Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. U.S. POSTAL SERVICE et al
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv01887
Date Filed2021-07-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Amit P. Mehta
PlaintiffJAMES MADISON PROJECT
PlaintiffJANA WINTER
Case DescriptionThe James Madison Project and Yahoo reporter Jana Winter submitted FOIA requests to U.S. Postal Service, Department of Homeland Security, Office of the Director of National Intelligence, and the Department of Justice for records concerning the government's decision-making process for creation and later implementation of the Internet Covert Operations Program. The agencies acknowledged receipt of the request. Several agencies refused to process the requests, insisting that the U.S. Postal Inspection Service was the appropriate agency to process the request. After receiving no further responses from any of the agencies, the James Madison Project and Winter filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees, Failure to respond within statutory time limit

DefendantU.S. POSTAL SERVICE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY
DefendantOFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUS DEPT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-07-141COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8600147) filed by THE JAMES MADISON PROJECT, JANA WINTER. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Rule 7.1 certification, # 3 Summons USPS, # 4 Summons DHS, # 5 Summons ODNI, # 6 Summons DOJ, # 7 Summons USAG, # 8 Summons USADC)(Moss, Bradley) (Entered: 07/14/2021)
2021-07-142LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (zsb) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-15Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-07-153SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/15/2021)
2021-09-074ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE.(Moustakas, John) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-085ORDER. Both a Complaint and an Answer are now before the court in this FOIA case. It is hereby ordered that the parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report on or before September 22, 2021. The Joint Status Report shall include (1) the status of Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiffs' FOIA request; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiffs; (4) whether a motion to stay is likely under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force, 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976); and (5) whether the parties anticipate summary judgment briefing and, if so, a proposed briefing schedule. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/8/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-226Amended ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE.(Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-227Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-09-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 22, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/22/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/22/2021)
2021-11-228Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by December 22, 2021, that updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/22/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-12-229Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2021-12-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 21, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 12/22/2021. (lcapm1) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2022-01-2110Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-21MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by March 22, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 1/21/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-03-2211Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by May 23, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 3/22/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-2412NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. Attorney John Moustakas terminated. (Moustakas, John) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-05-2313Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-23MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by July 22, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 5/23/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-07-2214Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-24MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by September 20, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 7/24/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 07/24/2022)
2022-09-2015Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-20MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by November 21, 2022, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 9/20/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-11-2116Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. POSTAL SERVICE, US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Saslaw, Alexandra) (Entered: 11/21/2022)
2022-11-22MINUTE ORDER. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report by January 20, 2023, which updates the court on the processing and production of responsive records. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/22/2022. (lcapm1) (Entered: 11/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar