022-01-27 | 24 | Reply re 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment . filed by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Frith, Krista) |
2022-01-31 | 25 | PRO SE MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment(s) on the Matters of Appearance and Recognition of Claims by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jv) |
2022-01-31 | 26 | PRO SE THIRD MOTION for leave to file electronically by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(jv) |
2022-02-08 | 27 | RESPONSE in Opposition re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . filed by Christopher Anderson, Andrew R. Fiddes, U.S. Dept. of Commerce. (Frith, Krista) |
2022-02-16 | 28 | PRO SE REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by John Osborne Crandell, III. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(jv) (Entered: 02/17/2022) |
2022-03-18 | 29 | ORDER denying 7 Motion for leave to file electronically ; denying 11 Motion for leave to file electronically ; denying 26 Motion for leave to file electronically. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/18/2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv) |
2022-03-18 | 30 | ORDER granting 5 MOTION to Substitute Party. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 3/18/2022. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(jv) |
2022-09-29 | 31 | MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/29/22. (Memorandum Opinion mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(kld) |
2022-09-29 | 32 | ORDER denying as moot 12 Motion for extension of time to Correct Deficiency in Service of Process; denying as moot 15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 12 MOTION for extension of time to Correct Deficiency in Service of Process, 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, and Leave to File Out of Time , 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment MOTION for Summary Judgment, 25 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 20 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 25 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Elizabeth K. Dillon on 9/29/22. (Order mailed to Pro Se Party via US Mail)(kld) |
Hide Docket Events |