Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleWOODBURY v. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2021cv03384
Date Filed2021-12-30
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Dabney L. Friedrich
PlaintiffMARTIN WOODBURY
Case DescriptionMartin Woodbury submitted a FOIA request to the Bureau of Alcohol, Tobacco and Firearms for records concerning its investigation of Tracy Worwood's possession of military explosives. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request. The agency denied the request. Woodbury filed an administrative appeal. The agency affirmed its original denial. Woodbury then submitted a FOIA request to the FBI for records on the investigation of Worwood. The agency acknowledged receipt of the request and referred Woodbury to the denial by BATF. Woodbury filed an administrative appeal with the FBI. The FBI acknowledged receipt of the appeal, but after hearing nothing further from the agency, Woodbury filed suit.
Complaint issues: Adequacy - Search, Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantDEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
DefendantUS DEPT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2021-12-301COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8955864) filed by MARTIN WOODBURY. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 12/30/2021)
2022-01-06Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-062STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 6, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 01/06/2022)
2022-01-103SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znm) (Entered: 01/10/2022)
2022-02-114NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Silverman on behalf of All Defendants (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/11/2022)
2022-02-225ANSWER to Complaint by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE.(Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-02-22MINUTE ORDER requiring the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a joint status report proposing a schedule for further proceedings. The status report should address the status of the plaintiff's FOIA request, including the anticipated number of documents responsive to the request and the anticipated date(s) for release of the requested documents. The parties shall file the joint status report on or before March 22, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on February 22, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 02/22/2022)
2022-03-226Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before April 22, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 22, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-03-227NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Stotter on behalf of MARTIN WOODBURY (Stotter, Daniel) (Entered: 03/22/2022)
2022-04-228Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-04-22MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before May 23, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on April 22, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 04/22/2022)
2022-05-239Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-05-23MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 9 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before July 23, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on May 23, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 05/23/2022)
2022-07-26ORDER DISCHARGED PURSUANT TO ORDER FILED 7/26/2022.....MINUTE ORDER. On May 23, 2022, the Court ordered the parties to file a joint status report on or before July 23, 2022. See Minute Order of May 23, 2022. As of today, July 26, 2022, the parties have not yet done so. The parties are thus ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, on or before July 27, 2022, for the failure to meet the Court-imposed deadline for filing their next status report. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 26, 2022. (lcdlf3) Modified on 7/27/2022 (zjch, ). (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-2610STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-2611STATUS REPORT by MARTIN WOODBURY. (Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-26MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the defendant's 10 Status Report and the plaintiff's 11 Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the SHOW CAUSE MINUTE ORDER is DISCHARGED. The parties are directed to file a joint status report on or before August 26, 2022, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 26, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-07-2612Joint STATUS REPORT by MARTIN WOODBURY. (Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 07/26/2022)
2022-08-2613Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 08/26/2022)
2022-08-30MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 13 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by November 28, 2022, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on August 30, 2022. (lcdlf3) (Entered: 08/30/2022)
2022-08-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 11/28/2022 (zjch, ) (Entered: 09/01/2022)
2022-11-2814Joint STATUS REPORT by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2022-11-28MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 14 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by January 28, 2023, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 28, 2022. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 11/28/2022)
2023-01-2615Joint STATUS REPORT by MARTIN WOODBURY. (Quaranto, Lance) (Entered: 01/26/2023)
2023-01-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 15 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by March 24, 2023, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on January 27, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 01/27/2023)
2023-03-2416Joint STATUS REPORT by US DEPT OF JUSTICE. (Silverman, Bradley) (Entered: 03/24/2023)
2023-03-27MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 16 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties are directed to file another joint status report by May 24, 2023, informing the Court as to their progress resolving the remaining issues in this case. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on March 27, 2023. (lcdlf2) (Entered: 03/27/2023)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar