Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2021-07-20 | 1 | COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8613102) filed by AARON GREENSPAN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons to USAO DC, # 4 Summons to USAG)(Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 07/20/2021) |
2021-07-21 | | Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 2 | SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: # 1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-07-21 | 3 | STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 7/21/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 07/21/2021) |
2021-08-30 | 4 | ANSWER to Complaint by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM.(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 08/30/2021) |
2021-08-31 | 5 | VACATED PURSUANT TO MINUTE ORDER ENTERED ON 9/10/2021.....ORDER setting a Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference for October 4, 2021, at 2:00 p.m before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Dial-in information will be sent to the parties. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 8/31/2021. (lctnm3) Modified on 9/10/2021 (hmc). (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-08-31 | | Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/4/2021 at 2:00 PM before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) (Entered: 08/31/2021) |
2021-09-10 | 6 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 09/10/2021) |
2021-09-10 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the 5 Order setting Telephonic Initial Scheduling Conference for October 4, 2021 is vacated. The Parties shall submit another Joint Status Report on or before November 4, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 9/10/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 09/10/2021) |
2021-11-04 | 7 | Joint STATUS REPORT by AARON GREENSPAN. (Golden, Deborah) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-04 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 7 Joint Status Report, the Parties are hereby ORDERED to submit another Joint Status Report on or before January 7, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/4/2021. (lctnm3) (Entered: 11/04/2021) |
2021-11-05 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 11/05/2021) |
2022-01-07 | 8 | Joint STATUS REPORT by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 01/07/2022) |
2022-01-07 | | MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the Parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule. Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is due on or before March 25, 2022. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion is due on or before April 25, 2022. Defendant's Opposition and Reply is due May 16, 2022. Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before May 31, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/7/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 01/07/2022) |
2022-01-10 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's Summary Judgment motion due by 3/25/2022. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross Motion due by 4/25/2022. Defendant's Opposition and Reply. Plaintiff's Reply due by 5/31/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 01/10/2022) |
2022-01-25 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of AARON GREENSPAN (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 01/25/2022) |
2022-03-17 | 10 | Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment and for Corresponding Adjustment of Remaining Deadlines in Briefing Schedule by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 03/17/2022) |
2022-03-18 | | MINUTE ORDER granting the Government's 10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. The Parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule. The Government's motion for summary judgment is now due April 4, 2022. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion is now due May 5, 2022. Defendant's Opposition and Reply is now due May 26, 2022. Plaintiff's Reply is now due June 10, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/18/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 03/18/2022) |
2022-03-18 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: Government's motion for summary judgment due April 4, 2022. Plaintiff's Opposition and Cross-Motion due May 5, 2022. Defendant's Opposition and Reply due May 26, 2022. Plaintiff's Reply due June 10, 2022. (hmc) (Entered: 03/18/2022) |
2022-04-04 | 11 | MOTION for Summary Judgment by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Local Rule 7(h) Statement of Material Facts Not In Genuine Dispute, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Declaration of David G. Caperton, # 5 Declaration of Michelle Smith, # 6 Declaration of Andreas Lehnert, # 7 Declaration of Antulio Bomfim, # 8 Declaration of Beth Anne Wilson, # 9 Declaration of Bronwyn Eckhardt, # 10 Declaration of Julia Coronado)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 04/04/2022) |
2022-05-05 | 12 | Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by AARON GREENSPAN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to SOF, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2022) |
2022-05-05 | 13 | Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AARON GREENSPAN. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to SOF, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 05/05/2022) |
2022-05-26 | 14 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/26/2022) |
2022-05-26 | 15 | Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (duplicate of docket entry number 14) filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) (Entered: 05/26/2022) |
2022-06-10 | 16 | REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by AARON GREENSPAN. (Topic, Matthew) Modified on 6/13/2022 to add docket relationship (zeg). (Entered: 06/10/2022) |
2022-12-01 | 17 | MEMORANDUM OPINION re Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 12 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/1/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
2022-12-01 | 18 | ORDER. For the reasons stated in the 17 Memorandum Opinion, Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiff's 12 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. This is a final, appealable Order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/1/2022. (lctnm3) (Entered: 12/01/2022) |
Hide Docket Events |