Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleINSIDER INC. v. U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv02653
Date Filed2021-10-11
Date Closed2022-10-18
JudgeJudge Trevor N. McFadden
PlaintiffINSIDER INC.
Case DescriptionInsider, Inc. submitted two FOIA requests to the General Services Administration for records. The first request asked for records concerning expenditures made from outgoing President Donald Trump's Presidential Transition account. The second request asked for emails between GSA and representatives of former President Trump regarding expenditures from the presidential transition account at GSA. The agency acknowledged receipt of the requests. The agency responded to both requests by disclosing four PDF files. The agency withheld the names of five employees of the First Lady, citing exemption 6 (invasion of privacy). Insider, Inc. filed an administrative appeal of the denial. GSA upheld the denial. Insider, Inc. also requested similar records about Vice President Pence's transition expenses. The names of employees were also withheld in response to Pence transition expense requests. Insider, Inc. also filed an administrative appeal which was denied by GSA. Insider, Inc. then filed suit.
Complaint issues: Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Opinion/Order [18]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-10-111COMPLAINT against U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8791530) filed by INSIDER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex A-J, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/11/2021)
2021-10-112NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Topic on behalf of INSIDER INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/11/2021)
2021-10-113LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by INSIDER INC. (Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/11/2021)
2021-10-12NOTICE OF ERROR re 3 LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests; emailed to matt@loevy.com, cc'd 2 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. The disclosure does not state whether there are corporate parents/affiliates or not. Please file an errata correcting the pleading., 2. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-12Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-124SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-125ERRATA by INSIDER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 10/12/2021)
2021-10-136STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/13/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/13/2021)
2021-11-227NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-228ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION.(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 11/22/2021)
2021-11-23MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court are a complaint and an answer in this FOIA case. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter. The schedule should address, among other things, the status of Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA request, the anticipated date(s) for release of the documents requested by Plaintiff, whether a motion for an Open America stay is likely in this case, whether a Vaughn index will be required in this case, and a briefing schedule for dispositive motions, if required. The parties shall file the schedule on or before December 30, 2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/23/2021. (lctnm1) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-11-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/30/2021. (ztg) (Entered: 11/23/2021)
2021-12-229Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 12/22/2021)
2021-12-23MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the 9 Joint Status Report, it is ORDERED that the parties submit summary judgment briefing as follows: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before April 1, 2022; the Plaintiff's opposition is due on or before April 22, 2022; and the Defendant's reply, if any, is due on or before May 6, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/23/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2021-12-23Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendant's motion for summary judgment due by 4/1/2022. Plaintiff's opposition due by 4/22/2022. Defendant's reply due by 5/6/2022. (hmc) (Entered: 12/23/2021)
2022-03-2910Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 03/29/2022)
2022-03-30MINUTE ORDER granting the 10 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties shall adhere to the following briefing schedule: Defendant's motion for summary judgment is due on or before June 1, 2022; Plaintiff's opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment are due on or before July 1, 2022; Defendant's opposition and reply due on or before July 29, 2022; and Plaintiff's reply, if any, due by August 19, 2022. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/29/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-03-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary judgment motion due by 6/1/2022; cross-motion and opposition to summary judgment motion due by 7/1/2022; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to summary judgment motion due by 7/29/2022; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 8/19/2022. (ztg) (Entered: 03/30/2022)
2022-06-0111MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts, # 3 Exhibit 1 - Lewis Declaration, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/01/2022)
2022-07-0112Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by INSIDER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-0113Memorandum in opposition to re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by INSIDER INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts Response to Statement of Facts, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Topic, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-2914REPLY to opposition to motion re 11 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-07-2915Memorandum in opposition to re 12 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/29/2022)
2022-08-1916REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by INSIDER INC.. (Topic, Matthew) Modified on 8/22/2022 to add docket relationship (zed). (Entered: 08/19/2022)
2022-10-1617NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of U.S. GENERAL SERVICES ADMINISTRATION Substituting for attorney Daniel Patrick Schaefer (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/16/2022)
2022-10-1818MEMORANDUM OPINION re: Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment and Plaintiff's 12 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/18/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
2022-10-1819ORDER. For the reasons explained in the Court's 18 Memorandum Opinion, Defendant's 11 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's 12 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is requested to close the case. See attached Order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/18/2022. (lctnm1) (Entered: 10/18/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar