Date Filed | Doc # | Docket Text |
|
2022-01-25 | 1 | COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State by Ryan Scoville. ( Filing Fee PAID $402 receipt number AWIEDC-4025016) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -FOIA Request, # 2 Exhibit B - March 24, 2020 Email, # 3 Exhibit C - February 22, 2021 Email Chain, # 4 Exhibit D - March 31, 2021 Appeal, # 5 Exhibit E - March 31, 2021 Response, # 6 Exhibit F - May 19, 2017 Complaint, # 7 Exhibit G - July 3, 2019 Complaint, # 8 Exhibit H - August 16, 2021 Request, # 9 Summons, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williamson, Brady) |
2022-01-25 | 2 | DISCLOSURE Statement by Ryan Scoville. (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-01-25 | | NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph; Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Joseph to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available here. (jcl) |
2022-01-25 | | Summons Issued as to US Department of State. (asc) |
2022-02-14 | 3 | Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Ryan Scoville. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-02-14 | 4 | Return of Service of Complaint by Certified Mail by Ryan Scoville served upon U.S. Department of State on February 4, 2022 (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-02-28 | 5 | NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Yun on behalf of US Department of State. Attorney(s) appearing: Lisa Yun (Yun, Lisa) |
2022-02-28 | 6 | Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead by US Department of State. (Yun, Lisa) |
2022-03-01 | 7 | NOTICE of Appearance by Christian R Larsen on behalf of US Department of State. Attorney(s) appearing: Chris R. Larsen (Larsen, Christian) |
2022-03-01 | | NOTICE from the clerk to DEFENDANT requesting that the Consent/Refusal form to Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph be filed within 21 days; the form is available here . (asc) |
2022-03-07 | 8 | RESPONSE to Motion filed by Ryan Scoville re 6 Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead - Response to Defendant's Motion for Extension and Request for Rule 16 Conference . (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-03-08 | | TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/8/2022 granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant has until April 1, 2022 to answer. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
2022-03-08 | | Set/Reset Deadlines: US Department of State answer due 4/1/2022. (llc) |
2022-03-11 | 9 | NOTICE of Appearance by Carol Federighi on behalf of US Department of State. Attorney(s) appearing: Carol Federighi (Federighi, Carol) |
2022-03-11 | 10 | Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by US Department of State. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Federighi, Carol) |
2022-03-14 | | Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (asc) |
2022-03-28 | 11 | Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Unopposed) by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Federighi, Carol) |
2022-03-28 | | TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 3/28/2022 granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. US Department of State answer due 4/8/2022. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
2022-04-08 | 12 | Partial MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 Copies of Unpublished Authorities)(Federighi, Carol) Modified on 4/28/2022 (asc). |
2022-04-08 | 13 | BRIEF in Support filed by US Department of State re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Federighi, Carol) |
2022-04-11 | | NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 9:30 AM via Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. (cc: all counsel)(asc) |
2022-04-27 | 14 | Rule 7(h) Expedited Non-Dispositive MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion - Unopposed by Ryan Scoville. (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-04-27 | | TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 4/27/2022 granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
2022-04-27 | | ZOOM INFORMATION for Status Conference set for 4/29/2022 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Click here to Join ZoomGov Meeting Meeting ID: 160 927 7592 and Password: 097092 Dial in: +1-669-254-5252 or +1-646-828-7666 (cc: all counsel) (asc) |
2022-05-02 | 15 | Minute Entry for Status Conference held on 5/2/2022 before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph: The court speaks with parties re background of case, and scheduling matters. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (asc) |
2022-05-11 | 16 | NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Stich on behalf of Ryan Scoville. Attorney(s) appearing: Stephen Stich (Stich, Stephen) |
2022-05-20 | 17 | BRIEF in Opposition filed by Ryan Scoville re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-05-20 | 18 | ATTACHMENTS - Copies of Unpublished Authorities by Ryan Scoville re 17 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-06-03 | 19 | REPLY BRIEF in Support filed by US Department of State re 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Federighi, Carol) |
2022-06-03 | 20 | ATTACHMENTS (Copy of Unpublished Authority) by US Department of State re 19 Reply Brief in Support of Motion. (Federighi, Carol) |
2022-08-23 | 21 | DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 8/23/2022 denying 12 Partial Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
2022-08-24 | 22 | NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2022 10:30 AM by Zoom Video Conference before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Rule 26(f) Report due by 9/23/2022. (cc: all counsel)(edr) |
2022-08-25 | | ZOOM INFORMATION for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/29/2022 at 10:30 am before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph. Click here to Join ZoomGov Meeting <br Meeting ID: 161 496 6979 and Password: 489903 Dial in: +1-669-254-5252 or +1-646 828-7666 (cc: all counsel) (edr) |
2022-09-06 | 23 | ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, by US Department of State.(Federighi, Carol) |
2022-09-21 | 24 | Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear Law Students Arjun Malik and Hannah Vester by Ryan Scoville. (Stich, Stephen) |
2022-09-22 | 25 | ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/22/2022 granting 24 Motion for Leave to Appear for law students Arjun Malik and Hannah Vester. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
2022-09-23 | 26 | REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Ryan Scoville. (Williamson, Brady) |
2022-09-29 | 27 | Minute Entry for Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/29/2022. Parties discussed scheduling deadlines. Court adopted proposed deadlines as stated on the record. (Court Reporter Zoom Audio) (rcm) |
2022-09-29 | 28 | SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 9/29/2022. Rule 26(a) Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/7/2022, Fact Discovery by 4/24/2023, Disclosure of Witness Designations and Reports by 6/26/2023, Expert Witness Discovery by 8/28/2023, Summary Judgment Motions by Plaintiff by 9/18/2023, Defendant Summary Judgment Cross-motions by 10/16/2023. (cc: all counsel)(rcm) |
2022-12-19 | 29 | NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Elizabeth Davidson on behalf of Ryan Scoville. Attorney(s) appearing: Rachel Davidson (Davidson, Rachel) |
2022-12-21 | 30 | NOTICE of Withdrawal by Stephen Stich on behalf of Ryan Scoville.Attorney Stephen Stich to be termed. (Stich, Stephen) |
2022-12-21 | | Attorney Stephen Stich terminated. (rcm) (Entered: 12/22/2022) |
2023-02-09 | 31 | Joint MOTION for Protective Order by US Department of State. (Attachments: # 1 [Proposed] Protective Order)(Federighi, Carol) |
2023-02-09 | 32 | ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy Joseph on 2/9/2023 granting 31 Motion for Protective Order. (cc: all counsel)(llc) |
Hide Docket Events |