Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleJonathan William McKinney v. Federal Bureau of Investigation
DistrictCentral District of California
CityWestern Division - Los Angeles
Case Number2:2021cv09620
Date Filed2021-12-10
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dale S. Fischer
PlaintiffJonathan William McKinney
DefendantFederal Bureau of Investigation
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Opinion/Order [11]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-101COMPLAINT against Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. Case assigned to Judge Mark C. Scarsi for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (lh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-102REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (lh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-153NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Mark C. Scarsi and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-154NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-155Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2021-12-156ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:21-cv-09131 DSF(AGRx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Mark C. Scarsi to Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-09620 DSF(AGRx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn) (Entered: 12/15/2021)
2022-01-257ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg: granting 2 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (hr) (Entered: 01/25/2022)
2022-01-26860 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery) 1 as to Defendant Federal Bureau of Investigation. (hr) (Entered: 01/26/2022)
2022-01-319STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv) (Entered: 01/31/2022)
2022-05-0710MEMORANDUM FOR RECORD filed by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney. (jp) (Entered: 05/16/2022)
2022-06-3011Order to Show Cause by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause no later than 7/14/2022 why the unserved defendant should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. See Order for specifics. (jp) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-0612[NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED DATED ON 7/6/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 14 ] - STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (vv). Modified on 7/7/2022 (jp). (Entered: 07/06/2022)
2022-07-0613NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, ORDERING Memorandum for Record 11 June 2022 submitted by Plaintiff Jonathan William McKinney received on 6/11/2022 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: (1) No proof of service attached to document(s); (2) Improper filing; not an acceptable pleading. (jp) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
2022-07-0614NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Standing Order for Cases Assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer 12 was inadvertently re-issued in this case. (jp) (Entered: 07/07/2022)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar