Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleThe Center for Investigative Reporting et al v. Department of Homeland Security
DistrictNorthern District of California
CityOakland
Case Number4:2021cv09633
Date Filed2021-12-14
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
PlaintiffThe Center for Investigative Reporting
PlaintiffIke Sriskandarajah
Case DescriptionCenter for Investigative Reporting reporter Ike Sriskandarajah submitted a FOIA request to U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement for records from the Human Rights Violators & War Crimes Center concerning war criminals living in the United States. Although ICE did not acknowledge receipt of the request, it did agree to look into the request when CIR then to filed suit. After hearing nothing further from ICE, CIR filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Request - Receipt, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDepartment of Homeland Security
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Opinion/Order [20]
Opinion/Order [22]
Opinion/Order [24]
Opinion/Order [26]
Opinion/Order [39]
Opinion/Order [41]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-141COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-16719006.). Filed byThe Center for Investigative Reporting, Ike Sriskandarajah. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Declaration of D. Victoria Baranetsky, # 3 Exhibit A - E, # 4 Summons Proposed Proposed Summons attached to Complaint in error (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/14/2021) Modified text on 12/14/2021 (dhm, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-142Certificate of Interested Entities by The Center for Investigative Reporting (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-143Proposed Summons. (Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-144Case assigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-145Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor. (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-146Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (dhm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2021) (Entered: 12/14/2021)
2021-12-167CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(Baranetsky, Diana) (Filed on 12/16/2021) (Entered: 12/16/2021)
2022-01-118STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/11/2022) (Entered: 01/11/2022)
2022-01-319ANSWER to Complaint byDepartment of Homeland Security. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-01-3110NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn Musgrave (Musgrave, Shawn) (Filed on 1/31/2022) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-02-2211ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Defendant (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2212ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options by Plaintiffs (Musgrave, Shawn) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2213STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Exempt Parties from Rule 26 Requirements filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 2/22/2022) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-2314ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Dkt. No. 13 , the Parties' Stipulation to Exempt Parties from Rule 26 Requirements. The parties are relieved from the initial disclosure requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a). But as required by Rule 26(f) and this Court's Civil Standing Order, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint case management statement that includes a proposed case schedule and plan in advance of the initial case management conference. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/23/2022)
2022-02-23*** 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Terminated Re Docket No. 14 .*** (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2022) (Entered: 02/24/2022)
2022-02-2515CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 5 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference previously set for March 15, 2022 will be held telephonically. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2022) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-0816JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT and Stipulated Request to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 3/8/2022) (Entered: 03/08/2022)
2022-03-1417ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., CONTINUING the telephonic Case Management Conference currently set for March 15, 2022 to April 14, 2022. By no later than April 7, 2022, the parties shall file a joint statement describing any outstanding issues and, if needed, proposing a schedule for summary judgment briefing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2022) (Entered: 03/14/2022)
2022-03-15Set Deadline/Hearing: Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/7/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2022) (Entered: 03/15/2022)
2022-03-2418ORDER by Hon. Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., CONTINUING the telephonic Case Management Conference currently set for April 14, 2022 to April 19, 2022 at 2:00 p.m. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929; Access Code: 6064255. By no later than April 12, 2022, the parties shall file a joint statement describing any outstanding issues and, if needed, proposing a schedule for summary judgment briefing. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (hsglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022) Modified on 3/25/2022 to reflect the correct time for the Case Management Conference (hsglc2, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-03-24Reset Deadline and Hearing, Re Docket No. 18 : Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/12/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 02:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only. (bns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2022) (Entered: 03/24/2022)
2022-04-0119STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Shawn Musgrave in Support)(Musgrave, Shawn) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-0120ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 19 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-01Reset Deadline/Hearing, See Docket No. 20 : Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2022 an Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/17/2022 02:00 PM This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2022) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-05-0921STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sapna Mehta)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 5/9/2022) (Entered: 05/09/2022)
2022-05-1022ORDER (as modified) Granting 21 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 6/21/2022 and Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/28/2022 02:00 PM. The June 28th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 5/10/2022.(ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2022) (Entered: 05/10/2022)
2022-06-1523STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sapna Mehta)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 6/15/2022) Modified on 6/16/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-1524ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Granting 23 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-06-15Set Deadlines/Hearings, See Docket No. 24 : Case Management Statement due by 8/2/2022 and Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2022 02:00 PM. The 8/9 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2022) (Entered: 06/15/2022)
2022-07-2825STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sapna Mehta)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 7/28/2022) Modified on 7/29/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-07-2826ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. Denying 25 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022)
2022-08-0227UPDATED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 8/2/2022) Modified on 8/2/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-0228STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge by Department of Homeland Security filed by Department of Homeland Security, Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 8/2/2022) Modified on 8/2/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/02/2022)
2022-08-0829CLERK'S NOTICE. Notice is hereby given that the telephonic case management conference, previously set for August 9, 2022, is continued to August 12, 2022, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. The August 12th proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-0830CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 29 . Notice is hereby given that the telephonic case management conference set for August 12th will be held on that date before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 10:00 a.m. Parties should use the conference line information provided in docket no. 29 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2022) (Entered: 08/08/2022)
2022-08-1231Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference held on 8/12/2022.Total Time in Court: 3 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Diana Victoria Baranetsky. Defendant Attorney: Sapna Mehta. Matter is continued to October 18, 2022, at 2:00 pm for a telephonic further case management conference. This proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bns, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2022) (Entered: 08/12/2022)
2022-09-1232NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel Shawn Musgrave with Proposed Order by Ike Sriskandarajah, The Center for Investigative Reporting. (Musgrave, Shawn) (Filed on 9/12/2022) Modified on 9/12/2022 to add gavel (ndr, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/13/2022 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1233CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO. 33 . In the future, if your filing requires Court approval it should be e-filed as a motion to withdrawal as counsel not a notice. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-1234Order granting 32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. entered by Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-09-12*** Attorney Shawn Musgrave Terminated, See Docket No. 34 . *** (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2022) (Entered: 09/12/2022)
2022-10-1135JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Department of Homeland Security, The Center for Investigative Reporting and Ike Sriskandarajah. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 10/11/2022) Modified on 10/12/2022 (jml, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 10/11/2022)
2022-10-1836Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Telephonic Further Case Management Conference held on 10/18/2022. Total Time in Court: 9 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Diana Baranetsky. Defendant Attorney: Sapna Mehta. The Court adopts the dates proposed by the parties in their joint case management conference statement through hearing on motion for summary judgment. Written scheduling order to issue.The Court terminates without prejudice the stipulation and proposed order selecting an early settlement conference with a Magistrate Judge (docket no. 28 ). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-10-1937SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 12/16/2022; Motions due by 1/18/2023; Responses/ Cross Motions due by 2/21/2023; Responses/Replies due by 3/7/2023; Replies due by 3/14/2023; and Motion Hearing set for 3/30/2023 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 10/19/2022. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2022) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2023-01-1338STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Vacate Scheduling Order and Schedule Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 1/13/2023) (Entered: 01/13/2023)
2023-01-1739ORDER (as modified) GRANTING 38 STIPULATION to Vacate Scheduling Order and Schedule Case Management Conference .Case Management Statement due by 3/21/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 3/28/2023 02:00 PM.. The 3/28 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 1/17/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/17/2023) (Entered: 01/17/2023)
2023-03-2040STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Continue Case Management Conference filed by Department of Homeland Security. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sapna Mehta)(Mehta, Sapna) (Filed on 3/20/2023) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-2041ORDER GRANTING 40 STIPULATION to Continue Case Management Conference . Case Management Statement due by 4/25/2023. Further Case Management Conference set for 5/2/2023 02:00 PM. The 5/25/2023 proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. NOTE REGARDING TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCES: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 3/20/2023. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/20/2023) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar