Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitlePROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST v. U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00135
Date Filed2022-01-20
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeJudge Ana C. Reyes
PlaintiffPROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST
Case DescriptionProtect the Public's Trust submitted a FOIA request to the Department of Education for records concerning communications with the National School Boards Association. PPT also requested a fee waiver, the agency acknowledged receipt of the request and granted PPT's request for a fee waiver. After hearing nothing further from the agency, PPT filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantU.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
Defendant2255
DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION
400 Maryland Avenue, S.W.
Washington, DC 20202
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-01-201COMPLAINT against DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8991922) filed by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - FOIA 22-00131-F, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney's Office, # 4 Summons Summons -- U.S. Attorney General, # 5 Summons Summons -- Department of Education)(Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 01/20/2022)
2022-01-21Case Assigned to Judge Florence Y. Pan. (znmg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-212SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-01-213STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the attached Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 1/21/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 01/21/2022)
2022-03-024ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION.(Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 03/02/2022)
2022-03-025ORDER: Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report by April 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 3/2/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 03/02/2022)
2022-03-02Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/4/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 03/02/2022)
2022-04-046Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Weiner, Blake) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-04-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 6 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before May 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 4/5/2022. (lcrl) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 5/4/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 04/05/2022)
2022-04-297NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Daniel Patrick Schaefer on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Substituting for attorney Blake A. Weiner (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 04/29/2022)
2022-05-048Joint STATUS REPORT by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 05/04/2022)
2022-05-05MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 8 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before June 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 5/5/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-05-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/4/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 05/05/2022)
2022-06-039MOTION for Extension of Time To Submit Joint Status Report by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST. (Lawkowski, Gary) Modified on 6/6/2022 to correct docket event/text (zjf). (Entered: 06/03/2022)
2022-06-06MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before June 10, 2022. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 6/6/2022. (lcsw) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-06Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 06/06/2022)
2022-06-1010Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 06/10/2022)
2022-06-14MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 10 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before July 12, 2022, and every thirty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 6/14/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-06-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2022. (zacr) (Entered: 06/14/2022)
2022-07-1211Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 07/12/2022)
2022-07-13MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the parties are directed to file another joint status report on or before August 18, 2022, and every thirty days thereafter. Signed by Judge Florence Y. Pan on 7/13/22. (lcaa) (Entered: 07/13/2022)
2022-07-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/18/2022. (smc) (Entered: 07/14/2022)
2022-08-1812Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 08/18/2022)
2022-09-1913Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Schaefer, Daniel) (Entered: 09/19/2022)
2022-09-23Judge Florence Y. Pan has been elevated to serve on the U.S. Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit. She is therefore no longer assigned to this case, and this matter has been reassigned to the Calendar Committee, which will oversee it until it is assigned to another district judge. Any questions should be directed to Judge Pan's former deputy clerk, Samantha Calloway, at 202-354-3163 or samantha_calloway@dcd.uscourts.gov. (ztnr) (Entered: 09/23/2022)
2022-10-1614NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Anna Davis Walker on behalf of U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION Substituting for attorney Daniel Patrick Schaefer (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/16/2022)
2022-10-1915Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 10/19/2022)
2022-11-1816Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/18/2022)
2022-12-1617Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 12/16/2022)
2023-01-1818Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/18/2023)
2023-02-1719Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-02-24Case directly reassigned to District Judge Ana C. Reyes. Circuit Judge Florence Y. Pan is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) (Entered: 02/24/2023)
2023-03-2020Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-2021ENTERED IN ERROR.....Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Anna) Modified on 3/21/2023 (zjm). (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-20VACATED PURSUANT TO COURT'S ORDER DATED 3/21/2023.......MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 21 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall submit a further joint status report on or before April 21, 2023, advising the Court on the parties' efforts to resolve any challenges to the content of the administrative record among themselves, or to propose a schedule for briefing such challenges, if necessary, or to propose a briefing schedule for any summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 3/20/2023. (lcjo) Modified on 3/21/2023 (zcdw). (Entered: 03/20/2023)
2023-03-21NOTICE OF ERROR regarding 21 Status Report. The following error(s) need correction: Incorrect court header/case caption/case number. Please refile. (zjm) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
2023-03-21MINUTE ORDER. The Court's Minute Order entered on March 20, 2023, is hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 3/21/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
2023-03-2122NOTICE of Filing Correct Joint Status Report by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION re 20 Status Report (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 03/21/2023)
2023-04-1923Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 04/19/2023)
2023-04-21MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' Joint Status Report, the parties shall file their next joint status report on or before May 26, 2023. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 4/21/2023. (lcjo) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-04-21Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 5/26/2023. (zcdw) (Entered: 04/21/2023)
2023-05-2624Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 05/26/2023)
2023-07-0525Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report Nunc Pro Tunc by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-0526Joint STATUS REPORT and Joint Motion to Amend Schedule by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-0527Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Order, entered June 14, 2022, to file Joint Status Report Every Sixty Days as Opposed to Every Thirty Days by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 07/05/2023)
2023-07-06MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' 25 Joint Motion for an Extension of time Nunc Pro Tunc , and for good cause and excusable neglect shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Motion is GRANTED and the time to file the parties' June 26, 2023 Joint Status Report shall be extended, nunc pro tunc , until July 5, 2023. Upon consideration of the parties' 26 27 Joint Status Report and Joint Motion to Amend Schedule, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties' Motion is GRANTED, and it is FURTHER ORDERED that the Court's June 14, 2022 Minute Order is AMENDED such that the parties are directed to file a further joint status report on or before September 5, 2023 and every 60 days thereafter, until this case is dismissed or the parties submit a schedule for further proceedings in this case. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 7/6/2023. (lcjo) (Entered: 07/06/2023)
2023-07-1228NOTICE by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-07-1229LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by PROTECT THE PUBLIC'S TRUST (Lawkowski, Gary) (Entered: 07/12/2023)
2023-08-3030Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 08/30/2023)
2023-11-0631Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 11/06/2023)
2024-01-0532Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Walker, Anna) (Entered: 01/05/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar