Skip to content

Case Detail

[Subscribe to updates]
Case TitleSTONEHILL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION
DistrictDistrict of Columbia
CityWashington, DC
Case Number1:2022cv00311
Date Filed2022-02-04
Date ClosedOpen
JudgeChief Judge James E. Boasberg
PlaintiffPAULINE DALE STONEHILL Co-Executor and Co-Special Administrator; Estate of Harry S. Stonehill
Case DescriptionPauline Stonehill, co-executor of the Estate of Harry Stonehill, submitted a FOIA request to the Criminal Division of the Department of Justice for records concerning a number of FOIA requests submitted by the Estate. After hearing nothing further from the agency, Stonehill filed suit.
Complaint issues: Failure to respond within statutory time limit, Adequacy - Search, Litigation - Vaughn index, Litigation - Attorney's fees

DefendantUNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION
DefendantCRIMINAL DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
Documents
Docket
Complaint
Complaint attachment 1
Complaint attachment 2
Complaint attachment 3
Complaint attachment 4
Complaint attachment 5
Complaint attachment 6
Complaint attachment 7
Complaint attachment 8
Complaint attachment 9
Complaint attachment 10
Opinion/Order [23]
User-contributed Documents
 
Docket Events (Hide)
Date FiledDoc #Docket Text

2022-02-041COMPLAINT PAULINE DALE STONEHILL against CRIMINAL DIVISION OF THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Fee Status: Not Paid) filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit Back ground Stonehill Proceeding, # 3 Exhibit 7/28/1998 FOIA State Dept., # 4 Exhibit Tax Division Access to Criminal Division files, # 5 Exhibit Loss of IRS Criminal Division Files, # 6 Exhibit McLean FOIA Request, # 7 Exhibit September 19, 2018 FOIA Request, # 8 Summons Attorney General, # 9 Summons Civil Process Clerk, # 10 Summons US Attorney DC)(Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 2/7/2022 to edit payment status (znmg). (Entered: 02/04/2022)
2022-02-07Payment for 1 Complaint,,. ($402; Receipt number ADCDC-9027640). (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-07Case Assigned to Judge James E. Boasberg. (znmg) (Entered: 02/07/2022)
2022-02-102SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Notice and Consent)(znm) (Entered: 02/10/2022)
2022-02-253RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. PAULINE DALE STONEHILL served on 2/16/2022 (Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 02/25/2022)
2022-03-184NOTICE of Appearance by Diana Viggiano Valdivia on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-185ANSWER to Complaint by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION.(Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 03/18/2022)
2022-03-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall confer and submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by April 1, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 3/21/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-03-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 4/1/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 03/21/2022)
2022-04-016Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 6 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by June 30, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/1/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/01/2022)
2022-04-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/30/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 04/04/2022)
2022-06-307Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Valdivia, Diana) (Entered: 06/30/2022)
2022-07-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 7 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by August 1, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/1/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/01/2022)
2022-07-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 07/05/2022)
2022-08-018NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Douglas C. Dreier on behalf of UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION Substituting for attorney Diana V. Valdivia (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-019Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-01MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 9 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by September 15, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/1/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-08-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/15/2022 (lsj) (Entered: 08/01/2022)
2022-09-1510Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-15MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 10 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further Joint Status Report by November 17, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/15/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/15/2022)
2022-09-15Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/17/2022. (znbn) (Entered: 09/16/2022)
2022-11-1711Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-17MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' 11 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall submit a further Joint Status Report by December 29, 2022. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/17/2022. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-11-17Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/29/2022. (nbn) (Entered: 11/17/2022)
2022-12-2912Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2022-12-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 12 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that they shall file a further joint status report by February 14, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/29/2022. (lcjeb1) (Entered: 12/29/2022)
2022-12-29Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 2/14/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 01/04/2023)
2023-02-1413Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-14MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 13 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by April 13, 2023; 2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion by May 12, 2023; and 3) Defendant shall file its Reply by June 2, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/14/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/14/2023)
2023-02-14Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/13/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/12/2023. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/2/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 02/15/2023)
2023-02-1614Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-16MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Unopposed 14 Motion to Amend Briefing Schedule. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by April 13, 2023; 2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion and any Cross-Motion by May 12, 2023; 3) Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition to any Cross-Motion by June 2, 2023; and 4) Plaintiff shall file her Reply by June 12, 2023. So ORDERED by Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/16/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 4/13/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 5/12/2023. Cross Motions due by 5/12/2023. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 6/2/2023. Response to Cross Motions due by 6/2/2023. Reply to Cross Motions due by 6/12/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 02/16/2023)
2023-02-17RESOLVED...NOTICE of Provisional/Government Not Certified Status re 14 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Summary Judgment Briefing Schedule by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER)(Heggestad, Robert). Your attorney renewal/government certification has not been received. As a result, your membership with the U.S. District & Bankruptcy Courts for the District of Columbia is not in good standing, and you are not permitted to file. Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 83.9, you must immediately correct your membership status by following the appropriate instructions on this page of our website: https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/attorney-renewal. Please be advised that the presiding judge in this case has been notified that you are currently not in good standing to file in this court. Renewal Due by 2/24/2023. (zbaj) Modified on 2/23/2023 (zbaj). (Entered: 02/17/2023)
2023-04-0315Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Brief Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 04/03/2023)
2023-04-03MINUTE ORDER GRANTING Consent 15 Motion for Extension of Time. The Court ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by June 12, 2023; 2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion and any Cross-Motion by July 11, 2023; 3) Defendant shall file its combined Reply and Opposition to any Cross-Motion by August 1, 2023; and 4) Plaintiff shall file her Reply by August 14, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 4/3/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 04/03/2023)
2023-04-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 6/12/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 7/11/2023. Cross Motions due by 7/11/2023. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 8/1/2023. Response to Cross Motions due by 8/1/2023. Reply to Cross Motions due by 8/14/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 04/04/2023)
2023-05-2216MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit First Amended Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, # 2 Exhibit First Amended Complaint with redactions, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 05/22/2023)
2023-05-2317Memorandum in opposition to re 16 Motion to Amend/Correct, filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - So-Ordered Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 05/23/2023)
2023-05-2918MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 05/29/2023)
2023-05-30MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; and 2) Plaintiff shall file her Reply in support of her 16 Motion by June 2, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 5/30/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-05-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 6/2/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 05/30/2023)
2023-06-0219REPLY to opposition to motion re 16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit NARA REcords, # 2 Exhibit May 13, 1999 letter from R. Heggestad to B. Gay, # 3 Exhibit May 14, 2001 letter from R. Heggestad to T. McIntyre, # 4 Exhibit Documents produced by Criminal Division, # 5 Exhibit NARA Excel sheet- Criminal Division withdrawals)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 06/02/2023)
2023-06-0520NOTICE ERRATA by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A Corrected Reply Brief, # 2 Attachment B Highlighted Redactions, # 3 Exhibit Ex. I NARA documents, # 4 Ex. 2 May 13, 1999 letter from R. Heggestad to B. Gay, # 5 March 14, 2001 Letter from R. Heggestad to T. McIntyre, # 6 Ex. 4 Records produced by Criminal Division)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 06/05/2023)
2023-06-0821Consent MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint, or, in the Alternative , Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Move for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 06/08/2023)
2023-06-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) The Consent 21 Motion to Stay Summary Judgment Deadlines is GRANTED; and 2) Deadlines on any Motion for Summary Judgment are STAYED until further order of the Court. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 6/8/2023.(lcjeb3) (Entered: 06/08/2023)
2023-07-2122ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Amend is GRANTED; (2) The Amended Complaint is deemed FILED; and (3) Defendant shall have until August 4, 2023, to respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/21/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
2023-07-2123Memorandum Opinion re. Order 22 on Motion to Amend. Signed by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 07/21/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 07/21/2023)
2023-07-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/4/2023. (nbn) (Entered: 07/23/2023)
2023-08-0124MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 08/01/2023)
2023-08-02MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant's 24 Motion for Extension by August 4, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/2/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-0225RESPONSE re 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Amended Complaint and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit April 14, 2023 letter from B. Thompson to R. Heggestad)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 08/02/2023)
2023-08-03MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 24 Motion for Extension is GRANTED IN PART, and Defendant shall file its Motion by September 25, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 8/3/2023. (lcjeb2) (Entered: 08/03/2023)
2023-08-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 9/25/2023. (lsj) (Entered: 08/03/2023)
2023-09-2026Consent MOTION to Stay by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 09/20/2023)
2023-09-21MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) The Consent 26 Motion to Stay is GRANTED; (2) This case is STAYED pending further order of this Court; and (3) The parties shall file a joint status report by October 16, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 09/21/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-09-21Set/Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 10/16/2023. Case Stayed. (nbn) (Entered: 09/21/2023)
2023-10-0927NOTICE by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION re 26 Consent MOTION to Stay. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration)(ztth) (Entered: 10/10/2023)
2023-10-1328Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 10/13/2023)
2023-10-16MINUTE ORDER: The Court ADOPTS the parties' 28 Joint Status Report and ORDERS that: 1) Defendant shall file its Motion for Summary Judgment by December 15, 2023; 2) Plaintiff shall file her Opposition to Defendant's Motion or Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by January 16, 2024; 3) Defendant shall file its Reply by February 15, 2024; and 4) Plaintiff shall file its Reply by March 1, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 10/16/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-10-16Set/Reset Deadlines: Summary Judgment motions due by 12/15/2023. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 1/16/2024. Cross Motions due by 1/16/2024. Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/15/2024. Response to Cross Motions due by 2/15/2024. Reply to Cross Motions due by 3/1/2024. (znbn) (Entered: 10/16/2023)
2023-11-0329WITHDRAWN PURSUANT TO THE MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 11/8/2023.....MOTION to Substitute Party by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Statement of Death, # 2 Exhibit Death Certificate, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2023 (znbn). (Entered: 11/03/2023)
2023-11-0730Memorandum in opposition to re 29 Motion to Substitute Party filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-0731MOTION to Withdraw 29 Motion to Substitute Parties by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) Modified to add link on 11/9/2023 (znmw). (Entered: 11/07/2023)
2023-11-08MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiff's 31 Motion to Withdraw Motion is GRANTED; and 2) Her 29 Motion to Substitute Party is WITHDRAWN. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/08/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/08/2023)
2023-11-1532MOTION to Substitute Party by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Nov. 3 Motion to Substitute, # 2 Exhibit Statement of Death, # 3 Exhibit Death Certificate, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2023)
2023-11-2933Consent MOTION to Vacate Order, re Briefing Schedule by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-2934RESPONSE re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-29MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Defendant's 33 Motion is GRANTED, the briefing schedule is VACATED, and Defendant shall file its Answer by December 13, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 11/29/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 11/29/2023)
2023-11-30Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 12/13/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 11/30/2023)
2023-12-0435MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in Support of Motion to Substitute Parties by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/04/2023)
2023-12-05MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that: (1) Plaintiff's 35 Motion for Extension is GRANTED; and (2) Plaintiff shall file her Reply in support of her 32 Motion for Substitution by December 11, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/05/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-05Set/Reset Deadlines: Replies due by 12/11/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 12/05/2023)
2023-12-1136STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE MINUTE ORDER FILED ON 12/12/2023.....REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit November 29, 2023 email from D. Drier to R. Heggestad)(Heggestad, Robert) Modified on 12/12/2023 (znbn). (Entered: 12/11/2023)
2023-12-12MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's 36 Reply is STRICKEN for violating the Court's Local Rule on excessive footnotes. For a 10-page brief, Plaintiff may not exceed five footnotes with 25 aggregate lines of text. Plaintiff shall refile a compliant brief by December 14, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/12/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2023-12-1237REPLY to opposition to motion re 32 MOTION to Substitute Party filed by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit November 29, 2023 email from D. Drier to R. Heggestad)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/12/2023)
2023-12-1338ANSWER to Complaint (ECF No. 16-1) by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION.(Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/13/2023)
2023-12-13MINUTE ORDER: Given the filing of Defendant's 38 Answer, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall submit a joint proposed briefing schedule by December 22, 2023. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/13/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/13/2023)
2023-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/22/2023 (lsj) (Entered: 12/13/2023)
2023-12-13Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Proposed Briefing Schedule due by 12/22/2023. (znbn) (Entered: 12/14/2023)
2023-12-2239STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 12/22/2023)
2023-12-27MINUTE ORDER: The Court ORDERS that the parties shall appear for a status hearing on January 3, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. via Zoom. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 12/27/2023. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 12/27/2023)
2023-12-27Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 1/3/2024 at 03:00 PM in Telephonic/VTC before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg. (znbn) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2023-12-2840NOTICE Supplemental Filing by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL (Attachments: # 1 December 28, 2023 Letter from P. Lenz to R. Heggestad, # 2 December 28, 2023 Letter from C. Dale to R. Heggestad)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 12/28/2023)
2024-01-0341NOTICE of Order Stonehill v. CIA by PAULINE DALE STONEHILL (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Order Stonehill v. CIA)(Heggestad, Robert) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-03Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge James E. Boasberg: Status Conference held via Zoom on 1/3/2024. Forthcoming Minute Order. (Court Reporter Tammy Nestor) (znbn) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-03MINUTE ORDER: As discussed in today's hearing, the Court ORDERS that the parties shall file a further status report by January 31, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/3/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-03Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2024. (nbn) (Entered: 01/03/2024)
2024-01-12MINUTE ORDER: As Plaintiff agrees that Cliff Dale may be substituted as Plaintiff, the Court ORDERS that: 1) Plaintiffs 32 Motion to Substitute Party is GRANTED IN PART; and 2) Cliff Dale shall be substituted as party Plaintiff for Pauline Dale Stonehill. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 1/12/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 01/12/2024)
2024-01-3142Joint STATUS REPORT by UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE CRIMINAL DIVISION. (Dreier, Douglas) (Entered: 01/31/2024)
2024-02-01MINUTE ORDER: Having reviewed the parties' 42 Joint Status Report, the Court ORDERS that they shall submit a further JSR by March 8, 2024. So ORDERED by Chief Judge James E. Boasberg on 2/1/2024. (lcjeb3) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
2024-02-01Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/8/2024 (lsj) (Entered: 02/01/2024)
Hide Docket Events
by FOIA Project Staff
Skip to toolbar