Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02362
Date Filed2021-09-07
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Rudolph Contreras
PlaintiffPROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.
Case DescriptionThe Project for Privacy and Surveillance Accountability submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records concerning correspondence between a list of Senators and House members and any agency concerning the unmasking of congressmen. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency then issued a Glomar response neither confirm nor denying the existence of records. PPSA filed an administrative appeal but after hearing nothing further from the agency, PPSA filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Opinion/Order [20]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-09-071COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8714349) filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Civil Cover Sheet, # 8 Summons Department of Justice, # 9 Summons US Attorney General, # 10 Summons US Attorney for DC)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-072LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/07/2021)
2021-09-08Case Assigned to Judge Rudolph Contreras. (znmg) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-083SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 09/08/2021)
2021-09-294RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/13/2021. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 10/13/2021. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-295RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/13/2021. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-09-296RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 9/13/2021 (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 09/29/2021)
2021-10-137ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Taylor, Kristin) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-13MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer, and jointly submit a proposed briefing schedule on or before October 28, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/13/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-10-288PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE re Order to Submit Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-28MINUTE ORDER adopting 8 the parties' Proposed Briefing Schedule: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern further proceedings: Defendant shall file its motion for summary judgment on or before January 14, 2022; Plaintiff shall file its combined opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before February 25, 2022; Defendant shall file its combined opposition and reply on or before March 11, 2022; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before March 25, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 10/28/2021. (lcrc1) (Entered: 10/28/2021)
2021-10-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Cross Motions due by 2/25/2022. Response to Cross Motions due by 3/11/2022. Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/25/2022. Summary Judgment motions due by 1/14/2022. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/25/2022. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 3/11/2022. (tj) (Entered: 10/29/2021)
2022-01-149MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Statement of Facts, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Kristin) (Entered: 01/14/2022)
2022-02-1810Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment & Corresponding Adjustments to Remaining Deadlines by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-02-18MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that the following schedule shall govern proceedings in this case: Plaintiff shall file its combined summary judgment opposition and cross-motion for summary judgment on or before March 11, 2022; Defendant shall file its combined opposition and reply on or before April 1, 2022; and Plaintiff shall file its reply on or before April 15, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 02/18/2022. (lcrc1) (Entered: 02/18/2022)
2022-03-1111NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J. Field on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Field, Brian) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-03-1112Memorandum in opposition to re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment with Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1:1992 Memo, # 2 Exhibit 2:2013 Memo, # 3 Exhibit 3: The Release, # 4 Exhibit 4: 2017 Annex, # 5 Exhibit 5: ICD 112, # 6 Exhibit 6: Grenell Disclosure, # 7 Exhibit 7: Grenell Letter, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-03-1113Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1:1992 Memo, # 2 Exhibit 2:2013 Memo, # 3 Exhibit 3: The Release, # 4 Exhibit 4: 2017 Annex, # 5 Exhibit 5: ICD 112, # 6 Exhibit 6: Grenell Disclosure, # 7 Exhibit 7: Grenell Letter, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 03/11/2022)
2022-04-0114REPLY to opposition to motion re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 12 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response, # 2 Exhibit Second Seidel Decl., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Kristin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-0115RESPONSE re 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response, # 2 Exhibit Second Seidel Decl., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Taylor, Kristin) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-1516REPLY to opposition to motion re 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment with Local Rule 7(h) Statement and Supporting Memorandum filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 04/15/2022)
2022-05-1217NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Olivia R. Hussey Scott on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE Substituting for attorney Kristin Taylor (Scott, Olivia) (Entered: 05/12/2022)
2022-09-01MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear for oral argument on the cross-motions for summary judgment on September 21, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 23. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9-1-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-01Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23A- In Person before Judge Rudolph Contreras. (tj) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-09-19NOTICE OF COURTROOM CHANGE: Parties appearing in this matter on 9/21/2022 @ 10am before Judge Contreras, shall report to Courtroom 24A-4th Floor. (tj) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-2018NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander V. Sverdlov on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 09/20/2022)
2022-09-21Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held on 9/21/2022 before Judge Rudolph Contreras re 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE and 13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC. Oral arguments heard and taken under advisement. Court Reporter Nancy Meyer. (smc) (Entered: 09/21/2022)
2022-09-2919ORDER granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 13 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9-29-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-09-2920MEMORANDUM OPINION granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 13 Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. See document for details. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 9-29-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 09/29/2022)
2022-11-2821MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's September 29, 2022, order by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sverdlov, Alexander) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-2822RESPONSE re 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to comply with the Court's September 29, 2022, order NOTICE OF CONSENT TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION filed by PROJECT FOR PRIVACY AND SURVEILLANCE ACCOUNTABILITY, INC.. (Schaerr, Gene) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-28MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time: It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant shall complete the search described by the Court in its September 29, 2022, Order, ECF No. 19, and produce any non-exempt portions of the relevant records by December 12, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Rudolph Contreras on 11-28-2022. (lcrc3) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar