Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleHANSTEN v. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02043
Date Filed2021-07-28
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPHILIP HANSTEN
Case DescriptionPhilip Hansten, a professor emeritus at the School of Pharmacy at the University of Washington, submitted a FOIA request to the DEA for records concerning identifying information for DEA Form 222sin which the date issued on the form is 5/11/2011. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Hansten filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Opinion/Order [20]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-07-281COMPLAINT against DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8630198) filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-07-28Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-07-282SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/28/2021)
2021-08-183RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/6/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/5/2021. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-184RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION served on 8/11/2021 (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-08-185NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Anthony Quinn on behalf of DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 08/18/2021)
2021-09-036ANSWER to Complaint by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION.(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 09/03/2021)
2021-09-05MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before September 21, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9/5/2021. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/05/2021)
2021-09-07Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 9/21/2021 (adh, ) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-167NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica R. Blaemire on behalf of PHILIP HANSTEN (Blaemire, Jessica) (Entered: 09/16/2021)
2021-09-218PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order Joint Notice by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Blaemire, Jessica) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-09-21MINUTE ORDER adopting 8 the parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Plaintiff and Defendant shall file opening summary judgment briefs by October 18, 2021; Plaintiff and Defendant shall file summary judgment opposition briefs by November 18, 2021; Plaintiff and Defendant shall file summary judgment reply briefs by December 13, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 09/21/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 09/21/2021)
2021-10-189ENTERED IN ERROR.....Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remaindr of Briefing Schedule by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas); Modified on 10/18/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-1810Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas). Added MOTION to Modify on 10/18/2021 (ztth). (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motions for Summary Judgment and to Modify Remaindr of Briefing Schedule was entered in error. Said pleading was refiled as docket entry 10 . (ztth) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Amended Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the Parties shall file opening summary judgment briefs by October 22, 2021; the Parties shall file summary judgment opposition briefs by November 24, 2021; and the Parties shall file summary judgment reply briefs by December 17, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/18/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/18/2021)
2021-10-2211MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(Schwartz, Daniel). (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-10-2212MOTION for Summary Judgment by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 10/22/2021)
2021-11-2413Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-24MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings in this case: the parties shall file summary judgment opposition briefs on or before November 29, 2021, and the parties shall file summary judgment reply briefs on or before December 20, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11/24/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 11/24/2021)
2021-11-2914Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-11-2915Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 11/29/2021)
2021-12-2016REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DRUG ENFORCEMENT ADMINISTRATION. (Quinn, Thomas) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2021-12-2017REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Request for Hearing filed by PHILIP HANSTEN. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/20/2021)
2022-06-1518NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to PHILIP HANSTEN. Attorney Jessica R. Blaemire terminated. (Blaemire, Jessica) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-07-2219ORDER granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7-22-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
2022-07-2220MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying without prejudice 12 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 7-22-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 07/22/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar